Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. JJJR Silver Creek Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL, INC. d/b/a IRVING MUSIC, BOY MEETS GIRL MUSIC, RICK SPRINGFIELD MUSIC, GIBB BROTHERS MUSIC, CROMPTON SONGS, ZOMBIES ATE MY PUBLISHING, Forthefallen Publishing, RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT INC. d/b/a RESERVOIR 416 a/k/a RESERVOIR ONE AMERICA, 3RING CIRCUS MUSIC, LLC d/b/a SOULRIDE MUSIC, ROUND HILL MUSIC LP d/b/a ROUND HILL WORKS, Cackalacki Twang, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, House of Gaga Publishing LLC, REDONE PRODUCTIONS LLC d/b/a SONGS OF REDONE, Rondor Music International Inc doing business as Irving Music, Reservoir Media Management Inc. doing business as Reservoir 416 doing business as Reservoir One America, 3Ring Circus Music, LLC doing business as Soulride Music, Round Hill Music LP doing business as Round Hill Works and Redone Productions LLC doing business as Songs of Redone
Defendant: JJJR SILVER CREEK INC. d/b/a SILVER CREEK SALOON, JAMES SINOVIC, JR., JEFF BUTZINGER, JONATHAN VIELUF, RYAN LOEFFLER and JJJR Silver Creek Inc. doing business as Silver Creek Saloon
Case Number: 3:2023cv00052
Filed: January 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 504 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ACTION re #15 Notice of Appearance filed by Ryan Loeffler, Jonathan Vieluf, James Sinovic, Jr., JJJR Silver Creek Inc., Jeff Butzinger. Because the required Disclosure Statement was not filed with the attached, this matter is being submitted to the presiding judge for further action. A copy of this Court's form Disclosure Statement can be found at #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 8, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing JJJR Silver Creek Inc., James Sinovic, Jr., Jeff Butzinger, Jonathan Vieluf, Ryan Loeffler to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 257 and 341, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to JJJR Silver Creek Inc., James Sinovic, Jr., Jeff Butzinger, Jonathan Vieluf, Ryan Loeffler on 3/8/23. Consent due by 3/29/2023 (lmb)
March 7, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R. Magdy on behalf of All Defendants (Magdy, Andrew)
February 16, 2023 Filing 14 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Menold, Noah)
February 16, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #12 Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge. The Clerks Office received your Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form. The form is incomplete. It fails to list each party that is consenting or not consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction ("All Plaintiffs" is insufficient). Therefore, the pleading is STRICKEN. Another form is attached to this Notice. The form should be re-filed as soon as possible. The form should specifically list each party that is consenting or not consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Please note that, pursuant to the Courts prior Order, the deadline for submitting this form is 2/9/2023 (adh)
February 14, 2023 Filing 12 STRICKEN CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Menold, Noah)
February 14, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 10 Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge. The Clerks Office received your Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form. The form is incomplete. It fails to list each party that is consenting or not consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction ("et al" is insufficient). Therefore, the pleading is STRICKEN. Another form is attached to this Notice. The form should be re-filed as soon as possible. The form should specifically list each party that is consenting or not consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Please note that, pursuant to the Courts prior Order, the deadline for submitting this form is 2/9/2023.(lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 13, 2023 Filing 10 ENTRY STRICKEN: CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Menold, Noah) Modified on 2/14/2023 (lmb).
