Hoff et al v. AVCO Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Raymond A. Hoff and Nancy B. Hoff
Defendant: CNA Holdings, LLC, Cooper Industries, LLC, DCO, LLC, Goodrich Corporation, AVCO Corporation, BASF Corporation, Boeing Company, Celanese Corporation, Cooper Industries, Inc., Crane ChemPharma & Energy Corp., Crane Co., Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Curtiss-Wright Corporation, Dana Companies, LLC, Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC, Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, General Dynamics Corporation, General Electric Company, BF Goodrich Company, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Henkel Corporation, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., Individually and as successor to AlliedSignal, Inc. and The Bendix Corporation, HUNTSMAN ADVANCED MATERIALS AMERICAS LLC, HUNTSMAN CORPORATION, IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., Individually and as successor-in-interest to Adel Fasteners, John Crane, Inc., KAMAN CORPORATION, LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION, Individually and as successor-by-merger to Martin Marietta Corporation, successor-by-merger to Glenn L. Martin Company, and successor-in-interest to Sikorsky Aircraft, MERITOR, INC., f/k/a ARVINMERITOR, INC., Individually and as successor-by-merger to Arvin Industries, Inc. and Meritor Automotive, Inc., f/k/a Rockwell Automotive, Inc., successor to Rockwell Internat, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, MORTON INTERNATIONAL, LLC, Individually and as successor to Morton Thiokol, successor-by-merger to Thiokol Corporation, PARAMOUNT GLOBAL, f/k/a ViacomCBS Inc., f/k/a CBC Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electr, PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION, Individually and as successor-in-interest to EIS Brakes, Cleveland Wheel & Brake, Stratoflex Products, and Resistoflex Aerospace, PNEUMO ABEX LLC, Individually and as successor-by-merger to Pneumo Abex Corporation, successor-in-interest to Abex Corporation f/k/a American Brake Shoe Company, f/k/a American Brake Shoe and Foundry, RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, f/k/a United Technologies Corporation, Individually and as successor-in-interest to Pratt & Whitney, REDCO CORPORATION, f/k/a Crane Co., Individually and as successor-in-interest to Resistoflex Aerospace, SHELL USA, INC., SOLVAY USA, INC., SPECIALTY MATERIALS, INC., STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC., as successor-in-interest to EIS Brakes, TEXTRON AVIATION INC., TITEFLEX COMMERCIAL INC., UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, WYETH HOLDINGS LLC, f/k/a Wyeth Holdings Corporation, f/k/a American Cyanamid Company, Meritor, Inc., Paramount Global, Pneumo Abex LLC, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Redco Corporation, Wyeth Holdings LLC, Cooper Industries, Inc., as successor-in-interest to McGraw-Edison Company, Dana Companies, LLC, Individually and as successor-in-interest to Victor Gasket Manufacturing Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Lockheed Martin Corporation, Arvinmeritor, Inc., Individually and as successor-by-merger to Arvin Industries, Inc. and Meritor Automotive, Inc., Rockwell Automotive, Inc., successor to Rockwell International, Morton International, LLC, ViacomCBS Inc., CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, Viacom, Inc., Successor by Merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania Corporation, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, American Brake Shoe Company, American Brake Shoe and Foundry, United Technologies Corporation, Individually and as successor-in-interest to Pratt & Whitney, Crane Co., Individually and as successor-in-interest to Resistoflex Aerospace, Standard Motor Products Inc, Wyeth Holdings Corporation and American Cyanamid Company
Case Number: 3:2023cv01315
Filed: April 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2023 Filing 143 ANSWER to #115 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Raytheon Technologies Corporation.(Lindsey, Nathan)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response (Doc. #141 ) is GRANTED. Response to Defendant Morton International, LLC's motion to dismiss (Doc. #96 ) is due by July 5, 2023. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 6/12/2023. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 12, 2023 Filing 141 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss at Dkt. #96 by All Plaintiffs. (Steffan, John)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is SET for July 21, 2023, at 9:30 a.m. before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Instructions for joining the conference call are as follows: All parties should call toll free 877-873-8017 and enter the access code 4354777. The parties shall submit a Joint Report of the Parties and Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order at least seven (7) days prior to the conference call by email to SMYpd@ilsd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 6/6/2023. (slh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 6, 2023 Filing 139 CJRA TRACK C assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2024 at 9:30 AM via video conference and Jury Trial set for 11/4/2024 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle.