Kohler et al v. CRST Expedited, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christine Kurzweil
Defendant: CRST Flatbed
Petitioner: Kimberly A. Kohler
Respondent: CRST Expedited, Inc. doing business as CRST the Transportation Solutions, Inc., CRST Integrated Solutions, CRST Specialized Solutions, CRST Dedicated Solutions-East, CRST Dedicated Solutions - West, CRST Expedited Solutions and Bill Lard
Case Number: 3:2021cv01359
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #36 Motion for New Trial filed by CRST Expedited, Inc., Bill Lard. Filer selected the incorrect event. The docket has been corrected to reflect the correct event of MOTION To Change Track Assignment. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 15, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of HEARING Regarding #36 MOTION To Change Track Assignment file by the Defendants. The Motion Hearing is scheduled for 1/20/2022 at 9:00 AM via Telephone Conference before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO CALL INTO (618) 439-7733 to join the call. (tag)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 14, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #39 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Christine Kurzweil, Kimberly A. Kohler, #40 Notice (Other) filed by Christine Kurzweil, Kimberly A. Kohler. Filer selected the incorrect event when filing docket entry #39 . The docket has now been modified to the correct event of Response. Docket entry #40 is a Certificate of Service. Notices of Filing and Certificates of Service should only be filed as the final page of a pleading, and not a standalone document. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 14, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #37 Response to Motion filed by Christine Kurzweil, Kimberly A. Kohler, #38 Response to Motion filed by Christine Kurzweil, Kimberly A. Kohler. Electronic signature omitted. See Section 2.0: page 2.1 of Users Manual. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 13, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #39 Reply to Response to Motion (Sorich, Michael)
December 13, 2021 Filing 39 RESPONSE to Motion re #36 First MOTION for New Trial /Change Assignment to Track C filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sorich, Michael) Modified on 12/14/2021 (tba).
December 13, 2021 Filing 38 STRICKEN RESPONSE to Motion re #36 First MOTION for New Trial /Change Assignment to Track C filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sorich, Michael) Modified on 12/14/2021 (tba).
December 13, 2021 Filing 37 STRICKEN RESPONSE to Motion re #36 First MOTION for New Trial /Change Assignment to Track C filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sorich, Michael) Modified on 12/14/2021 (tba).
December 13, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION To Change Track Assignment by CRST Expedited, Inc., Bill Lard. (Hamlin, Michael) Modified on 12/15/2021 (tba).
December 13, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #34 CJRA Track,. The Docket had the incorrect year for the Final Pretrial Conference scheduled. The Docket has now been updated with the correct year for the Final Pretrial Conference. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (tba)
December 13, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Discovery due by 1/10/2022. (tag)
December 10, 2021 Filing 34 CJRA TRACK B assigned: The Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 12/12/2022 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Parties are to submit a Joint Report regarding Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order within 28 days of the entry of this filing. Scheduling/Discovery and Settlement Conferences will NOT be set for hearing unless requested by the parties or deemed necessary by the Court. (tag) Modified on 12/13/2021 (tba).
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Defendants' Motion to Withdraw #12 Motion by Defendants CRST Expedited, Inc. and Bill Lard's Opposed Motion for Relief. #12 is WITHDRAWN. Motion hearing scheduled for 12/1/2021 is CANCELED. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/1/2021. (jsh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 30, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION to Withdraw 27 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #12 by CRST Expedited, Inc., Bill Lard. (Hamlin, Michael)
November 23, 2021 Filing 31 ANSWER to #29 Amended Complaint by CRST Expedited, Inc..(Hamlin, Michael)
November 23, 2021 Filing 30 ANSWER to #29 Amended Complaint by Bill Lard.(Hamlin, Michael)
November 17, 2021 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Sorich, Michael)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, denying #26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Christine Kurzweil, Kimberly A. Kohler. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/15/2021. (jdh)
November 12, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of HEARING REGARDING #12 MOTION FOR RELIEF filed by Defendants. The Motion Hearing is scheduled for 12/1/2021 at 9:00 AM via Telephone Conference before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Parties are directed to call into (618) 439-7733 to join the call. (tag)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 10, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Sorich, Michael)
November 9, 2021 Filing 25 AMENDED DOCUMENT by CRST Expedited, Inc., Bill Lard. Amendment to #24 Memorandum & Opinion . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint)(Hamlin, Michael)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: jurisdiction defect. Amended pleading due 11/12/2021. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/2/2021. (jdh)
October 29, 2021 Filing 23 Letter regarding transfer of case (amv)
October 28, 2021 Filing 22 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-1359-JPG. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (amv)
October 28, 2021 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-05146. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 28, 2021 Filing 20 TRANSFERRED to the USDC Southern District of Illinois the electronic record. (jn, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/28/2021.]
