Pelzer et al v. AES Ohio et al
Plaintiff: Michael Pelzer and Marie Treuch
Defendant: AES Ohio, Consumers Energy Company, DTE Electric Company, Dynegy, Eastman Chemical Company, TVA, The Dayton Power & Electric, Alabama Power Company, Aurora Pump Company, Baltimore Gas And Electric Company, Cincinnati Gas & Electric Company (The) doing business as Duke Energy Ohio, Inc., Consumer Power, Commonwealth Edison Company, Crane Co., American Electric Company, The Detroit Edison Company, Dynegy Midwest Generating, Inc., Tennessee Eastman Company, Electric Energy Inc. (EEI), Georgia Power Company, John Crane, Northern Indiana Public Service Company, LLC, Ontario Power Generation, Inc., Southern Illinois Power Cooperative (SIPC), Tampa Electric Company, Tennessee Valley Authority and Cincinnati Gas & Electric Company doing business as Duke Energy Ohio, Inc.
Cross Defendant: Cincinnati Gas & Electric Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv00721
Filed: April 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER OF REMAND: This case is remanded to Circuit Court for the Twentieth Judicial Circuit, St. Clair County, Illinois. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 6/10/2022. (mah)
June 9, 2022 Filing 89 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant Ontario Power Generation, Inc.'s Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by Ontario Power Generation, Inc.. (Schag, Michael)
June 2, 2022 Filing 88 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Consumers Energy Company identifying Corporate Parent CMS Energy Corporation for Consumers Energy Company. (Bell, C.)
May 31, 2022 Filing 87 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, Motion to Consider Motion to Remand to Illinois State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Dickey, Aaron)
May 26, 2022 Filing 86 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Cross-Claim of Co-Defendant Southern Illinois Power Cooperative Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(2) by Cincinnati Gas & Electric Company. (Crawford, Thomas)
May 26, 2022 Filing 85 RESPONSE to Motion re #62 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by TVA. (Sanders, Christopher)
May 26, 2022 Filing 84 MOTION to Dismiss The Cross-Claim of Co-Defendant Southern Illinois Power Cooperative Without Prejudice and Memorandum of Law in Support by Tampa Electric Company. (VanDorn, Erick)
May 25, 2022 Filing 83 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #79 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Electric Energy Inc. (EEI). Corporate Parent should have been added at the time of filing the Corporate Disclosure Statement. This information has been added by the Clerk's Office. No further action is required by the filer. Notice sent for informational purposes for future filings. (adh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 25, 2022 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM in Support re #81 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint without Prejudice filed by Tampa Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(VanDorn, Erick)
May 25, 2022 Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint without Prejudice by Tampa Electric Company. (VanDorn, Erick)
May 24, 2022 Filing 80 ANSWER to Complaint by Electric Energy Inc. (EEI).(Callaghan, Amy)
May 24, 2022 Filing 79 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Electric Energy Inc. (EEI). (Callaghan, Amy)
May 23, 2022 Filing 78 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant Ontario Power Generation, Inc.'s Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by Ontario Power Generation, Inc.. (Schag, Michael)
May 23, 2022 Filing 77 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Electric Energy Inc. (EEI). (Callaghan, Amy)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER: Plaintiffs' motions for extension of time to file responses to Defendants' motions to dismiss (Docs. #72 #73 , #74 ) are GRANTED. Responses due by June 27, 2022. Plaintiffs' motion for extension of time to file response to Defendant TVA's motion to dismiss (Doc. #70 ) is TERMINATED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/20/2022. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant TVA (Doc. #61 ) is GRANTED. Defendant TVA is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate this Defendant. The pending motion to dismiss filed by Defendant TVA (Doc. #9 ) is TERMINATED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/20/2022. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 19, 2022 Filing 74 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #37 Jurisdictional Memorandum, #36 MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by All Plaintiffs. (Dickey, Aaron)
May 19, 2022 Filing 73 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #32 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by All Plaintiffs. (Dickey, Aaron)
May 19, 2022 Filing 72 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #19 Memorandum in Support of Motion by All Plaintiffs. (Dickey, Aaron)
May 19, 2022 Filing 71 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Southern Illinois Power Cooperative (SIPC) (Hill, Keith)
May 18, 2022 Filing 70 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , or, in the alternative MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Tennessee, #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by All Plaintiffs. (Dickey, Aaron)
May 17, 2022 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM in Support re #68 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Consumers Energy Company. (Bell, C.)
