Clarkson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Otis Clarkson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2023cv03777
Filed: November 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Stephen P McGlynn
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SOCIAL SECURITY BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Defendant's brief due within 30 days after filing of plaintiff's brief. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 1/22/2024. (adh)
January 19, 2024 Filing 10 SUBMISSION OF TRANSCRIPT of Administrative Record. filed by Nathan E. Wyatt on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Court Transcript Index 01-02-2024, #2 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable 04-23-2021, #3 Payment Documents and Decisions 04-23-2021, #4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices 04-23-2021, #5 Non Disability Related Development 04-23-2021, #6 Disability Related Development 04-23-2021, #7 Medical Records 04-23-2021, #8 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable 01-02-2024, #9 Payment Documents and Decisions 01-02-2024, #10 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices 01-02-2024, #11 Non Disability Related Development 01-02-2024, #12 Disability Related Development 01-02-2024, #13 Medical Records 01-02-2024)(Wyatt, Nathan)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 12/12/2023. (trf)
December 12, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE - All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Nonetheless, to maintain an equalized docket and to foster efficiency, this action will not be referred to a magistrate judge at this time. See Administrative Order No. 347. Accordingly, until further notice, this case will remain with the assigned district judge. (adh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 11, 2023 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Van Fossan, Jennifer)
December 7, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Wyatt, Nathan)
December 7, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan E. Wyatt on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Wyatt, Nathan)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Commencement of Action and Judge Assignment. Judge Stephen P. McGlynn assigned. An electronic copy of the Complaint is attached. All future documents must bear case number 3:23-cv-3777-SPM. This notice suffices for service under Supplemental Rule 3 as it provides a means of electronic access to the complaint to the SSAOGC and the U.S. Attorney for the Southern District of Illinois. Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Civil Rule 4. (adh)
November 24, 2023 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Otis Clarkson. (Van Fossan, Jennifer)
November 24, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Otis Clarkson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #2 Supplement original filing form)(Van Fossan, Jennifer)
November 24, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Van Fossan on behalf of Otis Clarkson (Van Fossan, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clarkson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Clarkson
Represented By: Jennifer M. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Nathan E. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?