Roundcount v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Terry Roundcount
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv01422
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(von Schleicher, Sebastian)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2022 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 888-273-3658; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 5699758; (3) when prompted, enter the four-digit Security Code: 1422.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 1/4/2022. (cds)
January 4, 2022 Filing 21 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/15/2023 at 02:00 PM and Presumptive Trial Month is March, 2023 before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 1/4/2022. (cds)
December 16, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 21-1422-GCS. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court EXTENDS the time by which Defendant may file an answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint, up to and including January 7, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 12/16/2021. (mjf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 14, 2021 Filing 18 FINAL CONSENT TO TRIAL BY U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (von Schleicher, Sebastian) Modified/unsealed on 12/16/2021 (lmb).
December 14, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Lincoln National Life Insurance Company to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company on 12/14/2021. Consent due by 1/4/2022 (lmb)
December 14, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (von Schleicher, Sebastian)
December 14, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (von Schleicher, Sebastian)
December 14, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Sebastian W. von Schleicher on behalf of Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (von Schleicher, Sebastian)
December 3, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terry Roundcount. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Padberg, Matthew)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Padberg on behalf of Plaintiff Terry Roundcount. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 23, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew J. Padberg $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-4641037 by on behalf of Terry Roundcount. (Padberg, Matthew)
November 18, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ACTION re #8 Notice of Appearance filed by Terry Roundcount. Court Records indicate that Attorney Padberg is not admitted to practice in the Southern District of Illinois; however it appears he was given CM/ECF credentials to file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Attorney Padberg needs to file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Documentation and instructions for filing a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice can be found at the courts website at www.ilsd.uscourts.gov under Rules & Forms. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 18, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Knepper, Nicole)
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Padberg on behalf of Terry Roundcount (Padberg, Matthew)
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 EXHIBIT by Terry Roundcount. Exhibit to 4 Notice of Action, Civil Cover Sheet. (Knepper, Nicole)
November 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Burlison Knepper on behalf of Terry Roundcount (Knepper, Nicole)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, and returned to Attorney Knepper for service. (kls3)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ACTION re 1 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Terry Roundcount. The Civil Cover Sheet was not signed. The Civil Cover sheet must be signed and refiled using the event found under Civil > Other Documents > Exhibit and linked back to the Complaint docket entry. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION: See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Knepper does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kls3)
November 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Terry Roundcount. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-1422-GCS. Consent due by 12/6/2021. (kls3)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4631914.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plan, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons)(Knepper, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roundcount v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Roundcount
Represented By: Nicole Burlison Knepper
Represented By: Matthew J. Padberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Sebastian W. von Schleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?