February 2, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE: 3Ring Circus Music, LLC, Beechwood Music Corporation, Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Cackalacki Twang, Crompton Songs, Forthefallen Publishing, Gibb Brothers Music, House of Gaga Publishing LLC, Redone Productions LLC, Reservoir Media Management Inc., Rick Springfield Music, Rondor Music International Inc, Round Hill Music LP, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Zombies Ate My Publishing was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, 3Ring Circus Music, LLC, Beechwood Music Corporation, Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Cackalacki Twang, Crompton Songs, Forthefallen Publishing, Gibb Brothers Music, House of Gaga Publishing LLC, Redone Productions LLC, Reservoir Media Management Inc., Rick Springfield Music, Rondor Music International Inc, Round Hill Music LP, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Zombies Ate My Publishing shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. Consent due by 2/9/2023 (lmb)
January 13, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Jeff Butzinger, JJJR Silver Creek Inc., James Sinovic, Jr, Jonathan Vieluf. Original summons mailed to Attorney Menold. (lmb)
January 13, 2023 Filing 7 AO 121 Report of Filing (lmb)
January 12, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah A. Menold on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Menold, Noah)
January 12, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #2 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement filed by 3Ring Circus Music, LLC, Gibb Brothers Music, Boy Meets Girl Music, House of Gaga Publishing LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Redone Productions LLC, Zombies Ate My Publishing, Cackalacki Twang, Rick Springfield Music, Reservoir Media Management Inc., Forthefallen Publishing, Beechwood Music Corporation, Rondor Music International Inc, Crompton Songs, Round Hill Music LP, Sony/ATV Songs LLC. Filer did not enter corporate parents on docket when filing. Corporate parents added by Clerk's Office. Further, in the future, please review our party naming standards when adding parties (No all caps and aliases should be added to Alias section and not party name). No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 12, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ACTION. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Menold does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 11, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: 3Ring Circus Music, LLC, Beechwood Music Corporation, Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Cackalacki Twang, Crompton Songs, Forthefallen Publishing, Gibb Brothers Music, House of Gaga Publishing LLC, Redone Productions LLC, Reservoir Media Management Inc., Rick Springfield Music, Rondor Music International Inc, Round Hill Music LP, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Zombies Ate My Publishing. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 23-52-RJD. Consent due by 2/1/2023 (lmb)
January 10, 2023 Filing 2 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Menold, Noah)
January 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4971154.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Menold, Noah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. JJJR Silver Creek Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Noah A. Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION
Represented By: Noah A. Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL, INC. d/b/a IRVING MUSIC
Represented By: Noah A. Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOY MEETS GIRL MUSIC
Represented By: Noah A. Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICK SPRINGFIELD MUSIC
Represented By: Noah A. Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GIBB BROTHERS MUSIC
Represented By: Noah A. Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CROMPTON SONGS
Represented By: Noah A. Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZOMBIES ATE MY PUBLISHING
Represented By: Noah A. Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forthefallen Publishing
Represented By: Noah A. Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT INC. d/b/a RESERVOIR 416 a/k/a RESERVOIR ONE AMERICA
Represented By: Noah A. Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3RING CIRCUS MUSIC, LLC d/b/a SOULRIDE MUSIC
Represented By: Noah A. Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROUND HILL MUSIC LP d/b/a ROUND HILL WORKS
Represented By: Noah A. Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cackalacki Twang
Represented By: Noah A. Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Noah A. Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: House of Gaga Publishing LLC
Represented By: Noah A. Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REDONE PRODUCTIONS LLC d/b/a SONGS OF REDONE
Represented By: Noah A. Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International Inc doing business as Irving Music
Represented By: Noah A. Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reservoir Media Management Inc. doing business as Reservoir 416 doing business as Reservoir One America
Represented By: Noah A. Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3Ring Circus Music, LLC doing business as Soulride Music
Represented By: Noah A. Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Round Hill Music LP doing business as Round Hill Works
Represented By: Noah A. Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Redone Productions LLC doing business as Songs of Redone
Represented By: Noah A. Menold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJJR SILVER CREEK INC. d/b/a SILVER CREEK SALOON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES SINOVIC, JR.
Represented By: Frank J Schmidt, III
Represented By: Andrew R. Magdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFF BUTZINGER
Represented By: Frank J Schmidt, III
Represented By: Andrew R. Magdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHAN VIELUF
Represented By: Frank J Schmidt, III
Represented By: Andrew R. Magdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN LOEFFLER
Represented By: Frank J Schmidt, III
Represented By: Andrew R. Magdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJJR Silver Creek Inc. doing business as Silver Creek Saloon
Represented By: Frank J Schmidt, III
Represented By: Andrew R. Magdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?