Ernst v. Darden Restaurants, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ann Ernst
Defendant: Darden Restaurants, Inc. and Darden Restaurants, Inc. a corporation doing business as Longhorn Steakhouse
Case Number: 3:2023cv03778
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Ann Ernst. (Beasley, Jarrod)
January 12, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jarrod P. Beasley on behalf of Ann Ernst (Beasley, Jarrod)
January 9, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Busch on behalf of Darden Restaurants, Inc. (Busch, Julie)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2024 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty via ZOOM. The parties will receive a ZOOM invitation via email from the Court. Joint Report of the Parties due seven days before the conference. The parties are reminded that the proposed discovery and dispositive motions deadlines must be in compliance with the requirements set forth in this Court's form order. See also SDIL-LR 7.1(f) and Timetable. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 1/2/2024. (jmj)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 1/2/2024. (jmj)
January 2, 2024 Filing 14 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Presumptive Jury Trial set for January 2025 in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 1/2/2024. (jmj)
December 28, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 23-CV-3778-MAB. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (clw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 28, 2023 Filing 12 FINAL CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Rice, Philip) Modified on 12/28/2023 (clw).
December 28, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #10 Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge. The form is incomplete. It fails to list which party is consenting or not consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Signing the submitted by portion of the form is insufficient. Therefore, the pleading is STRICKEN. Another form is attached to this Notice. The form should be re-filed as soon as possible. Under Name of Party or Parties you must print the name of the party that is consenting or not consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction. You should also sign the form under signature of party or attorney. Please note that as a plaintiff proceeding pro se, you may only sign pleadings on your own behalf. You may not sign pleadings on behalf of other unrepresented parties.(kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 27, 2023 Filing 10 STRICKEN CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Rice, Philip) Modified on 12/28/2023 (kdw).
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Rice on behalf of Plaintiff Ann Ernst. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 20, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Philip R. Rice $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-5265309 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Rice, Philip)
December 20, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE: Ann Ernst. was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, Ann Ernst. shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. Consent due by 12/27/2023 (kdw)
December 19, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Conforti, Gregory)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Darden Restaurants, Inc..(Conforti, Gregory)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Orders 347 and 367. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or non-consent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: All Parties. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 23-3778-MAB. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 12/19/2023 (kdw)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by Darden Restaurants, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet (Conforti, Gregory)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory D. Conforti on behalf of Darden Restaurants, Inc. (Conforti, Gregory)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Clair County, case number 23LA1153 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-5243423), filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D and E)(Conforti, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ernst v. Darden Restaurants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Ernst
Represented By: Philip R. Rice
Represented By: Jarrod P. Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darden Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory D. Conforti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darden Restaurants, Inc. a corporation doing business as Longhorn Steakhouse
Represented By: Julie Busch
Represented By: Gregory D. Conforti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?