Harris v. Lawrence
Plaintiff: Caylon Harris
Defendant: Lawrence
Case Number: 3:2023cv04006
Filed: December 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court DISCHARGES the order to show cause (Doc. 5)and GRANTS the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 2). The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to send the plaintiff a sufficient number of blank summons forms and USM-285 forms along with this order. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/7/2024. (jdh)
January 22, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT/REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, this case will remain with the assigned Judge J. Phil Gilbert. This Notice does not alter any prior referrals of motions or matters pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(b)(1-3). (jle)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 19, 2024 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (tkm)
January 16, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE: Caylon Harris was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, Caylon Harris shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. Consent due by 1/23/2024 (kdw)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff Caylon Harris has filed two lawsuits that appear to involve the same set of facts and allegations: this case and Harris v. Lawrence, 23-cv-4005-JPG. The Court ORDERS Harris to SHOW CAUSE on or before January 31, 2024, why the Court should not dismiss this case as duplicative of 23-cv-4005-JPG. If Harris fails to timely respond to this order to show cause, the Court will dismiss this case as duplicative and mistakenly filed and will not assess a filing fee for this case. Show Cause Response due 1/31/2024. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/12/2024. (tlp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 22, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Caylon Harris to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Caylon Harris on 12/22/2023. Consent due by 1/12/2024 (tkm)
December 22, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 23-4006-JPG. Refer to the pro se litigant guide, found on the ILSD website, for further information. (tkm)
December 21, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Caylon Harris. (tkm)
December 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lawrence, filed by Caylon Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tkm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caylon Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?