Storck v. Sanders et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Storck
Defendant: Reginald C. Sanders and Titus Transport Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv03773
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: The Joint Report of Parties is approved and entered. The Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 12/3/2024 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 12/16/2024 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Discovery due by 7/24/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 8/23/2024. Stipulation Selecting Mediator to be filed by 1/30/2024. Mandatory Mediation Session to be completed by 6/24/2024. Mandatory Mediation Program Completion due by 8/8/2024. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/4/2024. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report)(tag)
December 28, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #19 Notice (Other) filed by Reginald C. Sanders, Titus Transport Holdings, LLC. See Local Rule 26.1(b). Filing of Disclosure and Discovery. Interrogatories under Fed. R. Civ. P. 33 and the objections and answers thereto, requests for production or inspection under Fed. R. Civ. P. 34 and the objections and responses thereto, Requests for Admissions under Fed. R. Civ. P. 36 and the objections and responses thereto, and deposition notices under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30 and 31 shall be served upon other counsel or parties but shall not be filed with the Clerk of Court. The party responsible for service of the discovery material shall retain the original and become the custodian thereof. Certificates of service for these materials should not be filed on the docket. (tkm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 28, 2023 Filing 19 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE by All Defendants /Certificate of Service of Defendants' Rule 26(a)(1) Mandatory Disclosure (Kahan, Shimon) Modified on 12/28/2023 (tkm).
December 20, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT/REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, this case will remain with the assigned District Judge J. Phil Gilbert. This Notice does not alter any prior referrals of motions or matters pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(b)(1-3). (tkm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 20, 2023 Filing 17 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Titus Transport Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Titus Transport Holdings, LLC for Titus Transport Holdings, LLC. (Kahan, Shimon)
December 20, 2023 Filing 16 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Kahan, Shimon)
December 14, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ACTION. See Local Rule 83.1(g). In all cases filed in, removed, or transferred into this Court, the attorney filing the initiating document need not file a separate entry of appearance. Once the initiating document is filed, any attorney other than the one who filed the initiating document must file a separate entry of appearance before filing a document or appearing before the Court. Attorney Shimon Kahan does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (tkm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 14, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #12 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement filed by Titus Transport Holdings, LLC. Login information used and signature on document do not match. Document shall be re-filed using the appropriate credentials. (tkm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 14, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE: Reginald C. Sanders and Titus Transport Holdings, LLC was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, Reginald C. Sanders and Titus Transport Holdings, LLC shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. Consent due by 12/21/2023 (tkm)
December 13, 2023 Filing 12 ENTRY STRICKEN - Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Titus Transport Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Titus Transport Holdings, LLC for Titus Transport Holdings, LLC. (Kahan, Shimon) Modified on 12/14/2023 (tkm).
December 13, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants.(Kahan, Shimon)
December 12, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #9 Notice (Other) filed by Ashley Storck. Incorrect event selected. Select the event that most closely matches the document being filed. For this document, the correct event is "Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge" under the heading "Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents". Docket text modified to reflect the correct document and entry sealed. No further action required by the filer as to this document. (tkm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 12, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE by All Plaintiffs (Boyer, Jamie) Modified on 12/12/2023 (tkm).
December 6, 2023 Filing 8 CJRA TRACK B assigned: The Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 12/3/2024 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 12/16/2024 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Parties are to submit a Joint Report regarding Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order within 28 days of the entry of this filing. Scheduling/Discovery and Settlement Conferences will NOT be set for hearing unless requested by the parties or deemed necessary by the Court. Joint Proposed Discovery due by 1/3/2024.(tag)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MANDATORY MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/6/2023. (tag)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. The Defendants' requested extension is granted. The Defendants shall file their responsive pleadings on or before December 13, 2023. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/1/2023. (kdb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Complaint by All Defendants. (Kahan, Shimon)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing All Parties to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to All Parties on 11/22/2023. Consent due by 12/13/2023 (tkm)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 23-3773-JPG. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (tkm)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Shimon B Kahan on behalf of All Defendants (Kahan, Shimon)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 20th Judicial Circuit, St. Clair County, case number 23LA1105 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-5242867), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kahan, Shimon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Storck v. Sanders et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Storck
Represented By: Jamie L. Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald C. Sanders
Represented By: Shimon B Kahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titus Transport Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Shimon B Kahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?