Wittman et al v. Olin Winchester, LLC
Plaintiff: Donnie Wittman, Corlis Mitchell, Dedria Cooley, Myldrine Clark and Robert Hartman, Jr.
Defendant: Olin Winchester, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00966
Filed: May 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines Responsive pleading due by 8/1/2022 (jlh)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Doc. #17 ): Responsive pleading due by August 1, 2022. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 6/28/2022. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 28, 2022 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Olin Winchester, LLC. (Sweitzer, Stephanie)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Stephen P. McGlynn recused. Case reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 5/23/2022. (jsm2)
May 17, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge Stephen P. McGlynn for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 22-00966-SPM. (jlh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 16, 2022 Filing 14 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Schuver, Mark)
May 12, 2022 Set Deadlines: Olin Winchester, LLC answer due 6/30/2022. (kek)
May 11, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Montana L Sinn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sinn, Montana)
May 11, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S. Schuver on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Schuver, Mark)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re 10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. This order is updated to reflect a full thirty day extension. Defendant may file an answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint on or before June 30, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 5/11/2022. (mjf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court extends the deadline by which Defendant may file an answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint by thirty days, up to and including June 13, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 5/11/2022. (mjf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 10, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant's Unopposed Motion For an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Olin Winchester, LLC. (Sweitzer, Stephanie)
May 10, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Olin Winchester, LLC. Login used and signature do not match. Filer will re-file document. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 10, 2022 Filing 7 STRICKEN. MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Olin Winchester, LLC. (Dempsey, Christopher) Modified on 5/10/2022 (kls3).
May 10, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Dempsey on behalf of Olin Winchester, LLC (Dempsey, Christopher)
May 9, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: All Parties. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 22-cv-966-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 5/31/2022 (jlrr)
May 6, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Olin Winchester, LLC. (Sweitzer, Stephanie)
May 6, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie L. Sweitzer on behalf of Olin Winchester, LLC (Sweitzer, Stephanie)
May 6, 2022 Filing 2 EXHIBIT by Olin Winchester, LLC. Civil Cover Sheet. (Sweitzer, Stephanie)
May 6, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from In the Circuit Court of the Third Judicial Circuit, Madison County, Illinois, case number 2022LA000448 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4780503), filed by Olin Winchester, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Action (Summons and Complaint), #2 Exhibit B - Decl. of K. Murphy iso Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Decl. of SLS iso Removal)(Sweitzer, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wittman et al v. Olin Winchester, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie Wittman
Represented By: Mark S. Schuver
Represented By: Montana L Sinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corlis Mitchell
Represented By: Mark S. Schuver
Represented By: Montana L Sinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dedria Cooley
Represented By: Mark S. Schuver
Represented By: Montana L Sinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myldrine Clark
Represented By: Mark S. Schuver
Represented By: Montana L Sinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hartman, Jr.
Represented By: Mark S. Schuver
Represented By: Montana L Sinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olin Winchester, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie L. Sweitzer
Represented By: Christopher B. Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?