Moore v. Sentry Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: James C Moore
Defendant: Sentry Life Insurance Company, American Medical Association and AMA Insurance Agency Inc
Case Number: 3:2022cv02892
Filed: December 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #28 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement filed by AMA Insurance Agency Inc. AMA Services, Inc. identified as parent corporation but was not added by filer under Case Participants. Information has been added by Clerk's office. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (adh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' responsive pleading is due on or before February 16, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 1/30/2023. THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by AMA Insurance Agency Inc. (Rankin, W.)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by American Medical Association. (Rankin, W.)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF ACTION re #23 Notice of Appearance filed by American Medical Association, AMA Insurance Agency Inc. Because the required Disclosure Statement was not filed with the attached, this matter is being submitted to the presiding judge for further action. A copy of this Court's form Disclosure Statement can be found at #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing American Medical Association and AMA Insurance Agency Inc to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to American Medical Association and AMA Insurance Agency Inc on 1/26/23. Consent due by 2/16/2023 (lmb)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Shared Deadline by All Defendants. (Rankin, W.)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Jason Rankin on behalf of AMA Insurance Agency Inc, American Medical Association (Rankin, W.)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Rankin, W.)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James C Moore. American Medical Association served on 1/12/2023, answer due 2/2/2023. (csb)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James C Moore. AMA Insurance Agency Inc served on 1/12/2023, answer due 2/2/2023. (csb)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Sentry Life Insurance Company. (Rankin, W.)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #12 Defendant Sentry Life Insurance Company's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant Sentry Life Insurance Company requests additional time to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint. The motion is GRANTED and Defendant Sentry Life Insurance Company's responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint is now due on or before January 30, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 1/4/2023. (spl)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Electronic Case Filing. Plaintiff James C. Moore is hereby GRANTED access (via login and password) to the District Court's electronic case filing system. To access the electronic case filing system, Plaintiff must go to the District Court's website and complete the Electronic Filing Registration Form (www.ilsd.uscourts.gov, click on "Electronic Case Filing" tab). Plaintiff should review the Electronic Filing Rules prior to utilizing the system, which are attached to this Order. The Clerk's Office shall provide a copy of this Order to Plaintiff by regular mail. Plaintiff is ADVISED that once he is registered for electronic filing, the Clerk's Office will no longer mail him paper copies of documents that are filed. The Court allows Plaintiff 14 days to complete this process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 1/4/2023. (spl)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF ACTION re #11 Notice of Appearance filed by Sentry Life Insurance Company. Because the required Disclosure Statement was not filed with the attached, this matter is being submitted to the presiding judge for further action. A copy of this Court's form Disclosure Statement can be found at #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx.(bmc)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Sentry Life Insurance Company to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Sentry Life Insurance Company on 01/03/2023. Consent due by 1/24/2023 (bmc)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE: James C. Moore was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, James C. Moore shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. Consent due by 1/10/2023 (csb)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Sentry Life Insurance Company. (Rankin, W.)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Jason Rankin on behalf of Sentry Life Insurance Company (Rankin, W.)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Reissued as to AMA Insurance Agency Inc, American Medical Association, Sentry Life Insurance Company. Originals sent to James C. Moore, MD.
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (csb)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by James C Moore. (csb)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF ERRATA by James C Moore (clw)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF ACTION re #3 Complaint filed by James C Moore. Because the required Disclosure Statement was not filed with the attached, this matter is being submitted to the presiding judge for further action. A copy of this Court's form Disclosure Statement can be found at: https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx.(kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summonses Issued as to AMA Insurance Agency Inc, American Medical Association, and Sentry Life Insurance Company. Originals mailed to Plaintiff for service. (csb)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Electronic Case Filing by James C Moore. (csb)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James C Moore. (csb)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James C Moore. Receipt No. 1407 for $402.(csb)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing James C. Moore to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to James C. Moore on 12/09/2022. Consent due by 12/30/2022 (csb)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 22-2892-MAB. (csb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Sentry Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentry Life Insurance Company
Represented By: W. Jason Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Association
Represented By: W. Jason Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMA Insurance Agency Inc
Represented By: W. Jason Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?