Lipscomb v. Wills et al
Plaintiff: Keon V. Lipscomb
Defendant: Anthony Wills, Lieutenant Blake, Lieutenant Chiggy and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2024cv01233
Filed: May 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 HIPAA Qualified Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/21/2024. (tkm)
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Protective Order. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter the Court's standard HIPAA protective order. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/21/2024. (anp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 20, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Protective Order by Lieutenant Blake, Lieutenant Chiggy, Anthony Wills. (CreelGould, Evan)
June 11, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan CreelGould on behalf of Lieutenant Blake, Lieutenant Chiggy, Anthony Wills (CreelGould, Evan)
June 7, 2024 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Lieutenant Blake waiver sent on 6/4/2024, answer due 8/5/2024; Lieutenant Chiggy waiver sent on 6/4/2024, answer due 8/5/2024; Anthony Wills waiver sent on 6/4/2024, answer due 8/5/2024. (tjk)
June 4, 2024 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Lt. Blake, Lt. Chiggy, and Anthony Wills on 6/4/2024. Waiver of Service due by 7/8/2024. (tjk)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order for Service of Process upon Lt. Blake, Lt. Chiggy, and Anthony Wills (official capacity only). For the reasons stated above, Counts 1 and 3 shall proceed against Lt. Blake. Count 2 shall proceed against Lt. Chiggy and Lt. John Doe, and Count 4 shall proceed against Lt. Blake, Lt. Chiggy, and Lt. John Doe.The individual capacity claims against Anthony Wills are DISMISSED without prejudice but Wills shall remain in the case, in his official capacity only, for purposes of responding to discovery aimed at identifying Lt. John Doe. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/4/2024. (anp)
May 29, 2024 Filing 11 Initial Prisoner Filing Fee: $ 14.40 received, receipt number 9605 (clw)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (Doc. #4 ). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $14.40. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court upon receipt of this Order. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid.In addition, Plaintiff shall note that the filing fees for multiple cases cumulate. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 436 (7th Cir. 1997), overruled in part on other grounds by Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000); Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626 (7th Cir. 2000). A prisoner who files one suit must remit 20% of his monthly income to the Clerk of the Court until his fees have been paid; a prisoner who files a second suit or an appeal must remit 40%; and so on. Newlin, 123 F.3d at 436. "Five suits or appeals mean that the prisoner's entire monthly income must be turned over to the court until the fees have been paid." Id. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at the Menard Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/22/2024. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 21, 2024 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (tkm)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ("IFP") in this case (see Doc. #4 ), but has failed to provide the necessary prisoner trust fund account information as required by the PLRA to determine whether the inmate is entitled to proceed without prepaying fees and costs. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide the Clerk of Court with the attached certification completed by the Trust Fund Officer at the facility and a copy of his/her trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the period 11/1/2023 to 5/6/2024 no later than 45 days from the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with an Order of this Court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). See generally Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 1051 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994). The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order and the certification form to the Trust Fund Officer at Menard Correctional Center. (Trust Fund Statement due on or before 7/8/2024). Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/20/2024. (tjk)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court has received your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within fourteen days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/20/2024. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 17, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT/REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, this case will remain with the assigned Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. This Notice does not alter any prior referrals of motions or matters pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(b)(1-3). (jaj)
May 17, 2024 Filing 5 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (jaj)
May 17, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Keon V. Lipscomb. (jaj)
May 6, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 5/6/2024. Consent due by 5/28/2024 (kare)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Complaint. Your case number is 24-1233-NJR. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, you are ORDERED to submit the $405.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If you file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the Court must review your trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Thus, you must have the Trust Fund Officer at your facility complete the attached certification and provide a copy of your trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent). If you fail to pay the filing fee or submit the motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by the deadline, the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Sperow v. Melvin, 153 F.3d 780, 781 (7th Cir. 1998). All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within fourteen days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/6/2024. (kare)
May 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Keon V. Lipscomb.(kare)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lipscomb v. Wills et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keon V. Lipscomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Wills
Represented By: Evan CreelGould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Blake
Represented By: Evan CreelGould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Chiggy
Represented By: Evan CreelGould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?