Kessler v. Casey's General Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Summer Kessler
Defendant: Casey's General Stores, Inc., Casey's Marketing Company and Casey's Retail Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv02971
Filed: December 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Stephen P McGlynn
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brendan Johnson. (csb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John Lassetter. (csb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 7, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brendan Johnson $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-4995606 by on behalf of Casey's General Stores, Inc., Casey's Marketing Company, Casey's Retail Company. (Johnson, Brendan)
February 7, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John Lassetter $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-4995583 by on behalf of Casey's General Stores, Inc., Casey's Marketing Company, Casey's Retail Company. (Lassetter, John)
January 20, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Summer Kessler. Casey's Retail Company waiver sent on 12/21/2022, answer due 2/21/2023. (Werman, Douglas)
January 20, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Summer Kessler. Casey's Marketing Company waiver sent on 12/21/2022, answer due 2/21/2023. (Werman, Douglas)
January 20, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Summer Kessler. Casey's General Stores, Inc. waiver sent on 12/21/2022, answer due 2/21/2023. (Werman, Douglas)
January 3, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #5 Waiver of Service Executed, filed by Summer Kessler. Document filed incorrectly. Separate waivers must be filed for each named defendant in order to properly trigger the correct answer deadline. Filer will need to refile the documents separately. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 28, 2022 Filing 5 STRICKEN WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Summer Kessler. Casey's General Stores, Inc. waiver sent on 12/21/2022, answer due 2/21/2023; Casey's Marketing Company waiver sent on 12/21/2022, answer due 2/21/2023; Casey's Retail Company waiver sent on 12/21/2022, answer due 2/21/2023. (Werman, Douglas) Modified on 1/3/2023 (kdw).
December 20, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stephen P. McGlynn assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:22-CV-2971-SPM. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (clw)
December 20, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by Summer Kessler of Filing Consent to Join Form of Felicia De Leon and Tracy E. Willoughby (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Werman, Douglas)
December 19, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas M. Werman on behalf of Summer Kessler (Werman, Douglas)
December 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Collective and Class Action Complaint) against Casey's General Stores, Inc., Casey's Marketing Company, Casey's Retail Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4955740.), filed by Summer Kessler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Werman, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kessler v. Casey's General Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summer Kessler
Represented By: Douglas M. Werman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey's General Stores, Inc.
Represented By: John Lassetter
Represented By: Brendan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey's Marketing Company
Represented By: John Lassetter
Represented By: Brendan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey's Retail Company
Represented By: Brendan Johnson
Represented By: John Lassetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?