May 17, 2022 Filing 68 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Consumers Energy Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A)(Bell, C.)
May 12, 2022 Filing 67 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Georgia Power Company identifying Corporate Parent Southern Company for Georgia Power Company. (Volkman, Karen)
May 12, 2022 Filing 66 MEMORANDUM in Support re #65 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Cross Claim of Co-Defendant SIPC filed by Georgia Power Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kristi Dow)(Volkman, Karen)
May 12, 2022 Filing 65 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Cross Claim of Co-Defendant SIPC by Georgia Power Company. (Volkman, Karen)
May 12, 2022 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Support re #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Cross Claim of Co-Defendant SIPC filed by Alabama Power Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Teresa G. Black)(Volkman, Karen)
May 12, 2022 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Cross Claim of Co-Defendant SIPC by Alabama Power Company. (Volkman, Karen)
May 11, 2022 Filing 62 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Dickey, Aaron)
May 11, 2022 Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss by Order of the Court Pursuant to Rule 42(a)(2) as to Defendant TVA, only by All Plaintiffs. (Dickey, Aaron)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING Defendant Tampa Electric Company's Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Southern Illinois Power Cooperatives Cross-Claim (Doc. #59 ): Responsive pleading due by May 26, 2022. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/11/2022. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 10, 2022 Filing 59 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #16 Answer to Complaint,,, Crossclaim,, (Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Southern Illinois Power Cooperatives Cross-Claim) by Tampa Electric Company. (VanDorn, Erick)
May 9, 2022 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or for Failure to State a Claim by Crane Co.. (Meyer, Julie)
May 9, 2022 Filing 57 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #52 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Crane Co. Document is duplicative of the Motion filed at Doc. 49. Title of document reads that this is a Motion to Dismiss for DTE Electric Company. Docket text does not match title of document. (clt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 6, 2022 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM in Support re #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or for Failure to State a Claim filed by Eastman Chemical Company. (Meyer, Julie)
May 6, 2022 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or for Failure to State a Claim by Eastman Chemical Company. (Meyer, Julie)
May 6, 2022 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of Eastman Chemical Company (Meyer, Julie)
May 6, 2022 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM in Support re #58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or for Failure to State a Claim filed by Crane Co.. (Meyer, Julie) Modified on 5/9/2022 (clt).
May 6, 2022 Filing 52 STRICKEN. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or for Failure to State a Claim by Crane Co.. (Meyer, Julie) Modified on 5/9/2022 (clt).