(slh)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 6/6/2023. (slh)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER: Plaintiffs move to dismiss Defendants Crown, Cork & Seal Co., Inc., Curtiss-Wright Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, General Electric Co., IMO Industries, Inc., and Textron Aviation Inc. (Doc. #125 ). Plaintiffs and Defendant Paramount Global also stipulate to dismissal (Doc. #94 ). A plain reading of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) suggests that dismissal under this rule should be used only to dismiss an entire action (rather than a particular claim against a particular defendant). See Taylor v. Brown, 787 F.3d 851, 857 (7th Cir. 2015) (Rule 41(a) is "limited to dismissal of an entire action" and Rule 15(a) is the proper vehicle for "adding or dropping parties and claims"). While the Court acknowledges the plain reading of the rule, it finds that dismissing these Defendants pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) is appropriate in this case. See Quad/Graphics, Inc. v. Fass, 724 F.2d 1230, 1233 (7th Cir. 1983). Accordingly, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants Crown, Cork & Seal Co., Inc., Curtiss-Wright Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, General Electric Co., IMO Industries, Inc., and Textron Aviation Inc. are DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Paramount Global are also DISMISSED without prejudice. The pending motions to dismiss filed by these Defendants (Docs. #22 , #30 and #109 ) are TERMINATED as MOOT. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to TERMINATE these Defendants from the docket. The Clerk of Court is also DIRECTED to TERMINATE Defendant Solvay USA, Inc. pursuant to the Order at Doc. 129. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 6/5/2023. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motions to Dismiss (Doc. #134 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file responses to the Motions to Dismiss (Docs. #41 #61 #44 #82 #49 #75 #57 ) on or before July 5, 2023. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 6/2/2023. (jlpe). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 2, 2023 Filing 135 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #130 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Cooper Industries, LLC. Document stricken at the request of filer. (aza)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 2, 2023 Filing 134 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Seven Defendants' Rule 12(b) Motions by All Plaintiffs. (Steffan, John)
June 1, 2023 Filing 133 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Cooper Industries, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation plc for Cooper Industries, LLC. (Callaghan, Amy)
June 1, 2023 Filing 132 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b) by Cooper Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Callaghan, Amy)
June 1, 2023 Filing 131 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631 or in the Alternative, Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by AVCO Corporation. (Stephens, Robert)
June 1, 2023 Filing 130 STRICKEN - MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b) by Cooper Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Callaghan, Amy)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER: Plaintiff filed a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. #128 ) pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), which provides that a plaintiff may dismiss an action without a court order so long as the opposing party has not served either an answer or a motion for summary judgment. Here, Defendant SOLVAY USA, INC. has not filed an answer or motion for summary judgment. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. #128 ) is effective immediately upon filing and does not require judicial approval. See Nelson v. Napolitano, 657 F.3d 586 (7th Cir. 2011). The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment at the close of this case. The Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Solvay USA, Inc. (Doc. #85 ) is TERMINATED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/31/2023. (jlpe). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 31, 2023 Filing 128 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Steffan, John)
May 30, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FED. CIV. P. 12(b), #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Lack of Personal Jurisdiction in the Alternative for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FED. CIV. P. 12(b). Responses due by 7/5/2023 (aza)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motions to Dismiss (Doc. #126 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file responses to the Motions to Dismiss (Docs. #24 #27 ) on or before July 5, 2023. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/30/2023. (jlpe). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 30, 2023 Filing 126 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motions to Dismiss at Dkt. 24 and Dkt. 27 by All Plaintiffs. (Steffan, John)
May 26, 2023 Filing 125 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Steffan, John)
May 25, 2023 Filing 124 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Any and All Cross Claims for Contribution and Indemnification by Kaman Corporation. (Wanner, Bradley)
May 24, 2023 Filing 123 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Any and All Cross Claims for Contribution and Indemnification by Wyeth Holdings LLC. (Hopkins, L.)
May 24, 2023 Filing 122 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Any and All Cross Claims for Contribution and Indemnification by Solvay USA, Inc.. (Hopkins, L.)
