Powell v. Rennegarbe et al
Plaintiff: Amory Powell
Defendant: Gary Rennegarbe and Garys Tire Center, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv03786
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Filing 14 CJRA TRACK B assigned: The Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 2/6/2025 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 2/24/2025 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Joint Proposed Discovery due by 2/15/2024. Parties are to submit a Joint Report regarding Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order within 28 days of the entry of this filing. Scheduling/Discovery and Settlement Conferences will NOT be set for hearing unless requested by the parties or deemed necessary by the Court. (tag)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/18/2024. (tag)
January 4, 2024 Filing 12 Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants.(Eckert, Van-Lear)
January 4, 2024 Filing 11 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by All Defendants. (Eckert, Van-Lear)
January 4, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Van-Lear P. Eckert on behalf of All Defendants (Eckert, Van-Lear)
December 15, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amory Powell. Garys Tire Center, Inc. served on 12/11/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service of Defendant Gary's Tire Center)(Oliphant, Philip)
December 15, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amory Powell. Gary Rennegarbe served on 12/11/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service of Defendant Gary Rennegarbe)(Oliphant, Philip)
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge J. Phil Gilbert for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 23-cv-03786-JPG. (jlh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 29, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Oliphant, Philip)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Garys Tire Center, Inc., Gary Rennegarbe. Originals mailed to Attorney Philip Oliphant. (aza)
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Orders 347 and 367. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or non-consent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Amory Powell. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:23-cv-3786-RJD. Consent due by 12/20/2023 (adh)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting #2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Philip Oliphant on behalf of Amory Powell.(adh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Philip Oliphant $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-5245251 by on behalf of Amory Powell. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Sup. Ct. Tenn. Certificate of Good Standing)(Oliphant, Philip)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for violations of the FLSA & IMWL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-5245161.), filed by Amory Powell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Defendant Gary Rennegarbe, #3 Summons for Defendant Gary's Tire Center, Inc.)(Oliphant, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Rennegarbe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amory Powell
Represented By: Philip Oliphant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Rennegarbe
Represented By: Van-Lear P. Eckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garys Tire Center, Inc.
Represented By: Van-Lear P. Eckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?