Wakefield v. Franklin County Courts et al
Plaintiff: Eric L. Wakefield
Defendant: Franklin County Courts, Kevin Popit and Ed Dorcey
Case Number: 3:2022cv01772
Filed: August 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Warrant of Arrests by Eric L. Wakefield. (kare)
September 28, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Sanctions by Eric L. Wakefield. (kare)
September 22, 2022 Filing 14 Letter from Eric Wakefield to the Court (kare)
September 12, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel by Eric L. Wakefield. (kare)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Court has received your Letter (Doc. 11) asking the Court to contact your family members for payment of filing fees in all of your recent matters (22-cv-1764, 22-cv-1766, 22-cv-1767; 22-cv-1768; 22-cv-1769; 22-cv-1772). However, the Court notes that you also submitted a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in this case, and your motion was granted. Now that you have pauper status, your filing fee is $350, and you are not required to make any immediate payment. Payments will be automatically collected from your inmate account any time the account has more than $10. Payments will not be collected if you have less than $10. You are not required to take any further action on the fee issue. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/2/2022. (jsy) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING #9 Motion to Subpoena Records. Plaintiff seeks miscellaneous documents, records, and videos in six different cases, including this one. However, the complaint in this case has not yet been reviewed under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, and no claims have proceeded past screening. Discovery on the merits has not yet commenced, and most of his requests do not even pertain to issues addressed in this case. Accordingly, the motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/30/2022. (jsy) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 26, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Subpoena Records by Eric L. Wakefield. (Attachments: #1 Cert of Serv)(kare)
August 25, 2022 Filing 11 Letter from Plaintiff (amv)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (Doc. #4 ). Plaintiff has been without funds for six months, he is currently without funds, and he appears to have no means currently with which to pay an initial partial filing fee. Accordingly, the Court will not assess an initial partial filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(4). Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid.In addition, Plaintiff shall note that the filing fees for multiple cases cumulate. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 436 (7th Cir. 1997), overruled in part on other grounds by Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000); Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626 (7th Cir. 2000). A prisoner who files one suit must remit 20% of his monthly income to the Clerk of the Court until his fees have been paid; a prisoner who files a second suit or an appeal must remit 40%; and so on. Newlin, 123 F.3d at 436. "Five suits or appeals mean that the prisoner's entire monthly income must be turned over to the court until the fees have been paid." Id. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at the Franklin County Jail upon entry of this Order. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/23/2022. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court has received your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/23/2022. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 22, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT/REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, this case will remain with the assigned District Judge J. Phil Gilbert. This Notice does not alter any prior referrals of motions or matters pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(b)(1-3). (kare)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 22, 2022 Filing 5 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (kare)
August 22, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric L. Wakefield. (kare)
August 3, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Eric L. Wakefield to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Eric L. Wakefield on 8/3/2022. Consent due by 8/24/2022 (kare)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Complaint. Your case number is 22-1772-JPG. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, you are ORDERED to submit the $402.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If you file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the Court must review your trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Thus, you must have the Trust Fund Officer at your facility complete the attached certification and provide a copy of your trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent). If you fail to pay the filing fee or submit the motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by the deadline, the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Sperow v. Melvin, 153 F.3d 780, 781 (7th Cir. 1998). All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case.. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/3/2022. (kare)
August 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Eric L. Wakefield. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kare)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wakefield v. Franklin County Courts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric L. Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin County Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Popit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Dorcey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?