May 24, 2023 Filing 121 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint by Titeflex Commercial Inc.. (Kurowski, Elizabeth)
May 24, 2023 Filing 120 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Kurowski, Elizabeth)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER: The motions for leave to file amended answers to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendants Goodyear Tire & Rubber (Doc. #117 ) and Titeflex Commercial Inc. (Doc. #118 ) are GRANTED. Defendants are directed to file their amended answers instanter. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/24/2023. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 23, 2023 Filing 118 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Titeflex Commercial Inc.. (Kurowski, Elizabeth)
May 23, 2023 Filing 117 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Kurowski, Elizabeth)
May 23, 2023 Filing 116 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Count VII of Plaintiffs' Complaint by John Crane, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Danhelka, Anthony)
May 23, 2023 Filing 115 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM for Contribution against Pneumo Abex LLC, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, General Electric Company, Meritor, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Shell USA, Inc., Curtiss-Wright Corporation, Morton International, LLC, General Dynamics Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, Imo Industries, Inc., Crane ChemPharma & Energy Corp., Specialty Materials, Inc., Boeing Company, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Cooper Industries, LLC, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Textron Aviation Inc., DCO, LLC, Union Carbide Corporation, Henkel Corporation, Paramount Global, Kaman Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Titeflex Commercial Inc., Wyeth Holdings LLC, Huntsman Corporation, Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC, CNA Holdings, LLC, Solvay USA, Inc., AVCO Corporation, Crane Co., Standard Motor Products Inc, BASF Corporation, Redco Corporation, COUNTERCLAIM against Pneumo Abex LLC, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, General Electric Company, Meritor, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Shell USA, Inc., Curtiss-Wright Corporation, Morton International, LLC, General Dynamics Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, Imo Industries, Inc., Crane ChemPharma & Energy Corp., Specialty Materials, Inc., Boeing Company, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Cooper Industries, LLC, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Textron Aviation Inc., DCO, LLC, Union Carbide Corporation, Henkel Corporation, Paramount Global, Kaman Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Titeflex Commercial Inc., Wyeth Holdings LLC, Huntsman Corporation, Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC, CNA Holdings, LLC, Solvay USA, Inc., AVCO Corporation, Crane Co., Standard Motor Products Inc, BASF Corporation, Redco Corporation by John Crane, Inc..(Danhelka, Anthony)
May 17, 2023 Filing 114 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Solvay USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Solvay Holding Inc., Other Affiliate Solvay S.A. for Solvay USA, Inc.. (Hopkins, L.)
May 17, 2023 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E. Pelikan on behalf of Pneumo Abex LLC (Pelikan, Matthew)
May 16, 2023 Filing 112 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Morton International, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Rohm and Haas Company for Morton International, LLC. (Meyer, Julie)
May 16, 2023 Filing 111 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Curtiss-Wright Corporation. (Walsh, Steven)
May 16, 2023 Filing 110 MEMORANDUM in Support re #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Curtiss-Wright Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Walsh, Steven)
May 16, 2023 Filing 109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Curtiss-Wright Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Walsh, Steven)
May 16, 2023 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Thomas Walsh on behalf of Curtiss-Wright Corporation (Walsh, Steven)
May 16, 2023 Filing 107 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Standard Motor Products Inc. (Meyer, Julie)
May 16, 2023 Filing 106 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Redco Corporation. (Meyer, Julie)
May 16, 2023 Filing 105 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Meyer, Julie)
May 15, 2023 Filing 104 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Shell USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Shell Petroleum Inc. for Shell USA, Inc.. (Simon, Julia)
May 15, 2023 Filing 103 NOTICE OF ACTION re #100 Notice of Appearance filed by Shell USA, Inc. Because the required Disclosure Statement was not filed with the attached, this matter is being submitted to the presiding judge for further action. A copy of this Court's form Disclosure Statement can be found at #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (aza)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 15, 2023 Filing 102 MEMORANDUM in Support re #101 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Shell USA, Inc.. (Simon, Julia)
May 15, 2023 Filing 101 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Shell USA, Inc.. (Simon, Julia)
May 15, 2023 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Yasmin Simon on behalf of Shell USA, Inc. (Simon, Julia)
May 15, 2023 Filing 99 JOINDER by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A for Joinder, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B for Joinder)(Kurowski, Elizabeth)
May 11, 2023 Filing 98 JOINDER by Boeing Company. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A for Joinder, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B for Joinder)(Stevens, Kyler)
May 11, 2023 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM in Support re #96 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim /Personal Jurisdiction in the Alternative for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b) filed by Morton International, LLC. (Meyer, Julie)
