Rose et al v. Dabur International Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Carla G. Rose, Dollie Dillon and Theresa L. Baldwin
Defendant: DABUR INTERNATIONAL LTD. d/b/a DABUR USA, INC., DABUR INTERNATIONAL LTD. and NAMASTE LABORATORIES, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv02686
Filed: November 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2022 Filing 17 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Dabur International Ltd., Namaste Laboratories, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dermoviva Skin Essentials Inc. for Namaste Laboratories, LLC; Corporate Parent Dabur India Limited for Dabur International Ltd.. (Welch, Donna)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 Amended Complaint by Dabur International Ltd., Namaste Laboratories, LLC. (Doc. #15 ). Defendants shall have an extension of thirty (30) days after the JPML rules on the MDL Motion to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/9/2022. (drr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 9, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 Amended Complaint by Dabur International Ltd., Namaste Laboratories, LLC. (Welch, Donna)
December 9, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Donna M. Welch on behalf of Dabur International Ltd., Namaste Laboratories, LLC (Welch, Donna)
December 7, 2022 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dabur International Ltd., Namaste Laboratories, LLC, filed by Dollie Dillon, Theresa L. Baldwin.(Geisler, Ephraim)
December 2, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Hoekstra on behalf of Dollie Dillon, Carla G. Rose (Hoekstra, Jennifer)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer M. Hoekstra on behalf of Dollie Dillon, Carla G. Rose.(jlh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 2, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer M. Hoekstra $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-4942278 by on behalf of Dollie Dillon, Carla G. Rose. (Hoekstra, Jennifer)
December 2, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carla G. Rose, Dollie Dillon. (Geisler, Ephraim)
December 2, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carla G. Rose, Dollie Dillon. Dabur International Ltd. served on 11/21/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. (Geisler, Ephraim)
December 2, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Rodgers Pfeifler on behalf of Dollie Dillon, Carla G. Rose (Pfeifler, Hannah)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Hannah Rodgers Pfeifler on behalf of Dollie Dillon, Carla G. Rose.(jlh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 30, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Hannah Rodgers Pfeifler $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-4940221 by on behalf of Dollie Dillon, Carla G. Rose. (Pfeifler, Hannah)
November 17, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to DABUR INTERNATIONAL LTD., DABUR INTERNATIONAL LTD. d/b/a DABUR USA, INC., NAMASTE LABORATORIES, LLC. Originals mailed to Attorney Geisler. (jlh)
November 17, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 22-2686-NJR. (jlh)
November 17, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ephraim S. Geisler on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Geisler, Ephraim)
November 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DABUR INTERNATIONAL LTD., DABUR INTERNATIONAL LTD. d/b/a DABUR USA, INC., NAMASTE LABORATORIES, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4931598.), filed by Carla G. Rose, Dollie Dillon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Dabur International Ltd dba Dabur USA Inc, #3 Summons Dabur International Ltd, #4 Summons Namaste Laboratories LLC)(Geisler, Ephraim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose et al v. Dabur International Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla G. Rose
Represented By: Ephraim S. Geisler
Represented By: Hannah Rodgers Pfeifler
Represented By: Jennifer M. Hoekstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dollie Dillon
Represented By: Ephraim S. Geisler
Represented By: Hannah Rodgers Pfeifler
Represented By: Jennifer M. Hoekstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa L. Baldwin
Represented By: Ephraim S. Geisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DABUR INTERNATIONAL LTD. d/b/a DABUR USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DABUR INTERNATIONAL LTD.
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAMASTE LABORATORIES, LLC
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?