May 6, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of Crane Co. (Meyer, Julie)
May 6, 2022 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM in Support re #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or for Failure to State a Claim filed by DTE Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to it's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction)(Meyer, Julie)
May 6, 2022 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or for Failure to State a Claim by DTE Electric Company. (Meyer, Julie)
May 6, 2022 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of DTE Electric Company (Meyer, Julie)
May 4, 2022 Set Deadlines: Electric Energy Inc. (EEI) answer due 5/24/2022. (kek)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING Defendant Electric Energy Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. #46 ). Responsive pleading due by May 24, 2022. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/3/2022. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 3, 2022 Filing 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Electric Energy Inc. (EEI). (Callaghan, Amy)
May 3, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Marie Callaghan on behalf of Electric Energy Inc. (EEI) (Callaghan, Amy)
April 28, 2022 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron K. Dickey on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dickey, Aaron)
April 28, 2022 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AES Ohio. (Stephens, Robert)
April 28, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William Stephens on behalf of AES Ohio (Stephens, Robert)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING Defendant Tampa Electric Company's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Doc. #27 ): Responsive pleading due by May 25, 2022. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/28/2022. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING in part Defendant Ontario Power Generation, Inc.'s Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #22 ): Responsive pleading due by May 25, 2022. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/28/2022. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 311, this case is transferred from Judge David W. Dugan and reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle. Any deadlines and schedules previously set shall remain in effect. All future pleadings shall bear the case number 22-721-SMY. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/27/2022. (dkd)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 27, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #37 Jurisdictional Memorandum filed by Cincinnati Gas & Electric Company. Incorrect event selected. Select the event that most closely matches the document being filed. For this document, the correct event is "Memorandum in Support of Motion" under the heading "Motions and Related Filings/Memorandum in Support." Docket text modified to reflect the correct document. No further action required by the filer.(clt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 26, 2022 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION #36 Motion to Dismiss by Cincinnati Gas & Electric Company. (Crawford, Thomas) Modified on 4/27/2022 (clt).
April 26, 2022 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Cincinnati Gas & Electric Company. (Crawford, Thomas)
April 26, 2022 Filing 35 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cincinnati Gas & Electric Company. (Crawford, Thomas)
April 26, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Crawford on behalf of Cincinnati Gas & Electric Company (Crawford, Thomas)
April 26, 2022 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cincinnati Gas & Electric Company identifying Corporate Parent Duke Energy Corporation for Cincinnati Gas & Electric Company. (Crawford, Thomas)
April 25, 2022 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Support re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Alabama Power Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Teresa G. Black)(Volkman, Karen)
April 25, 2022 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Alabama Power Company. (Volkman, Karen)
April 25, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen M. Volkman on behalf of Alabama Power Company (Volkman, Karen)
April 25, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy J. Cowan on behalf of Alabama Power Company (Cowan, Tracy)
April 25, 2022 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tampa Electric Company identifying Corporate Parent Teco Energy, Inc., Corporate Parent Emera US Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Emera Incorporated for Tampa Electric Company. (VanDorn, Erick)
April 25, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Tampa Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(VanDorn, Erick)
April 25, 2022 Filing 26 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Tampa Electric Company. (VanDorn, Erick)
April 25, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Erick E. VanDorn on behalf of Tampa Electric Company (VanDorn, Erick)
April 25, 2022 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Illinois Power Cooperative (SIPC). (Johnson, Jennifer)
April 25, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, filed by Ontario Power Generation, Inc. Proposed order was attached to the main document. Proposed documents are not to be filed, but rather submitted via e-mail to the Court (see CM/ECF Users Manual at pgs. 2.6-2.7). Proposed order to be deleted in accordance with this Courts practices. Proposed documents need to be e-mailed to the proper judge. (clt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 22, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant Ontario Power Generation, Inc.'s Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint and proposed Order by Ontario Power Generation, Inc. (Schag, Michael) Modified on 4/25/2022 (clt).
