Rogers v. Western Governors University et al
Plaintiff: James Paul Rogers
Defendant: Scott D Pulsipher, Bob Hunt and Western Governors University
Case Number: 3:2023cv03774
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: The Joint Report of Parties is approved and entered. The Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 1/9/2025 at 9:00 AM with a Bench Trial date of 1/27/2025 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Discovery due by 8/23/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 9/23/2024. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/24/2024. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report)(tag)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Strike #21 Status Report. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to strike the #21 status report. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/22/2024. (tlp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 19, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #22 Status Report filed by Western Governors University. Document should not have been e-filed, rather should have been emailed to the appropriate Judge for this case at JPGpd@ilsd.uscourts.gov. (clw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 19, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION to Strike #21 Status Report Motion to Strike Erroneously Filed Document by Western Governors University. (Khetarpal, Monica)
January 18, 2024 Filing 22 STRICKEN - STATUS REPORT CORRECTED JOINT REPORT OF PARTIES AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER by Western Governors University. (Khetarpal, Monica) Modified on 1/19/2024 (clw).
January 18, 2024 Filing 21 STICKEN PER ORDER AT DOC 25 - STATUS REPORT JOINT REPORT OF PARTIES AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER by Western Governors University. (Khetarpal, Monica)
December 22, 2023 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #12 Amended Complaint DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD filed by James Paul Rogers. (clw)
December 21, 2023 Filing 19 CJRA TRACK B assigned: The Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 1/9/2025 at 9:00 AM with a Bench Trial date of 1/27/2025 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Parties are to submit a Joint Report regarding Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order within 28 days of the entry of this filing. Scheduling/Discovery and Settlement Conferences will NOT be set for hearing unless requested by the parties or deemed necessary by the Court. Joint Proposed Discovery due by 1/18/2024.(tag)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court GRANTS the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 4). The Court DENIES as moot the motion for service of process at government expense (Doc. 6). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/21/2023. (jdh)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to the #12 Amended Complaint. Answer/response due 2/2/24. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/20/2023. (tlp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 18, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #12 Amended Complaint DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by Western Governors University. (Khetarpal, Monica)
December 18, 2023 Filing 15 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Western Governors University identifying Corporate Parent WGU Corporation for Western Governors University. (Khetarpal, Monica)
December 18, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Daniel Iles on behalf of Western Governors University (Iles, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica Hersh Khetarpal on behalf of Western Governors University (Khetarpal, Monica)
December 12, 2023 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Western Governors University, filed by James Paul Rogers.(clw)
December 7, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT/REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, this case will remain with the assigned District Judge J. Phil Gilbert. This Notice does not alter any prior referrals of motions or matters pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(b)(1-3). (clw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 7, 2023 Filing 10 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by James Paul Rogers. (clw)
December 7, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (clw)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, re: jurisdictional defect. Amended pleading due 12/22/2023. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/29/2023. (jdh)
November 29, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/22/2023. (clw)
November 27, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ACTION re #3 Complaint filed by James Paul Rogers. Because the required Disclosure Statement was not filed with the attached, this matter is being submitted to the presiding judge for further action. A copy of this Court's form Disclosure Statement can be found at #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (clw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense by James Paul Rogers. (jle)
November 27, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE in regards to Plaintiff's Complaint for Civil Case by James Paul Rogers. (jle)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Paul Rogers. (clw)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Bob Hunt, Scott D Pulsipher, filed by James Paul Rogers.(clw)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing James Paul Rogers to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to James Paul Rogers on 11/27/2023. Consent due by 12/13/2023 (clw)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:23-CV-3774-JPG. Refer to the pro se litigant guide, found on the ILSD website, for further information. (clw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Western Governors University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Paul Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott D Pulsipher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Governors University
Represented By: Monica Hersh Khetarpal
Represented By: Jeffrey Daniel Iles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?