Owners Insurance Company v. Cook et al
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: Michael Cook and Michael Schuster
Case Number: 3:2021cv01657
Filed: December 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Stephen P McGlynn
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge Stephen P. McGlynn for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 21-1657-SPM. (adh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 31, 2022 Filing 13 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Unsell, Edward)
January 19, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Michael Schuster to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Michael Schuster on 1/19/2022. Consent due by 2/9/2022 (kek)
January 18, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Schuster. Michael Schuster waiver sent on 12/10/2021, answer due 2/8/2022. (Unsell, Edward)
January 18, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Michael Schuster.(Unsell, Edward)
January 18, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward W. Unsell on behalf of Michael Schuster (Unsell, Edward)
December 15, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Price, Daniel)
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Owners Insurance Company to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Owners Insurance Company on 12/14/2021. Consent due by 1/4/2022 (mar)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison for all further proceedings. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/14/2021. (jdh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 13, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Michael Cook, Michael Schuster. Originals mailed to counsel. (adh)
December 13, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-1657 JPG. (adh)
December 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R. Price on behalf of Owners Insurance Company (Price, Daniel)
December 10, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Owners Insurance Company. (Price, Daniel)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Interpleader against All Defendants, filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Price, Daniel). $402.00 filing fee paid. Receipt number AILSDC-4654101.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owners Insurance Company v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel R. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Schuster
Represented By: Edward W. Unsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?