Anderson v. Social Security
Plaintiff: Melissa L Anderson
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00036
Filed: January 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Originals mailed to Attorney Donald Green. (jlh)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Melissa L. Anderson. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/11/2022. (drr)
January 10, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:22-cv-36-NJR. (jlh)
January 7, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald R. Green, Jr on behalf of Melissa L Anderson (Green, Donald)
January 7, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Melissa L Anderson. (Green, Donald)
January 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner Social Security, filed by Melissa L Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Civil Process Clerk, #3 Summons Summons to General Counsel, #4 Summons Summons to Attorney General, #5 Consent to Magistrate Judge Consent to Magistrate Judge)(Green, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa L Anderson
Represented By: Donald R. Green, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?