May 11, 2023 Filing 96 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim /Personal Jurisdiction in the Alternative for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b) by Morton International, LLC. (Meyer, Julie)
May 11, 2023 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of Morton International, LLC (Meyer, Julie)
May 11, 2023 Filing 94 STIPULATION of Dismissal Paramount Global by All Plaintiffs. (Patterson, Zachary)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER: Defendant Cooper Industries LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. #92 ) is GRANTED. Responsive pleading due by June 1, 2023. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/11/2023. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 10, 2023 Filing 92 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Cooper Industries, LLC. (Callaghan, Amy)
May 10, 2023 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Marie Callaghan on behalf of Cooper Industries, LLC (Callaghan, Amy)
May 8, 2023 Filing 90 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by DCO, LLC. (Pinter, Gary)
May 8, 2023 Filing 89 DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodrich Corporation.(Henderson, Nathan)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER: Defendant Avco Corporation's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and/or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #67 ) is GRANTED. Avco's responsive pleading is due by June 2, 2023. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/8/2023. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 8, 2023 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S. Anderson on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Anderson, Charles)
May 8, 2023 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W. Schuh on behalf of Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC (Schuh, Matthew)
May 8, 2023 AVCO Corporation answer due 6/2/2023. (aza)
May 5, 2023 Filing 85 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Solvay USA, Inc.. (Hopkins, L.)
May 5, 2023 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by L. Bryan Hopkins on behalf of Solvay USA, Inc. (Hopkins, L.)
May 5, 2023 Filing 83 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Henkel Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Henkel US Operations Corporation, Other Affiliate Henkel of America, Inc., Other Affiliate Henkel of America I LLC, Other Affiliate Henkel AG & Co. KGaA for Henkel Corporation. (Bash, Jeffrey)
May 5, 2023 Filing 82 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Henkel Corporation. (Bash, Jeffrey)
May 5, 2023 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Bash on behalf of Henkel Corporation (Bash, Jeffrey)
May 5, 2023 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Bash on behalf of Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC (Bash, Jeffrey)
May 5, 2023 Filing 79 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent The Dow Chemical Company, Other Affiliate Dow Inc. for Union Carbide Corporation. (Bash, Jeffrey)
May 5, 2023 Filing 78 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Kurowski, Elizabeth)
May 5, 2023 Filing 77 ANSWER to Complaint by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(Kurowski, Elizabeth)
May 5, 2023 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Gloria Kurowski on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Kurowski, Elizabeth)
May 5, 2023 Filing 75 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Union Carbide Corporation. (Bash, Jeffrey)
May 5, 2023 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Bash on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Bash, Jeffrey)
May 5, 2023 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary N. Patterson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Patterson, Zachary)
May 5, 2023 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Tivin on behalf of John Crane, Inc. (Tivin, Mark)
May 5, 2023 Filing 71 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses Answers to Cross Claims and, CROSSCLAIM for Contribution against All Defendants by DCO, LLC.(Pinter, Gary)
May 5, 2023 Filing 69 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by John Crane, Inc.. (Danhelka, Anthony)
May 5, 2023 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Danhelka on behalf of John Crane, Inc. (Danhelka, Anthony)
May 5, 2023 Filing 67 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by AVCO Corporation. (Stephens, Robert)
May 5, 2023 Filing 66 Amended ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint at Law, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against AVCO Corporation, BASF Corporation, Boeing Company, CNA Holdings, LLC, Cooper Industries, LLC, Crane ChemPharma & Energy Corp., Crane Co., Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Curtiss-Wright Corporation, DCO, LLC, Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC, Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, General Dynamics Corporation, General Electric Company, Goodrich Corporation, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Henkel Corporation, Nancy B. Hoff, Raymond A. Hoff, Honeywell International, Inc., Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman Corporation, Imo Industries, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Kaman Corporation, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Meritor, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Morton International, LLC, Paramount Global, Pneumo Abex LLC, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Redco Corporation, Shell USA, Inc., Solvay USA, Inc., Specialty Materials, Inc., Standard Motor Products Inc, Textron Aviation Inc., Titeflex Commercial Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Wyeth Holdings LLC by Parker-Hannifin Corporation.(Schag, Michael)
May 5, 2023 Filing 65 NOTICE OF ACTION re #54 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by DCO, LLC. Efiler selected themselves when filing their Crossclaim. Efiler is instructed to refile their Crossclaim and select the correct cross defendants so that the parties are correctly added to the docket. (jlrr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporation's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Answer (Doc. #50 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/5/2023. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 5, 2023 Filing 63 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #62 Letter. Document entered in error. Attorney Wanner was granted Pro Hac Vice admission in this case. (aza)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 5, 2023 Filing 62 STRICKEN - Letter to Attorney Bradley Wanner regarding admission to SDIL. (aza)
