Bartlett v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Bartlett
Defendant: Officer Tyson Brown, Officer Justin T. Moore, Officer Zachary D. Fenton, Officer Marcelus R Ottensmeier, Tyson Brown, Justin T. Moore, Zachary D. Fenton and Marcelus R. Ottensmeier
Intervenor: C. Norris Law Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv01792
Filed: August 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Fuller on behalf of Tyson Brown (Fuller, Victoria)
August 31, 2022 Filing 16 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Fuller, Victoria)
August 31, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT/REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, this case will remain with the assigned District Judge Staci M. Yandle. This Notice does not alter any prior referrals of motions or matters pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(b)(1-3). (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 31, 2022 Filing 14 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Orozco, Brian)
August 31, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #12 Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge. The Clerk's Office received your Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form. The form is incomplete. It fails to list each party's name who is consenting or not consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction ("Plaintiff" is insufficient). Therefore, the pleading is STRICKEN. Another form is attached to this Notice. The form should be re-filed as soon as possible. The form should specifically list each party's name who is consenting or not consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Please note that, pursuant to the Court's prior Order, the deadline for submitting this form is 9/6/2022. (kek)
August 30, 2022 Filing 12 STRICKEN - CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Orozco, Brian) Modified on 8/31/2022 (kek).
August 30, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE: Plaintiff was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Plaintiff shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. Consent due by 9/6/2022 (csb)
August 29, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Marcelus R. Ottensmeier to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Marcelus R. Ottensmeier on 8/29/2022. Consent due by 9/19/2022 (kek)
August 26, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Fuller on behalf of Marcelus R. Ottensmeier (Fuller, Victoria)
August 24, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #7 Waiver of Service Executed filed by Benjamin Bartlett. Incorrect waiver sent date used. Modified date to 8/8/22 and answer date updated. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 23, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Benjamin Bartlett. Marcelus R. Ottensmeier waiver sent on 8/8/2022, answer due 10/7/2022. (Orozco, Brian) Modified service date; answer date on 8/24/2022 (lmb).
August 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE by C. Norris Law Group, LLC Attorneys' Lien (Orozco, Brian)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE #1 Complaint. Plaintiff filed the instant lawsuit pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 alleging deprivations of his constitutional rights while incarcerated at Menard Correctional Center. Plaintiff is represented by counsel, paid the full filing fee, and was not in custody at the time of filing. As a result, the Complaint does not require a merit review pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Further, Plaintiff is responsible for effecting service on the named Defendants, who are current or former employees of the Illinois Department of Corrections. If a Defendant cannot be found at Menard Correctional Center for purposes of service, Menard/IDOC shall furnish Plaintiff's counsel with the Defendant's current work address, or, if not known, the Defendant's last-known address. This information shall be used only for effecting service. Any address for a Defendant other than an IDOC facility address shall be REDACTED from all filings with the Court, documentation of the addresses shall not be maintained in the court file or disclosed by the Clerk, and the address shall not be disclosed to Plaintiff. See Sellers v. United States, 902 F.2d 598, 602 (7th Cir.1990) (finding that inmates are not entitled to personal information about correctional employees and disclosing the information creates a threat to that employee's personal safety). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/8/2022. (ksp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 8, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 8/8/2022. Consent due by 8/29/2022 (jaj)
August 8, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle assigned. All future documents must bear case number 22-1792-SMY. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (jaj)
August 5, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Orozco on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Orozco, Brian)
August 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AT LAW against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4851731.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Orozco, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartlett v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Bartlett
Represented By: Brian M. Orozco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Tyson Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Justin T. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Zachary D. Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Marcelus R Ottensmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Brown
Represented By: Victoria Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin T. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary D. Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcelus R. Ottensmeier
Represented By: Victoria Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: C. Norris Law Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?