Gomez v. Prism Restoration, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Garey C. Gomez
Defendant: Prism Restoration, LLC and Chris Luebbers
Case Number: 3:2022cv00586
Filed: March 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Stephen P McGlynn
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #18 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Garey C. Gomez. When pleadings contain multiple attorney signatures, the non-filing attorney must include the language with consent with his/her signature. See Section 2.1 of the CM/ECF Users Manual. This notice is for informational purposes and therefore no action is required. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 12, 2022 Filing 20 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 5/12/2022. (cdc)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re Doc #18 Stipulation for Dismissal filed jointly by the parties: Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) a Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all the parties who have appeared in the action is effective immediately upon filing and does not require judicial approval. See e.g., Jenkins v Village of Maywood, 506 F.3d 622, 624 (7th Cir. 2007). Plaintiff Garey C. Gomezs claims against Defendants Prism Restoration, LLC. and Chris Luebbers are DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to the Stipulation. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close the case on the Courts Docket. Signed by Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 5/12/2022. (cdc) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 11, 2022 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Garey C. Gomez. (Rothman, Joel)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal: Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), a plaintiff may dismiss an action without a court order by filing a notice of dismissal before the opposing party serves either an answer or a motion for summary judgment. Because the opposing parties in this case have filed an answer, Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal is not effective. Plaintiff is advised to file a stipulation of dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) should he wish to dismiss the case. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 5/11/2022. (anb2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 10, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Garey C. Gomez (Rothman, Joel)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 30 DAY ORDER: The Court has been informed that the parties have settled this matter in principle, but additional time is needed to finalize the settlement documents. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED, 30 days after entry of this Order, on 6/2/2022, to ENTER JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, unless otherwise provided in the settlement documents. If the parties fail to finalize the settlement within the 30-day period, they may -- before that period expires -- move to postpone entry of judgment to a later date. Due to the settlement, the Court DENIES AS MOOT all pending motions, CANCELS all settings, and VACATES all deadlines and hearings in this case. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 5/3/2022. (anb2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 2, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement by Garey C. Gomez (Rothman, Joel)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Stephen P. McGlynn. Joint Report of the Parties due seven days before the conference. The parties are reminded that the proposed discovery, mediation and dispositive motions deadlines must be in compliance with the requirements set forth in this Court's form order. See also SDIL-LR 7.1(f) and Timetable. Instructions to join the phone conference are as follows: Call toll free 1-888-684-8852, when prompted enter access code 6102338, when prompted enter the four-digit security code 9374.Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 4/21/2022. (jsm2)
April 21, 2022 Filing 12 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2023 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Stephen P. McGlynn and Presumptive Jury Trial of May 2023. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 4/21/2022. (jsm2)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MANDATORY MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 4/21/2022. (jsm2)
April 20, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Stewart on behalf of All Defendants (Stewart, Douglas)
April 20, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Stewart, Douglas)
April 6, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Garey C. Gomez. Chris Luebbers served on 4/5/2022, answer due 4/26/2022. (Rothman, Joel)
April 6, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Garey C. Gomez. Prism Restoration, LLC served on 4/5/2022, answer due 4/26/2022. (Rothman, Joel)
March 24, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Chris Luebbers, Prism Restoration, LLC., and originals sent to Attorney Rothman. (kdw)
March 24, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel B. Rothman on behalf of Garey C. Gomez (Rothman, Joel)
March 24, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Complaint, filed by Garey C. Gomez. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Rothman does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 24, 2022 Filing 3 AO121- Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright mailed, including copy of Complaint, to Register of Copyrights this date. (kdw)
March 24, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stephen P. McGlynn assigned. All future documents must bear case number 22-586-SPM. (kdw)
March 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT (INJUNCTIVE RELIEF DEMANDED) against Chris Luebbers, Prism Restoration, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4740904.), filed by Garey C. Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2- Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons - Prism Restoration, #6 Summons - Chris L., #7 Form AO 121)(Rothman, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Prism Restoration, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garey C. Gomez
Represented By: Joel B. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prism Restoration, LLC
Represented By: Douglas Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Luebbers
Represented By: Douglas Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?