May 4, 2023 Filing 70 CROSSCLAIM against AVCO Corporation, BASF Corporation, Boeing Company, CNA Holdings, LLC, Cooper Industries, LLC, Crane ChemPharma & Energy Corp., Crane Co., Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Curtiss-Wright Corporation, DCO, LLC, Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC, Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, General Dynamics Corporation, General Electric Company, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Henkel Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman Corporation, Imo Industries, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Kaman Corporation, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Meritor, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Morton International, LLC, Paramount Global, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Pneumo Abex LLC, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Redco Corporation, Shell USA, Inc., Solvay USA, Inc., Specialty Materials, Inc., Standard Motor Products Inc, Textron Aviation Inc., Titeflex Commercial Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Wyeth Holdings LLC filed by Goodrich Corporation. (See Doc. #56 for Crossclaim info)(mar)
May 4, 2023 Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A re MTD PJ, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B MTD PJ, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C MTD PJ)(Stevens, Kyler)
May 4, 2023 Filing 60 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Boeing Company. (Stevens, Kyler)
May 4, 2023 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler H. Stevens on behalf of Boeing Company (Stevens, Kyler)
May 4, 2023 Filing 58 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Wyeth Holdings LLC identifying Corporate Parent Wyeth Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Pfizer, Inc. for Wyeth Holdings LLC. (Hopkins, L.)
May 4, 2023 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Wyeth Holdings LLC. (Hopkins, L.)
May 4, 2023 Filing 56 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint, Cross-Claims, and Answer to other Defendants' Cross-Claims by Goodrich Corporation.(Henderson, Nathan)
May 4, 2023 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by L. Bryan Hopkins on behalf of Wyeth Holdings LLC (Hopkins, L.)
May 4, 2023 Filing 54 ANSWER to Complaint , Cross-Claims for Contribution and Answer to All, CROSSCLAIM s against DCO, LLC by DCO, LLC.(Pinter, Gary)
May 4, 2023 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan M. Henderson on behalf of Goodrich Corporation (Henderson, Nathan)
May 4, 2023 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C. Pinter on behalf of DCO, LLC (Pinter, Gary)
May 4, 2023 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Jellen on behalf of Goodrich Corporation (Jellen, Robert)
May 4, 2023 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to File , Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Schag, Michael)
May 4, 2023 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Kaman Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of B. Wanner in Support of Kamans Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Richard Smith, Jr., #3 Exhibit B- Plaintiffs Answers to Interrogatories (redacted), #4 Memorandum of Law in Support of Kamans Motion to Dismiss)(Wanner, Bradley)
May 4, 2023 Filing 48 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Kaman Corporation. (Wanner, Bradley)
May 4, 2023 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Wanner on behalf of Kaman Corporation (Wanner, Bradley)
May 4, 2023 Filing 46 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Titeflex Commercial Inc.. (Kurowski, Elizabeth)
May 4, 2023 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint by Titeflex Commercial Inc..(Kurowski, Elizabeth)
May 4, 2023 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Eaton Aeroquip, LLC. (Eisenberg, Brent)
May 4, 2023 Filing 43 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Eaton Aeroquip, LLC. (Eisenberg, Brent)
May 4, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Eisenberg on behalf of Eaton Aeroquip, LLC (Eisenberg, Brent)
May 4, 2023 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum and Order, #2 Exhibit Stipulation List for the Deposition of Raymond A. Hoff, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Donald Smith)(Rosser, Eric)
May 4, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE by BASF Corporation As to Affiliates (Rosser, Eric)
May 4, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. Rosser on behalf of BASF Corporation (Rosser, Eric)
May 3, 2023 Filing 38 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Pneumo Abex LLC. (Titzer, Ross)
May 3, 2023 Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Pneumo Abex LLC.(Titzer, Ross)
May 3, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Ross S. Titzer on behalf of Pneumo Abex LLC (Titzer, Ross)
May 3, 2023 Filing 35 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Schag, Michael)
May 3, 2023 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses by Parker-Hannifin Corporation.(Schag, Michael)
May 3, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Schag on behalf of Parker-Hannifin Corporation (Schag, Michael)
April 28, 2023 Filing 32 DEFENDANT RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATIONS ANSWER to Complaint by Raytheon Technologies Corporation.(Lindsey, Nathan)
April 27, 2023 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Support re #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal Jurisdiction in the Alternative for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FED. CIV. P. 12(b) filed by General Electric Company. (Meyer, Julie)
April 27, 2023 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal Jurisdiction in the Alternative for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FED. CIV. P. 12(b) by General Electric Company. (Meyer, Julie)
