London v. Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Allissa M. London
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2022cv02670
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Stephen P McGlynn
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING SOCIAL SECURITY BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Defendant's brief due within 30 days after filing of plaintiff's brief. Plaintiff brief due by 2/3/2023. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 1/5/2023. (kek)
January 4, 2023 Filing 25 SUBMISSION OF TRANSCRIPT of Administrative Record. filed by Nathan E. Wyatt on behalf of Commissioner Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court Transcript Index, #2 Exhibit Docs Related to Admin Process, #3 Exhibit Payment Docs and Decisions, #4 Exhibit Jurisdictional Docs and Notices, #5 Exhibit Non-Disability Related Development, #6 Exhibit Disability Related Development, #7 Exhibit Medical Records)(Wyatt, Nathan)
January 4, 2023 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner Social Security.(Wyatt, Nathan)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Answer now due on or before 1/5/2023. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 11/29/2022. (anb2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 28, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Commissioner Social Security. (Yarnell, Eric)
November 23, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan E. Wyatt on behalf of Commissioner Social Security (Wyatt, Nathan)
November 16, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Charles Yarnell on behalf of Commissioner Social Security (Yarnell, Eric)
November 15, 2022 Filing 19 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stephen P. McGlynn assigned. All future documents must bear case number 22-cv-2670-SPM. (jlrr)
November 15, 2022 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:22-cv-04615. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 15, 2022 Filing 17 TRANSFERRED to the USDC Southern District of Illinois the electronic record. (jg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2022.]
October 25, 2022 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Attorney Maren Bam's Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel #14 is granted. Attorney Maren Bam is terminated as counsel for Plaintiff. Mailed notice (lp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2022.]
October 24, 2022 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Allissa M. London in support of motion to withdraw as attorney #14 (Bam, Maren) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2022.]
October 24, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION by Attorney Maren Miller Bam to withdraw as attorney for Allissa M. London. No party information provided (Bam, Maren) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2022.]
October 24, 2022 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Defendant's Agreed Motion to Transfer Venue #11 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (lp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2022.]
October 24, 2022 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by Acting Commissioner Social Security in support of motion to transfer case #11 (Lambert, Kate) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2022.]
October 24, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Acting Commissioner Social Security to transfer case (Agreed) (Lambert, Kate) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2022.]
October 7, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allissa M. London as to Acting Commissioner Social Security served on 9/20/2022, answer due 11/21/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipts)(Binder, Charles) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2022.]
September 28, 2022 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: This matter has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maria Valdez for ruling on final disposition of the case. If the case was previously remanded, the parties shall file a short joint statement within 14 days providing pertinent past case information. They are also directed to review the LR 16.4 Scheduling in Social Security Cases available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov and this Court's Standing Order in Social Security Cases. No further order will be entered regarding setting dates for a briefing schedule. Mailed notice (lp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2022.]
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Maria Valdez, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 9/27/2022. (jg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2022.]
September 27, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Telephone Conference set for 11/2/22 is vacated. [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2022.]
September 9, 2022 Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Binder, Charles) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2022.]
September 3, 2022 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Kate F Lambert as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Acting Commissioner Social Security (Lambert, Kate) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2022.]
August 31, 2022 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephone Conference set for 11/2/22 at 9:15 a.m. Dial: 888-684-8852 or 215-446-0155, access code: 9582710#. Joint status report shall be filed by 10/24/22. Mailed notice (maf) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2022.]
August 31, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (jb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2022.]
August 30, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Allissa M. London by Maren Ann-miller Bam (Bam, Maren) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2022.]
August 30, 2022 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Allissa M. London by Charles E Binder (Binder, Charles) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2022.]
August 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Allissa M. London; no. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19791725. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Binder, Charles) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2022.]
August 30, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (kra, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2022.]
August 30, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kra, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: London v. Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allissa M. London
Represented By: Charles E. Binder
Represented By: Maren Ann-miller Bam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security
Represented By: Kate F Lambert
Represented By: Eric Charles Yarnell
Represented By: Nathan E. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?