Perkins v. USP Marion et al
Plaintiff: Harold Perkins
Defendant: USP Marion and Federal Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 3:2021cv01459
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 7 Consent Form - IFP Proceedings by Harold Perkins (jaj)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Perkins, granting #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Harold Perkins. The Clerk is DIRECTED to provide two copies of the appropriate form toPlaintiff with his copy of this Order, along with a pre-addressed return envelope. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order to Plaintiff. Upon receipt of Plaintiff's signed consent form, the Clerk shall mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order and an executed copy of the consent form to the Warden at Marion United States Penitentiary, as well as e-mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order and an executed copy of the consent form to the Trust Fund Management Staff at Marion United States Penitentiary. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/1/2021. (tjk)
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Harold Perkins. (jaj)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (jaj)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Complaint. Your case number is 21-1459-NJR. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, you are ORDERED to submit the $402.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If you file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the Court must review your trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Thus, you must have the Trust Fund Officer at your facility complete the attached certification and provide a copy of your trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent). If you fail to pay the filing fee or submit the motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by the deadline, the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Sperow v. Melvin, 153 F.3d 780, 781 (7th Cir. 1998). All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 11/19/2021. (jaj)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 11/19/2021. Consent due by 12/10/2021 (jaj)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Harold Perkins.(jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins v. USP Marion et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USP Marion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?