April 22, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Schag on behalf of Ontario Power Generation, Inc. (Schag, Michael)
April 21, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy J. Cowan on behalf of Georgia Power Company (Cowan, Tracy)
April 21, 2022 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Georgia Power Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kristi Dow)(Volkman, Karen)
April 21, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Georgia Power Company. (Volkman, Karen)
April 21, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen M. Volkman on behalf of Georgia Power Company (Volkman, Karen)
April 21, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against AES Ohio, Alabama Power Company, American Electric Company, Aurora Pump Company, Baltimore Gas And Electric Company, Cincinnati Gas & Electric Company, Commonwealth Edison Company, Consumers Energy Company, Crane Co., DTE Electric Company, Dynegy, Eastman Chemical Company, Electric Energy Inc. (EEI), Georgia Power Company, John Crane, Northern Indiana Public Service Company, LLC, Ontario Power Generation, Inc., Michael Pelzer, TVA, Tampa Electric Company, Marie Treuch by Southern Illinois Power Cooperative (SIPC).(Hill, Keith)
April 21, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #13 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, filed by Southern Illinois Power Cooperative (SIPC). Login used and signature do not match. Document was signed by Keith B. Hill and filed by Jennifer B. Johnson. Filer is directed to refile the documents. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 21, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Hill on behalf of Southern Illinois Power Cooperative (SIPC) (Hill, Keith)
April 21, 2022 Filing 13 STRICKEN ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against AES Ohio, Alabama Power Company, American Electric Company, Aurora Pump Company, Baltimore Gas And Electric Company, Cincinnati Gas & Electric Company, Commonwealth Edison Company, Consumers Energy Company, Crane Co., DTE Electric Company, Dynegy, Eastman Chemical Company, Electric Energy Inc. (EEI), Georgia Power Company, John Crane, Northern Indiana Public Service Company, LLC, Ontario Power Generation, Inc., Michael Pelzer, TVA, Tampa Electric Company, Marie Treuch by Southern Illinois Power Cooperative (SIPC).(Johnson, Jennifer)
April 21, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer B. Johnson on behalf of Southern Illinois Power Cooperative (SIPC) (Johnson, Jennifer)
April 20, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James S. Chase on behalf of TVA (Chase, James)
April 20, 2022 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , or, in the alternative MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Tennessee filed by TVA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Unpublished Opinion (Agarwal v. TVA), #2 Exhibit 2 Unpublished Opinion (Hoppers v. TVA))(Sanders, Christopher)
April 20, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , or, in the alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Tennessee by TVA. (Sanders, Christopher)
April 19, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Crane. (Danhelka, Anthony)
April 19, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony D. Danhelka on behalf of John Crane (Danhelka, Anthony)
April 14, 2022 Filing 6 Letter to Attorney Dickey regarding admission to SDIL. (kdw)
April 14, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Sanders on behalf of TVA (Sanders, Christopher)
April 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Corrected) from St. Clair County Circuit Court, case number 22LA0203, filed by TVA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanders, Christopher)
April 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #1 Notice of Removal, filed by TVA. Electronic signature omitted. See Section 2.0: page 2.1 of Users Manual. E-filer is instructed to re-file documents. In addition, See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Sanders does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 14, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge David W. Dugan assigned. All future documents must bear case number 22-721-DWD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kdw)
April 13, 2022 Filing 1 STRICKEN AT DOC. 3 - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Clair County Circuit Court, case number 22LA0203, filed by TVA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanders, Christopher) Modified on 4/29/2022 (mar).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pelzer et al v. AES Ohio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AES Ohio
Represented By: Robert William Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumers Energy Company
Represented By: C. Raymond Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DTE Electric Company
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynegy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastman Chemical Company
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TVA
Represented By: Christopher Sanders
Represented By: James S. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dayton Power & Electric
Represented By: Robert William Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Power Company
Represented By: Tracy J. Cowan
Represented By: Karen M. Volkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore Gas And Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Gas & Electric Company (The) doing business as Duke Energy Ohio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumer Power
Represented By: C. Raymond Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Edison Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Detroit Edison Company
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynegy Midwest Generating, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Eastman Company
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electric Energy Inc. (EEI)
Represented By: Amy Marie Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Power Company
Represented By: Tracy J. Cowan
Represented By: Karen M. Volkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane
Represented By: Anthony D. Danhelka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Indiana Public Service Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ontario Power Generation, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Schag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Illinois Power Cooperative (SIPC)
Represented By: Jennifer B. Johnson
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tampa Electric Company
Represented By: Erick E. VanDorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Valley Authority
Represented By: Christopher Sanders
Represented By: James S. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Gas & Electric Company doing business as Duke Energy Ohio, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Pelzer
Represented By: Aaron K. Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Treuch
Represented By: Aaron K. Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Cincinnati Gas & Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?