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Defendants' agreed motion to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) #11 is granted. It is ORDERED that this action, including Defendants' pending motion for relief from the September 14, 2021 Circuit Court of Cook County Order #12 , is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois. The joint initial status report due on 12/13/2021 is stricken. Civil case closed. Signed by the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama on 10/14/2021. Mailed notice (jn, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/28/2021.]
October 12, 2021 Filing 18 REPLY by CRST Expedited, Inc., Bill Lard to response in opposition to motion, #16 , MOTION by Defendants CRST Expedited, Inc., Bill LardRelief from September 14, 2021 Cook County Order (Opposed) #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex C - Email Correspondence with ptf atty, #2 Exhibit Ex D - Email Correspondence with ptf atty)(Hamlin, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/28/2021.]
October 7, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by Kimberly A. Kohler, Christine Kurzweil re response in opposition to motion, #16 (Attachments: #1 Response, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Sorich, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/28/2021.]
October 7, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE by Kimberly A. Kohler, Christine Kurzweilin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants CRST Expedited, Inc., Bill LardRelief from September 14, 2021 Cook County Order (Opposed) #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Sorich, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/28/2021.]
October 6, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Answer to First Amended Complaint) by Bill Lard(Hamlin, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/28/2021.]
October 6, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Answer to First Amended Complaint) by CRST Expedited, Inc.(Hamlin, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/28/2021.]
October 6, 2021 Filing 13 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by CRST Expedited, Inc. (Hamlin, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/28/2021.]
October 5, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendants CRST Expedited, Inc., Bill LardRelief from September 14, 2021 Cook County Order (Opposed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Protective Order, #2 Exhibit Cook County Order for Plaintiff's Emergency Motion)(Hamlin, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/28/2021.]
October 5, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendants CRST Expedited, Inc., Bill Lard to transfer case (Consented) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Federal Court Management Stats)(Hamlin, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/28/2021.]
October 1, 2021 Filing 10 EXHIBIT by Defendants CRST Expedited, Inc., Bill Lard regarding notice of removal #1 (Hamlin, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/28/2021.]
October 1, 2021 Filing 9 Entered in Error. Docket Text Modified on 10/1/2021 (kl, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/28/2021.]
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (cp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/28/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 12/13/2021, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report. The removing party must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the opposing party has not been served with notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446(d) by that date, the removing party's counsel is instructed to file an individual status report indicating the status of notice of removal by the same deadline. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Mailed notice (axc). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/28/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kimberly A. Kohler, Christine Kurzweil by Michael Jude Sorich (Sorich, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/28/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kimberly A. Kohler, Christine Kurzweil by Timothy John Cavanagh (Cavanagh, Timothy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/28/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendants CRST Expedited, Inc., d/b/a CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc., Bill Lard for Notice of Removal (Hamlin, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/28/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants CRST Expedited, Inc., d/b/a CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc., Bill Lard by Michael Stark Hamlin (Hamlin, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/28/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hamlin, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/28/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Cook County, case number (2021L009086) filed by CRST Expedited, Inc., d/b/a CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc., Bill Lard Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18717578. (Hamlin, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/28/2021.]
September 29, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (crl, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/28/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kohler et al v. CRST Expedited, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Kurzweil
Represented By: Michael Jude Sorich
Represented By: Timothy John Cavanagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kimberly A. Kohler
Represented By: Michael Jude Sorich
Represented By: Timothy John Cavanagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CRST Expedited, Inc. doing business as CRST the Transportation Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Stark Hamlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CRST Integrated Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CRST Specialized Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CRST Dedicated Solutions-East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CRST Dedicated Solutions - West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CRST Expedited Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bill Lard
Represented By: Michael Stark Hamlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRST Flatbed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?