Houghlan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Houghlan Leana and Leana Houghlan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2023cv01106
Filed: March 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 23-cv-01106-RJD. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (jlh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 26, 2023 Filing 19 FINAL CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Van Fossan, Jennifer) Modified on 4/27/2023 (jlh).
April 25, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE: Plaintiff was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 347, Plaintiff shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. Consent due by 5/2/2023 (jlh)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Leana Houghlan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 4/24/2023. (nmf)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The Show Cause Order 12 entered on April 17, 2023 is deemed SATISFIED. Plaintiff indicates the complaint erroneously indicated she was a resident of the state of Missouri; however, Plaintiff clarifies she is a resident of Smithton in St. Clair County, Illinois (Doc. 15). As such, jurisdiction is proper in this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 4/24/2023. (nmf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 21, 2023 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Leana Houghlan filed by Leana Houghlan. (Van Fossan, Jennifer)
April 19, 2023 Filing 14 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Wyatt, Nathan)
April 19, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan E. Wyatt on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Wyatt, Nathan)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 405(g), actions such as this must be "brought in the district court of the United States for the judicial district in which the plaintiff resides, or has his principal place of business, or, if he does not reside or have his principal place of business within any such judicial district, in the United States District Court for the District of Columbia." In the complaint, Plaintiff indicates she is a citizen of the State of Missouri, residing in the city of Smithton. Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE by May 1, 2023, explaining why venue is proper in the Southern District of Illinois if her residence is in the State of Missouri. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 4/17/2023. (nmf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 13, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Leana Houghlan, #8 Notice of Appearance filed by Leana Houghlan. Documents are duplicative of the Motion at Doc 2 and the Notice of Appearance at Doc 7. (jlh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 12, 2023 Filing 10 STRICKEN MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Leana Houghlan. (Van Fossan, Jennifer) Modified on 4/13/2023 (jlh).
April 12, 2023 Filing 9 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Leana Houghlan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #2 Supplement original filing form)(Van Fossan, Jennifer)
April 12, 2023 Filing 8 STRICKEN NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Van Fossan on behalf of Leana Houghlan (Van Fossan, Jennifer) Modified on 4/13/2023 (jlh).
April 12, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Van Fossan on behalf of Leana Houghlan (Van Fossan, Jennifer)
April 3, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #1 Complaint filed by Houghlan Leana and #3 Supplement filed by Houghlan Leana. Login and password do not match filer's electronic signature. Refer to Electronic Filing Rule 8 in the User's Manual Section 2.0 (Retention & Signature Requirements) Filer should also file the Notice of Appearance as a separate docket entry. (jlh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 3, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 257 and 341, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 4/3/23. Consent due by 4/24/2023 (jlh)
April 3, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Commencement of Action and Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. An electronic copy of the Complaint is attached. All future documents must bear case number 23-cv-01106-RJD. (jlh)
March 31, 2023 Filing 3 STRICKEN SUPPLEMENT by Houghlan Leana. Supplement to #1 Complaint SSA ID FORM. (Van Fossan, Kristen) Modified on 4/3/2023 (jlh).
March 31, 2023 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Leana Houghlan. (Van Fossan, Kristen) Modified on 4/13/2023 (jlh).
March 31, 2023 Filing 1 STRICKEN COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Houghlan Leana. (Attachments: #1 Supplement ORIGINAL FILING FORM, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVERSHEET, #3 Supplement ENTRY OF APPEARANCE)(Van Fossan, Kristen) Modified on 4/3/2023 (jlh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houghlan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houghlan Leana
Represented By: Kristen N. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leana Houghlan
Represented By: Kristen N. Van Fossan
Represented By: Jennifer M. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Nathan E. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?