Schramm et al v. Peregrine Transportation Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Maxwell H. Schramm and Alexandria Ziegler Schramm
Defendant: Peregrine Transportation Company, LLC and Pamela J. Kidd
Case Number: 3:2022cv00161
Filed: January 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery due by 8/24/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 9/23/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report of Parties)(drb)
March 15, 2022 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 3/15/2022. Brian Wendler and Lawrence Hall participated. The Joint Report of the Parties is accepted. Should a discovery dispute arise, the parties are instructed to file a motion and response. The Court will rule on the filings or set a discovery dispute hearing. (Court Reporter n/a.) (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 25, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Count II filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wendler, Brian)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET for 3/15/2022 at 11:00 AM before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Instructions for joining the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 877-336-1831; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 9139610. The parties shall submit a Joint Report of the Parties and Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order seven (7) days prior to the conference call by email (NJRpd@ilsd.uscourts.gov). Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 2/16/2022. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDERSETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is SET for 3/10/2022 at 2:30 PM before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Instructions for joining the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 877-336-1831; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 9139610. The parties shall submit a Joint Report of the Parties and Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order seven (7) days prior to the conference call by email (NJRpd@ilsd.uscourts.gov). Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 2/4/2022. (drb)
February 4, 2022 Filing 14 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2022 at 1:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Presumptive Jury Trial month set for January 2023. (drb)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MANDATORY MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 2/4/2022. (drb)
February 1, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maxwell H. Schramm, Alexandria Ziegler Schramm. (Wendler, Brian)
February 1, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maxwell H. Schramm, Alexandria Ziegler Schramm. (Wendler, Brian)
February 1, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Wendler on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wendler, Brian)
January 26, 2022 Filing 9 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:22-cv-00161-NJR. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (clt)
January 26, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan M. Henderson on behalf of Pamela Kidd, The Peregrine Transportation Company, LLC (Henderson, Nathan)
January 26, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Pamela Kidd.(Hall, Lawrence)
January 26, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by The Peregrine Transportation Company, LLC.(Hall, Lawrence)
January 26, 2022 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Count II filed by The Peregrine Transportation Company, LLC. (Hall, Lawrence)
January 26, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Count II by The Peregrine Transportation Company, LLC. (Hall, Lawrence)
January 26, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pamela Kidd, The Peregrine Transportation Company, LLC. (Hall, Lawrence)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the 20th Judicial Circuit, case number 21L1259 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BILSDC-4691113), filed by Pamela Kidd, The Peregrine Transportation Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hall, Lawrence)
January 26, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence S. Hall on behalf of Pamela Kidd, The Peregrine Transportation Company, LLC (Hall, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schramm et al v. Peregrine Transportation Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxwell H. Schramm
Represented By: Brian M. Wendler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandria Ziegler Schramm
Represented By: Brian M. Wendler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peregrine Transportation Company, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence S. Hall
Represented By: Nathan M. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela J. Kidd
Represented By: Lawrence S. Hall
Represented By: Nathan M. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?