The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Kayser et al
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Lavon Kayser, Kelly Wilhelm, John Wilhelm and Edward Kayser
Case Number: 3:2021cv01367
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #18 Waiver of Service Executed filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, #17 Waiver of Service Executed filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Corrected the dates of waivers of service and answer due dates. Answers are now due 1/18/2022. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (kls3)
December 20, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Kelly Wilhelm waiver sent on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Erickson, Heather) Modified on 12/20/2021 (kls3).
December 20, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. John Wilhelm waiver sent on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Erickson, Heather) Modified on 12/20/2021 (kls3).
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on The Prudential Life Insurance Company of Americas Motion to Deposit Funds Under 28 U.S.C. 1335 (Doc. #9 ). The Motion is GRANTED and it is hereby ORDERED: The Prudential Life Insurance Company of America is authorized to deposit with the Clerk of the Court the $19,272.50 in life insurance benefits plus any applicable interest payable due to the death of Albert Kayser under Family Whole Life Insurance Policy No. 29 149 142 issued by Prudential. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/14/2021. (rts)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 14, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Edward Kayser waiver sent on 12/5/2021, answer due 2/3/2022. (Erickson, Heather)
November 23, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Gilbert on behalf of Lavon Kayser (Gilbert, John)
November 23, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip J. Lading on behalf of Lavon Kayser (Lading, Philip)
November 23, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint, by Lavon Kayser.(Lading, Philip)
November 10, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Lavon Kayser served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021. (Erickson, Heather)
November 3, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Edward Kayser, Lavon Kayser, John Wilhelm, Kelly Wilhelm, filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Erickson, Heather)
November 2, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Deposit Funds of Proceeds with Incorporated Brief by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Erickson, Heather)
November 2, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Lavon Kayser and original mailed to Attorney Erickson. (kek)
November 1, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Requested. (White, Meghan)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan D. White on behalf of The Prudential Insurance Company of America (White, Meghan)
October 29, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Edward Kayser, John Wilhelm, Kelly Wilhelm. Originals mailed to requesting party. (clt)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-01367-SMY. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (clt)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather D. Erickson on behalf of The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Erickson, Heather)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent The Prudential Insurance Company of America for The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Erickson, Heather)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4619805.), filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheeet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons)(Erickson, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Kayser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Heather D. Erickson
Represented By: Meghan D. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lavon Kayser
Represented By: Philip J. Lading
Represented By: John L. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Wilhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wilhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Kayser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?