Eclipse Sportswire v. Reliable Computer Professionals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eclipse Sportswire
Defendant: Reliable Computer Professionals, Inc. doing business as Elegant Horse Pictures, Patrick M. Mooney and Fanatics Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv02335
Filed: October 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eclipse Sportswire. Fanatics Inc. served on 11/18/2022, answer due 12/9/2022. (Voytas, Richard)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Fanatics Inc. Original mailed to Voytas Law, LLC. (aza)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Eclipse Sportswire. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Summons)(Voytas, Richard)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Given that this matter is still in the pleadings stage, and Defendants have not yet appeared, the Court sees no reason why Plaintiff should not be allowed to amend its complaint. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2) ("The court should freely give leave when justice so requires.") Plaintiff shall file its First Amended Complaint on or before November 23, 2022. Should Defendants appear in the interim, they need not file a responsive pleading to the original complaint; they can wait and file a responsive pleading to the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 11/17/2022. (klh2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/23/2022. (aza)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Eclipse Sportswire. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Voytas, Richard)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Voytas, Richard)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE: Eclipse Sportswire, Reliable Computer Professionals, Inc., and Patrick M. Mooney were directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Eclipse Sportswire, Reliable Computer Professionals, Inc., and Patrick M. Mooney shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. Consent due by 11/9/2022 (aza)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eclipse Sportswire. Patrick M. Mooney served on 10/12/2022, answer due 11/2/2022. (Voytas, Richard)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eclipse Sportswire. Reliable Computer Professionals, Inc. served on 10/12/2022, answer due 11/2/2022. (Voytas, Richard)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AO 120 Report on Filing(aza)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Patrick M. Mooney, Reliable Computer Professionals, Inc.. Originals mailed to Richard A. Voytas, Jr. (aza)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: All Parties. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:22-CV-02335-MAB. Consent due by 11/1/2022 (aza)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eclipse Sportswire (Voytas, Richard)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE by Eclipse Sportswire (Voytas, Richard)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Patrick M. Mooney, Reliable Computer Professionals, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4901436.), filed by Eclipse Sportswire. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Voytas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eclipse Sportswire v. Reliable Computer Professionals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eclipse Sportswire
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliable Computer Professionals, Inc. doing business as Elegant Horse Pictures
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick M. Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fanatics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?