Griffiths v. Eggemeyer et al
Plaintiff: Terri Griffiths
Defendant: Lorin Eggemeyer and Sandra Eggemeyer
Case Number: 3:2021cv01747
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Stephen P McGlynn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE AND ORDER: Pursuant to FRCP 15(a)(1), plaintiff is granted leave to file amended complaint or or before March 4, 2022. Defendant's answer shall be due 21 days after the filing of the Amended Complaint. Additionally, the Clerk is to update the docket to reflect plaintiff's email address: TerriGriffiths@Protonmail.com and in lieu of U.S. Mail, forward all filings to her via email. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 2/23/2022. (jce) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 22, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint #2 Complaint by Terri Griffiths. (amv)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. For good cause, defendants are granted up to and including March 9, 2022 to file responsive pleading. (Answer due 3/9/2022.) Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 2/16/2022. (jce) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 15, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Lorin Eggemeyer, Sandra Eggemeyer. (St. Clair, Clay)
February 15, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Clay B. St. Clair on behalf of Lorin Eggemeyer, Sandra Eggemeyer (St. Clair, Clay)
February 7, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terri Griffiths. Lorin Eggemeyer served on 1/26/2022, answer due 2/16/2022; Sandra Eggemeyer served on 1/26/2022, answer due 2/16/2022. (amv)
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lorin Eggemeyer, Sandra Eggemeyer. (Attachments: #1 Summons Lorin Eggemeyer)(amv)
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stephen P. McGlynn assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-1747-SPM. (amv)
December 23, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Lorin Eggemeyer, Sandra Eggemeyer, filed by Terri Griffiths. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, $402 filing fee received Receipt #44625014330.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffiths v. Eggemeyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Griffiths
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorin Eggemeyer
Represented By: Clay B. St. Clair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Eggemeyer
Represented By: Clay B. St. Clair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?