Miles v. Mitchell et al
Plaintiff: Billy Miles
Defendant: David W Mitchell, Nurses, S Brown, C Hale, Adewale Kafaiji and Rob Jeffreys
Case Number: 3:2023cv03563
Filed: November 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting in part #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff indicates that he is currently in segregation without the necessary supplies to submit an amended pleading. He seeks additional time after his segregation release date of 12/27/2023 to submit amended complaints. Plaintiff is granted additional time to submit an amended pleading. Amended Complaint now due January 26, 2024. The Court DENIES Plaintiffs request for a Court Order for library access to draft his pleadings. Plaintiff has additional time after his release date from segregation to draft his pleadings.. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/20/2023. (jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 20, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/26/2024. (jaj)
December 19, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #9 Order re: contacting attorneys for representation filed by Billy Miles. (jaj)
December 19, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by Billy Miles. (jaj)
November 20, 2023 Filing 11 Initial Prisoner Filing Fee: $ 1.77 received, receipt number 6406 (djw)
November 16, 2023 Filing 10 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (jaj)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING without prejudice #1 Complaint filed by Billy Miles, DENYING #3 MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel filed by Billy Miles. Amended Pleadings due by 12/13/2023. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 11/15/2023. (anp)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FINDING AS MOOT #7 Motion for Response. To the extent Plaintiff indicates that the Court opened a duplicate case, the Court has already administratively closed the case. See Miles v. Mitchell, et al., Case No. 23-cv-3581-NJR (Doc. 6) (closed Nov. 8, 2023). To the extent Plaintiff submits his trust fund account statement, the Court already received the statement and ruled on his motions to proceed in forma pauperis in his pending cases. Finally, to the extent Plaintiff seeks 50 Section 1983 Complaint forms and other form motions, the Court DENIES as moot Plaintiffs request. The Court recently mailed complaint forms to Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 11/14/2023. (jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 13, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Response by Billy Miles. (jaj)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (Doc. #2 ). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $1.77. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court upon receipt of this Order. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid.In addition, Plaintiff shall note that the filing fees for multiple cases cumulate. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 436 (7th Cir. 1997), overruled in part on other grounds by Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000); Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626 (7th Cir. 2000). A prisoner who files one suit must remit 20% of his monthly income to the Clerk of the Court until his fees have been paid; a prisoner who files a second suit or an appeal must remit 40%; and so on. Newlin, 123 F.3d at 436. "Five suits or appeals mean that the prisoner's entire monthly income must be turned over to the court until the fees have been paid." Id. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at the Menard Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 11/9/2023. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 23-3563-NJR. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See: 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within fourteen days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 11/2/2023. (jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 2, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 11/2/2023. Consent due by 11/27/2023 (jaj)
November 2, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel by Billy Miles. (jaj)
November 2, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Billy Miles. (jaj)
November 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Billy Miles.(jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miles v. Mitchell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adewale Kafaiji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Jeffreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?