Sprint Communications Company LP v. Vonage Holdings Corp., et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company L.P. alleged that theglobe.com, Inc., Voiceglo Holdings, Inc. and Vonage Holdings Corp. infringed on U.S. Patent No. 6,304,572 entitled "Method, System and Apparatus for Telecommunications Control," 6,663,561 entitled "Method, System and Apparatus for Telecommunications Control," 6,463,052 entitled "Method, System and Apparatus for Telecommunications Control," 6,452,932 entitled "Method, System and Apparatus for Telecommunications Control," 6,473,429 entitled "Broadband Telecommunications System," 6,298,064 entitled "Broadband Telecommunications System," and 6,665,294 entitled "Broadband Telecommunications System."

Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company LP
Defendant: Vonage Holdings Corp. and Vonage America, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Vonage Holdings Corp. and Vonage America, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Sprint Communications Company LP
Case Number: 2:2005cv02433
Filed: October 4, 2005
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: John W. Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER overruling and finding as moot 417 Motion for Recusal. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 7/6/2009.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ck)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 417 PRO SE MOTION for Recusal by Interested Party Jonathan Lee Riches. (ck)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 416 DISREGARD THIS DOCUMENT - Filed in wrong case - Court Reporter to re-file. TRANSCRIPT of MARKMAN HEARING held 5/18/09 before Judge Lungstrum, Court Reporter B. Ryder, Telephone number 913-551-5645. Transcript purchased by: Kirkland & Ellis. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2009. (br)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 415 RECEIPT for Trial Exhibits as to Sprint Communications Company LP. (ta)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 414 MINUTE ORDER for Disposal of Exhibits. Parties have fifteen (15) days from date of this order to withdraw trial exhibits from the Clerk's Office, Room #259, 500 State Avenue, Kansas City, Kansas. Signed by Sharon Scheurer, deputy clerk, on 11/6/2008.(ses)
November 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL With Prejudice: Pursuant to the 412 Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice, this action is dismissed with prejudice. Each party to bear their own costs and fees. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/16/07.(mg)
November 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 412 Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER granting 405 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Briefs in support of Post-Trial Motions - Briefs in support of post-trial motions shall be due on or before 3 weeks after the date the certified transcript is complete. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/11/2007. (ses)
October 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 410 Renewed MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, In the Alternative, for New Trial and/or Remittitur by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Campbell, Terrence)
October 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 409 MOTION to Modify Judgment to Include Prejudgment Interest by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
October 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 408 MOTION to Modify Judgment to Include Enhanced Damages by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
October 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 407 MOTION to Modify Judgment to Include Permanent Injunction by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
October 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 406 MOTION to Modify Judgment to Include Royalties from Judgment to Injunction by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
October 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 405 Joint MOTION for extension of time to File Briefs in Support of Post-Trial Motions by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 404 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
September 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 403 JUDGMENT pursuant to the jury verdict returned on 09/25/07, plaintiff Sprint Communications Company, LP shall recover of defendants Vonage Holdings Corp. and Vonage America, Inc., the sum of $69,500,000.000, with interest at the rate of 4.11%, and its costs of action. Signed by a deputy clerk on 09/25/07.(mg)
September 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 402 JURY VERDICT.(ses)
September 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 401 JURY QUESTION #2 and the Court's response filed.(ses)
September 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 400 JURY QUESTION #1 and the Court's Response filed.(ses)
September 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 399 JURY INSTRUCTIONS.(ses)
September 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 398 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Jury Trial completed on 9/25/2007. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (Attachments: # 1 Witness List# 2 Plaintiff's Exhibit List# 3 Defendants' Exhibit List) (ses)
