American Towers LLC et al v. SI Wireless, LLC
Plaintiff: American Towers LLC, GTP Towers VIII, LLC, ATC South, LLC, American Tower Management, LLC, ATC Ponderosa K LLC, IWG, II LLC, GrainComm III, LLC, GTP Towers I, LLC, GTP Acquisition Partners II, LLC, ATC Sequoia, LLC and ATC Sequoia LLC
Defendant: SI Wireless, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv01083
Filed: May 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John C. Grellner on behalf of Defendant SI Wireless, LLC. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 15, 2022 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SI Wireless, LLC. (Cohen, Steven)
July 15, 2022 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by SI Wireless, LLC.(Cohen, Steven)
July 15, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #22 Answer to Complaint filed by SI Wireless, LLC, #23 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by SI Wireless, LLC. Login used and signature do not match. Filer to re-file documents.(kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 15, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John C. Grellner $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-4833899 by on behalf of SI Wireless, LLC. (Grellner, John)
July 15, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE OF ACTION: See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Grellner does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 13, 2022 Filing 23 STRICKEN. Corporate Disclosure Statement by SI Wireless, LLC. (Grellner, John) Modified on 7/15/2022 (kls3).
July 13, 2022 Filing 22 STRICKEN. ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by SI Wireless, LLC.(Grellner, John) Modified on 7/15/2022 (kls3).
June 24, 2022 Filing 21 CJRA TRACK C assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 10/19/2023 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 11/6/2023 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Parties are to submit a Joint Report regarding Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order within 28 days of the entry of this filing. Scheduling/Discovery and Settlement Conferences will NOT be set for hearing unless requested by the parties or deemed necessary by the Court. Joint Proposed Discovery due by 7/22/2022. (tag).
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MANDATORY MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/24/2022. (tag)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Answer due 7/13/2022. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/24/2022. (jdh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 23, 2022 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SI Wireless, LLC. (Cohen, Steven)
June 23, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Cohen on behalf of SI Wireless, LLC (Cohen, Steven)
June 17, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. SI Wireless, LLC served on 6/2/2022, answer due 6/23/2022. (Kingsbury, Colby)
May 31, 2022 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to SI Wireless, LLC., and original mailed to Attorney Kingsbury. (kdw)
May 25, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Ehren M. Fournier on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fournier, Ehren)
May 23, 2022 Filing 13 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:22-cv-1083-JPG. (kls3)
May 20, 2022 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ATC Sequoia, LLC identifying Corporate Parent American Tower Corporation, Corporate Parent American Towers LLC for ATC Sequoia, LLC. (Kingsbury, Colby)
May 20, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GTP Acquisition Partners II, LLC identifying Corporate Parent American Tower Corporation, Corporate Parent GTP Acquisition Partners I, LLC for GTP Acquisition Partners II, LLC. (Kingsbury, Colby)
May 20, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GTP Towers I, LLC identifying Corporate Parent American Tower Corporation, Corporate Parent GTP Acquisition Partners I, LLC for GTP Towers I, LLC. (Kingsbury, Colby)
May 20, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GrainComm III, LLC identifying Corporate Parent American Tower Corporation, Corporate Parent Grain HoldCo, LLC for GrainComm III, LLC. (Kingsbury, Colby)
May 20, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IWG, II LLC identifying Corporate Parent American Tower Corporation, Corporate Parent IWG II Holdings, LLC for IWG, II LLC. (Kingsbury, Colby)
May 20, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ATC Ponderosa K LLC identifying Corporate Parent American Tower Corporation, Corporate Parent ATC Ponderosa K-R LLC for ATC Ponderosa K LLC. (Kingsbury, Colby)
May 20, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Tower Management, LLC identifying Corporate Parent American Tower Corporation, Corporate Parent American Towers LLC for American Tower Management, LLC. (Kingsbury, Colby)
May 20, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ATC South, LLC identifying Corporate Parent American Tower Corporation, Corporate Parent American Towers LLC for ATC South, LLC. (Kingsbury, Colby)
May 20, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GTP Towers VIII, LLC identifying Corporate Parent American Tower Corporation, Corporate Parent GTP Acquisition Partners I, LLC for GTP Towers VIII, LLC. (Kingsbury, Colby)
May 20, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Towers LLC identifying Corporate Parent American Tower Corporation for American Towers LLC. (Kingsbury, Colby)
May 20, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Colby A. Kingsbury on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kingsbury, Colby)
May 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4792015.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B(1), #3 Exhibit B(2), #4 Exhibit B(3), #5 Exhibit B(4), #6 Exhibit B(5), #7 Exhibit B(6), #8 Exhibit B(7), #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons to SI Wireless LLC)(Kingsbury, Colby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Towers LLC et al v. SI Wireless, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Towers LLC
Represented By: Colby A. Kingsbury
Represented By: Ehren M. Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GTP Towers VIII, LLC
Represented By: Colby A. Kingsbury
Represented By: Ehren M. Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATC South, LLC
Represented By: Colby A. Kingsbury
Represented By: Ehren M. Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Tower Management, LLC
Represented By: Colby A. Kingsbury
Represented By: Ehren M. Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATC Ponderosa K LLC
Represented By: Colby A. Kingsbury
Represented By: Ehren M. Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IWG, II LLC
Represented By: Colby A. Kingsbury
Represented By: Ehren M. Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GrainComm III, LLC
Represented By: Colby A. Kingsbury
Represented By: Ehren M. Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GTP Towers I, LLC
Represented By: Colby A. Kingsbury
Represented By: Ehren M. Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GTP Acquisition Partners II, LLC
Represented By: Colby A. Kingsbury
Represented By: Ehren M. Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATC Sequoia, LLC
Represented By: Colby A. Kingsbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATC Sequoia LLC
Represented By: Colby A. Kingsbury
Represented By: Ehren M. Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SI Wireless, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: John C. Grellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?