April 27, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of General Electric Company (Meyer, Julie)
April 27, 2023 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FED. CIV. P. 12(b) filed by Redco Corporation. (Meyer, Julie)
April 27, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FED. CIV. P. 12(b) by Redco Corporation. (Meyer, Julie)
April 27, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of Redco Corporation (Meyer, Julie)
April 27, 2023 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Lack of Personal Jurisdiction in the Alternative for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FED. CIV. P. 12(b) filed by Standard Motor Products Inc. (Meyer, Julie)
April 27, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Lack of Personal Jurisdiction in the Alternative for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FED. CIV. P. 12(b) by Standard Motor Products Inc. (Meyer, Julie)
April 27, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of Standard Motor Products Inc (Meyer, Julie)
April 26, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Paramount Global. (Newton, Kevin)
April 26, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Newton on behalf of Paramount Global (Newton, Kevin)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bradley Wanner on behalf of Kaman Corporation. (aza)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 25, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bradley Wanner $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-5061522 by on behalf of Kaman Corporation. (Wanner, Bradley)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Zachary N. Patterson on behalf of all Plaintiffs. (aza)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 25, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Zachary N. Patterson $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-5061005 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Patterson, Zachary)
April 24, 2023 Filing 16 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Raytheon Technologies Corporation. (Lindsey, Nathan)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. For good cause shown, and in the interests of justice, Plaintiffs' Combined Emergency Motion for Accelerated Deposition by Remote Means (Doc. #6 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff Hoff's deposition shall take place remotely tomorrow, April 25, 2023, as scheduled and ordered by the state court prior to removal. The Motion for a Protective Order (Doc. #14 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/24/2023. (cka) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 24, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Protective Order by Raytheon Technologies Corporation. (Kemp, Nathan)
April 24, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Drew Kemp on behalf of Raytheon Technologies Corporation (Kemp, Nathan)
April 24, 2023 Filing 12 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Textron Aviation Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Textron Inc. for Textron Aviation Inc.. (Stephens, Robert)
April 24, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William Stephens on behalf of Textron Aviation Inc. (Stephens, Robert)
April 24, 2023 Filing 10 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by AVCO Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Textron Inc. for AVCO Corporation. (Stephens, Robert)
April 24, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William Stephens on behalf of AVCO Corporation (Stephens, Robert)
April 24, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #4 Notice of Initial Magistrate Assignment. Document entered in error.(aza)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 24, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 311, this case has been reassigned to U.S. District Judge Staci M. Yandle. This Notice does not alter any prior referrals of motions or matters pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(b)(1-3). (aza)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 23, 2023 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION for Discovery (Relief Under Rule 26(d)---Deposition to Proceed) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 State Court Order, #2 Depo. Notice)(Steffan, John)
April 21, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Louis Steffan, IV on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Steffan, John)
April 21, 2023 Filing 4 STRICKEN - NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order 347. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order Nos. 257 and 341, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or non-consent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Nancy B. Hoff, Raymond A. Hoff, RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, f/k/a United Technologies Corporation, Individually and as successor-in-interest to Pratt & Whitney. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:23-cv-01315-RJD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website,
April 21, 2023 Filing 3 Letter to Attorney Zachary Patterson regarding admission to SDIL. (aza)
April 21, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan A. Lindsey on behalf of RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, f/k/a United Technologies Corporation, Individually and as successor-in-interest to Pratt & Whitney (Lindsey, Nathan)
April 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Circuit Court Third Judicial Circuit Madison County, Illinois, case number 23-LA-564 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-5058156), filed by RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, f/k/a United Technologies Corporation, Individually and as successor-in-interest to Pratt & Whitney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Lindsey, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoff et al v. AVCO Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Industries, LLC
Represented By: Amy Marie Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCO, LLC
Represented By: Gary C. Pinter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Represented By: Nathan M. Henderson
Represented By: Robert J. Jellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVCO Corporation
