Miles v. Dzemali et al
Plaintiff: Donald Miles and Donald E. Miles
Defendant: Kurtisi Dzemali, Meli Transport, LLC, Jose Carranza and Eastex Transportation
Case Number: 3:2023cv03768
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: The Joint Report of Parties is approved and entered. The Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 4/10/2025 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 4/28/2025 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Discovery due by 11/22/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 12/20/2024. Stipulation Selecting Mediator to be filed by 2/1/2024. Mandatory Mediation Session to be completed by 10/23/2024. Mandatory Mediation Program Completion due by 12/6/2024. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/4/2024. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report)(tag)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #22 Joint MOTION to Reassign Case to Track C. The Final Pretrial Conference is Rescheduled for 4/10/2025 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 4/28/2025 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/4/2024. (tag)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 4, 2024 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct To Reassign to Track C by Kurtisi Dzemali, Meli Transport, LLC. (Hefflefinger, Matthew)
December 22, 2023 Filing 21 Summonses Issued as to Jose Carranza, Eastex Transportation, and originals mailed to Attorney Bernstein. (kdw)
December 21, 2023 Filing 20 Summons Requested. (Bernstein, Steven)
December 21, 2023 Filing 19 Summons Requested. (Bernstein, Steven)
December 21, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT/REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, this case will remain with the assigned District Judge J. Phil Gilbert.. This Notice does not alter any prior referrals of motions or matters pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(b)(1-3). (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 20, 2023 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Kurtisi Dzemali, Meli Transport, LLC.(Hefflefinger, Matthew)
December 20, 2023 Filing 16 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Hefflefinger, Matthew)
December 19, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE: Kurtisi Dzemali and Meli Transport, LLC was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, Kurtisi Dzemali and Meli Transport, LLC shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. Consent due by 12/26/2023(kdw)
December 6, 2023 Filing 14 CJRA TRACK B assigned: The Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 12/3/2024 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 12/16/2024 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Parties are to submit a Joint Report regarding Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order within 28 days of the entry of this filing. Scheduling/Discovery and Settlement Conferences will NOT be set for hearing unless requested by the parties or deemed necessary by the Court. Joint Proposed Discovery due by 1/3/2024.(tag)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/6/2023. (tag)
November 28, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Donald E. Miles. Document filed in incorrect case. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bernstein on behalf of Plaintiff Donald E. Miles. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 27, 2023 Filing 10 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Bernstein, Steven)
November 27, 2023 Filing 9 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven J Bernstein by on behalf of Donald E. Miles. (Bernstein, Steven)
November 27, 2023 Filing 8 STRICKEN First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven J Bernstein $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-5243851 by on behalf of Donald E. Miles. (Bernstein, Steven) Modified on 11/28/2023 (kdw).
November 27, 2023 Filing 7 Letter to Attorney Bernstein regarding general admissions for SDIL. (kdw)
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing All parties to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to All parties on 11/27/2023. Consent due by 12/18/2023 (kdw)
November 27, 2023 Filing 5 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 23-3768-JPG. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kdw)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E. Kouri on behalf of Kurtisi Dzemali, Meli Transport, LLC (Kouri, Matthew)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Meli Transport, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Meli Transport, LLC for Meli Transport, LLC. (Hefflefinger, Matthew)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Madison County, case number 2023LA001379 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-5242708), filed by Meli Transport, LLC, Kurtisi Dzemali. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hefflefinger, Matthew)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Hefflefinger on behalf of Kurtisi Dzemali, Meli Transport, LLC (Hefflefinger, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miles v. Dzemali et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald E. Miles
Represented By: Steven J Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurtisi Dzemali
Represented By: Matthew S. Hefflefinger
Represented By: Matthew E. Kouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meli Transport, LLC
Represented By: Matthew S. Hefflefinger
Represented By: Matthew E. Kouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Carranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastex Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?