Inovateus Solar, LLC v. QBE Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Inovateus Solar, LLC
Defendant: QBE Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 3:2021cv01746
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Stephen P McGlynn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE by Inovateus Solar, LLC re 24 Order,,, Terminate Motions,,, Set Deadlines,, to Not Withdraw its Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration (Olszowka, Paul)
February 16, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank J Marsico on behalf of QBE Insurance Corporation (Marsico, Frank)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #23 Motion to Withdraw #18 Motion to Stay Arbitration Proceedings. The #18 Motion to Stay is WITHDRAWN without prejudice. All other deadlines in the Court's previous Order (Doc. 20) are still in place. Because it appears that both parties have agreed that a stay is unnecessary at this time, Plaintiff Inovateus Solar, LLC shall file a notice on or before 2/18/2022 as to whether it intends to also withdraw its #21 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 2/16/2022. (anb2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 15, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION to Withdraw #18 MOTION to Stay Arbitration Proceedings (Agreed)(Without Prejudice) by QBE Insurance Corporation. (Sebastian, John)
February 11, 2022 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration filed by Inovateus Solar, LLC. (Olszowka, Paul)
February 11, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration by Inovateus Solar, LLC. (Olszowka, Paul)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Plaintiff Inovateus Solar, LLC's response to #18 Motion to Stay is due on or before due by 2/17/2022. Inovateus Solar, LLC's response to #16 Motion to Deem Right to Arbitration Waived is due on or before 2/24/2022. Defendant QBE Insurance Corporation's #19 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer is GRANTED. Answer is now due on or before 3/14/2022. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 2/10/2022.(anb2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 9, 2022 Filing 19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Other Responsive Pleadings by QBE Insurance Corporation. (Sebastian, John)
February 9, 2022 Filing 18 WITHDRAWN PER ORDER AT DOC 24- MOTION to Stay Arbitration Proceedings by QBE Insurance Corporation. (Sebastian, John) Modified on 2/16/2022 (kdw).
February 9, 2022 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION to Deem Right to Arbitration Waived filed by QBE Insurance Corporation. (Sebastian, John)
February 9, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Deem Right to Arbitration Waived by QBE Insurance Corporation. (Sebastian, John)
January 28, 2022 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by QBE Insurance Corporation identifying Corporate Parent QBE Insurance Group Limited, Other Affiliate QBE Holdings, Inc. for QBE Insurance Corporation. (Sebastian, John)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Defendant's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer /Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by QBE Insurance Corporation. Answer due on or before 2/11/2022. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 1/20/2022. (cdc) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 19, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint (Agreed) by QBE Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sebastian, John)
January 19, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Sebastian on behalf of QBE Insurance Corporation (Sebastian, John)
January 19, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Charles Padove on behalf of QBE Insurance Corporation (Padove, Brian)
December 28, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to QBE Insurance Corporation (Summons at entry No.6 per request of Attorney Paul Olszowka). Original mailed to Paul Olszowka. (jlh)
December 28, 2021 Filing 9 EXHIBIT by Inovateus Solar, LLC. Exhibit to #1 Complaint, (Civil Cover Sheet). (Olszowka, Paul)
December 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ACTION. The Civil Cover Sheet was not filed as an attachment to the Complaint as instructed. The Civil Cover sheet must be filed using the event found under Civil > Other Documents > Exhibit and linked back to the Complaint docket entry. (jlh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 27, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stephen P. McGlynn assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-1746-SPM. (jlh)
December 23, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Requested. (Olszowka, Paul)
December 23, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Requested. (Olszowka, Paul)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT by Inovateus Solar, LLC. Supplement to #1 Complaint, (Civil Cover Sheet). (Olszowka, Paul)
December 23, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Inovateus Solar, LLC. (Olszowka, Paul)
December 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Olszowka on behalf of Inovateus Solar, LLC (Olszowka, Paul)
December 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against QBE Insurance Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4664652.), filed by Inovateus Solar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Olszowka, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inovateus Solar, LLC v. QBE Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inovateus Solar, LLC
Represented By: Paul Olszowka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Brian Charles Padove
Represented By: Frank J Marsico
Represented By: John E. Sebastian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?