Represented By: Robert William Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Eric D. Rosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company
Represented By: Kyler H. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celanese Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane ChemPharma & Energy Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtiss-Wright Corporation
Represented By: Steven Thomas Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Matthew W. Schuh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Aeroquip, LLC
Represented By: Brent Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BF Goodrich Company
Represented By: Nathan M. Henderson
Represented By: Robert J. Jellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Gloria Kurowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henkel Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., Individually and as successor to AlliedSignal, Inc. and The Bendix Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUNTSMAN ADVANCED MATERIALS AMERICAS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUNTSMAN CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., Individually and as successor-in-interest to Adel Fasteners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Tivin
Represented By: Anthony Danhelka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAMAN CORPORATION
Represented By: Bradley Wanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION, Individually and as successor-by-merger to Martin Marietta Corporation, successor-by-merger to Glenn L. Martin Company, and successor-in-interest to Sikorsky Aircraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERITOR, INC., f/k/a ARVINMERITOR, INC., Individually and as successor-by-merger to Arvin Industries, Inc. and Meritor Automotive, Inc., f/k/a Rockwell Automotive, Inc., successor to Rockwell Internat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTON INTERNATIONAL, LLC, Individually and as successor to Morton Thiokol, successor-by-merger to Thiokol Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARAMOUNT GLOBAL, f/k/a ViacomCBS Inc., f/k/a CBC Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION, Individually and as successor-in-interest to EIS Brakes, Cleveland Wheel & Brake, Stratoflex Products, and Resistoflex Aerospace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNEUMO ABEX LLC, Individually and as successor-by-merger to Pneumo Abex Corporation, successor-in-interest to Abex Corporation f/k/a American Brake Shoe Company, f/k/a American Brake Shoe and Foundry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, f/k/a United Technologies Corporation, Individually and as successor-in-interest to Pratt & Whitney
Represented By: Nathan A. Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REDCO CORPORATION, f/k/a Crane Co., Individually and as successor-in-interest to Resistoflex Aerospace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHELL USA, INC.
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOLVAY USA, INC.
Represented By: L. Bryan Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECIALTY MATERIALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC., as successor-in-interest to EIS Brakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEXTRON AVIATION INC.
Represented By: Robert William Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TITEFLEX COMMERCIAL INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth Gloria Kurowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Charles S. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WYETH HOLDINGS LLC, f/k/a Wyeth Holdings Corporation, f/k/a American Cyanamid Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meritor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Global
Represented By: Kevin J. Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Matthew E. Pelikan
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Nathan A. Lindsey
Represented By: Nathan Drew Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redco Corporation
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Holdings LLC
Represented By: L. Bryan Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Industries, Inc., as successor-in-interest to McGraw-Edison Company
Represented By: Amy Marie Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies, LLC, Individually and as successor-in-interest to Victor Gasket Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Gary C. Pinter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imo Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvinmeritor, Inc., Individually and as successor-by-merger to Arvin Industries, Inc. and Meritor Automotive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automotive, Inc., successor to Rockwell International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morton International, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Kevin J. Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Kevin J. Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc., Successor by Merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania Corporation
Represented By: Kevin J. Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Kevin J. Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Michael D. Schag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Brake Shoe Company
Represented By: Matthew E. Pelikan
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Brake Shoe and Foundry
Represented By: Matthew E. Pelikan
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation, Individually and as successor-in-interest to Pratt & Whitney
Represented By: Nathan Drew Kemp
Represented By: Nathan A. Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co., Individually and as successor-in-interest to Resistoflex Aerospace
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Motor Products Inc
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Holdings Corporation
Represented By: L. Bryan Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Cyanamid Company
Represented By: L. Bryan Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond A. Hoff
Represented By: Zachary N. Patterson
Represented By: John Louis Steffan, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy B. Hoff
Represented By: Zachary N. Patterson
Represented By: John Louis Steffan, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?