Grosshuesch v. Mead Johnson & Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Abigail Grosshuesch
Defendant: Mead Johnson & Company, LLC and Mead Johnson Nutrition Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv01461
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Stephen P McGlynn
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stephen M Reck; granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by by Attorney Jose Rojas. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 13, 2022 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand filed by Abigail Grosshuesch. (Cates, David)
January 13, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jose Rojas $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-4679642 by on behalf of Abigail Grosshuesch. (Rojas, Jose)
January 13, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stephen M Reck $200 fee paid,receipt number BILSDC-4679397 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Reck, Stephen)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Amend/Correct. For good cause and without prejudice, defendants are granted leave to amend the Declaration of Cindy Hasseberg to reflect the correct supporting citation of 28 U.S.C. 1746. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 1/12/2022. (jce) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 11, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Amend/Correct #9 MOTION to Transfer Case , to Transfer Venue Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), 28 U.S.C. 1406, and 28 U.S.C. 1404 by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Anscombe, Anthony)
January 7, 2022 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand filed by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Cindy Hasseberg, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Cindy Hasseberg, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Cindy Hasseberg, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Amy Cook, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Justin Griner, #6 Exhibit A to Declaration of Justin Griner, #7 Exhibit B to Declaration of Justin Griner, #8 Exhibit C to Declaration of Justin Griner, #9 Affidavit Declaration of Miguel Veiga-Pestana)(Anscombe, Anthony)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 MOTION for Extension of Time. For good cause and with no objection, plaintiff is granted an additional fourteen (14) days, up to and including January 20, 2022, to file any response to #9 defendants' Motion To Transfer. Defendants' response to plaintiff's #12 Motion to Remand remains January 6, 2022. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 1/4/2022. (jce)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 4, 2022 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Objection To Defendants' Motion To Transfer filed by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (Anscombe, Anthony)
January 4, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Objection To Defendants' Motion To Transfer by All Plaintiffs. (Cates, David)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court is in receipt of #12 MOTION to Remand; defendant's response is due by January 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 12/20/2021. (jce) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 20, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Remand . Responses due by 1/10/2022 (clt)
December 17, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David I. Cates on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cates, David)
December 17, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cates, David)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court is in receipt of #9 MOTION to Transfer Case; plaintiff's response is due by January 6, 2022. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 12/7/2021. (jce) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 6, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company.(Anscombe, Anthony)
December 6, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case , to Transfer Venue Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), 28 U.S.C. 1406, and 28 U.S.C. 1404 by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cindy Hasseberg, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Anscombe, Anthony)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. For good reason and with no objection, response date is extended to December 6, 2021. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 11/29/2021. (jce) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 26, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anscombe, Anthony)
November 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Marie Noonan Witte on behalf of Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Witte, Jamie)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 Letter to Attorney Kaveny regarding General Admissions. (kdw)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stephen P. McGlynn assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-1461-SPM. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kdw)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Anscombe on behalf of Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Anscombe, Anthony)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (Anscombe, Anthony)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Madison County Circuit Court, case number 2021L 001259 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4638512), filed by Mead Johnson Nutrition Company, Mead Johnson & Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Anscombe, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grosshuesch v. Mead Johnson & Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abigail Grosshuesch
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kaveny
Represented By: David I. Cates
Represented By: Jose Rojas
Represented By: Stephen M Reck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mead Johnson & Company, LLC
Represented By: Anthony J. Anscombe
Represented By: Jamie Marie Noonan Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mead Johnson Nutrition Company
Represented By: Anthony J. Anscombe
Represented By: Jamie Marie Noonan Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?