Anderson v. Schildknecht et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Anderson
Defendant: Josh Schildknecht, Scott Harvel, David Wilkins, Union County Sheriff's Department, Jonesboro Police Department, The City of Jonesboro and City of Jonesboro
Case Number: 3:2023cv02056
Filed: June 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2023 Filing 15 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Pierce, Charles)
August 10, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing City of Jonesboro, Jonesboro Police Department and David Wilkins to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 347, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to City of Jonesboro, Jonesboro Police Department and David Wilkins on 8/10/2023. Consent due by 8/31/2023 (csb)
August 9, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by City of Jonesboro, Jonesboro Police Department, David Wilkins.(Pierce, Charles)
August 9, 2023 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by City of Jonesboro, Jonesboro Police Department, David Wilkins. (Pierce, Charles)
August 9, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles A. Pierce on behalf of City of Jonesboro, Jonesboro Police Department, David Wilkins (Pierce, Charles)
July 28, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Kulwin on behalf of Jacob Anderson (Kulwin, Jeffrey)
July 24, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Scott Harvel, Josh Schildnecht and Union County Sheriff's Department to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 347, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Scott Harvel, Josh Schildnecht and Union County Sheriff's Department on 7/24/23. Consent due by 8/14/2023 (jlh)
July 21, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle R. Moore on behalf of Scott Harvel, Josh Schildknecht, Union County Sheriff's Department (Moore, Kyle)
July 21, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bhairav Radia on behalf of Scott Harvel, Josh Schildknecht, Union County Sheriff's Department (Radia, Bhairav)
July 18, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Smallhorn, Jacob)
July 11, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE: Jacob Anderson was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 347, Jacob Anderson shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. Consent due by 7/18/2023 (lmb)
June 28, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Smallhorn on behalf of Jacob Anderson (Smallhorn, Jacob)
June 16, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Smallhorn does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (jlh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 16, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order 347. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 347, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or non-consent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Jacob Anderson. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 23-cv-02056-MAB. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 7/7/2023 (jlh)
June 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-5107106.), filed by Jacob Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smallhorn, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Schildknecht et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Anderson
Represented By: Jacob Smallhorn
Represented By: Jeffrey Kulwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Schildknecht
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Represented By: Kyle R. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Harvel
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Represented By: Kyle R. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wilkins
Represented By: Charles A. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Represented By: Kyle R. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonesboro Police Department
Represented By: Charles A. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Jonesboro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Jonesboro
Represented By: Charles A. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?