Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company v. Spike's Pub & Grub et al
Plaintiff: Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Spike's Pub & Grub d/b/a Vincint Von Hart LLC and Devin Elliot
Case Number: 3:2021cv01722
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2022 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment - Second against All Defendants, filed by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hickey, James)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SECOND ORDER REGARDING JURISDICTION: In the #7 Amended Complaint, Plaintiff Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company alleges the citizenship of the members of Defendant Spike's Pub & Grub, d/b/a Vincint Von Hart, LLC, based upon "information and belief." It is well settled in the Seventh Circuit, however, that jurisdictional allegations must be based on personal knowledge, not information and belief, to invoke the subject matter jurisdiction of a federal court. See Americas Best Inns, Inc. v. Best Inns of Abilene, L.P., 980 F.2d 1072, 1074 (7th Cir. 1992) (per curiam). Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a Second Amended Complaint that properly alleges a basis for this Court's jurisdiction on or before January 28, 2022. (Amended Pleadings due by 1/28/2022.) Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/14/2022. (mlp) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 13, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DELCARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants, filed by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hickey, James)
December 23, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/21/2022. (jlrr)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JURISDICTIONAL ORDER: Plaintiff Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company is ORDERED to file an Amended Complaint no later than January 21, 2022, that clearly sets forth the information needed to determine whether jurisdiction lies in this Court. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/22/2021. (mlp)
December 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J McNaughton on behalf of Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company (McNaughton, Michael)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-01722-NJR. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (clt)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Hickey on behalf of Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company (Hickey, James)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. (Hickey, James)
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4661861.), filed by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Hickey, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company v. Spike's Pub & Grub et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: James J. Hickey
Represented By: Michael J McNaughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spike's Pub & Grub d/b/a Vincint Von Hart LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Elliot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?