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 397 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Jury Trial held on 9/24/2007 - jury continue deliberations. Recess for the day - deliberations to resume at 10:00 a.m. on 9/25/2007. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 396 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Jury Trial held on 9/21/2007 - Case submitted to the jury. Recess for the day and deliberations to resume at 1:00 pm on 9/24/2007.(Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 395 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Jury Trial (Instruction conference only) held on 9/20/2007. Trial to resume on 9/21/2007 with closing arguments. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 394 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Jury Trial held on 9/19/2007. Trial to resume on 9/20/2007. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 391 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The court construes the disputed claim language to have the meaning and scope set forth in this order and will instruct the jury accordingly. The court finds Vonages prosecution history estoppel and disclosure-dedication rule arguments to be without merit. The court further denies 373 Motion to Strike Vonages Prosecution History Estoppel Defense and Arguments Relating to Same in Vonages Trial Brief. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 9/19/2007. (ses)
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 390 SUPPLEMENTAL Statement and Amended Proposed JURY INSTRUCTION on Enablement by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Campbell, Terrence) (Document title modified on 9/20/2007. (mg))
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER granting 388 Motion to Supplement statement in support of its jury instructions regarding enablement. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 9/19/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 388 MOTION to File Supplemental Statement in Support of its Jury Instruction Regarding Enablement by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Seitz, Adam)
September 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 393 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Jury Trial held on 9/18/2007. Trial to resume on 9/19/2007. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 392 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Jury Trial held on 9/17/2007. Trial to resume on 9/18/2007. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 385 SEALED EXHIBITS F, G and H re 377 RESPONSE in Opposition to Vonage's Trial Brief Regarding the Application of the Doctrine of Equivalents. (Seitz, Adam) (Modified on 9/18/2007. (mg))
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 384 SEALED EXHIBITS G and H re 380 RESPONSE in Opposition to Vonage's Trial Brief Regarding Enablement and Written Description. (Seitz, Adam) (Modified on 09/18/07. (mg))
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER granting 378 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits F, G and H to opposition to Vonage's trial brief regarding the application of the doctrine of equivalents. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Attorneys admitted pro hac vice must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 9/17/2007. (ses)
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER granting 381 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits G and H to its opposition to Vonage's Trial Brief regarding enablement and written discription. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Attorneys admitted pro hac vice must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 9/17/2007. (ses)
September 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 387 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Jury Trial held on 9/14/2007. Trial to resume on 9/17/2007. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 381 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits G and H by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit g# 2 Exhibit h) (Seitz, Adam)
September 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 380 RESPONSE in Opposition to Vonage's Trial Brief Regarding Enablement and Written Description by Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit a# 2 Exhibit b# 3 Exhibit c# 4 Exhibit d# 5 Exhibit e# 6 Exhibit f# 7 Exhibit g# 8 Exhibit h# 9 Exhibit i# 10 Exhibit j# 11 Exhibit k# 12 Exhibit l)(Seitz, Adam)
September 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 379 RESPONSE by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. re 373 MOTION to Strike 354 Prosecution History Estoppel Defense and Arguments Relating to Same in Vonage's Trial Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Campbell, Terrence)
September 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 378 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to Sprint's Responsive Trial Brief #377 by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F# 2 Exhibit G# 3 Exhibit H) (Seitz, Adam)
September 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 377 RESPONSE in Opposition to Vonage's Trial Brief Regarding the Application of the Doctrine of Equivalents by Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F (Under Seal)# 7 Exhibit G (Under Seal)# 8 Exhibit H (Under Seal)# 9 Exhibit I)(Seitz, Adam) (Document title modified on 9/17/2007. (mg))
September 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 386 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Jury Trial held on 9/13/2007. Trial to resume on 9/14/2007. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 376 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Jury Trial held on 9/12/2007. Trial to resume on 9/13/2007 at 9:00 a.m.. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 375 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Jury Trial held on 9/11/2007. Trial to resume on 9/12/2007 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 373 MOTION to Strike 354 Prosecution History Estoppel Defense and Arguments Relating to Same in Vonage's Trial Brief by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam) (Motion title modified on 9/12/2007. (mg))
September 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 372 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 373 Motion to Strike 354 Prosecution History Estoppel Defense and Arguments Relating to Same in Vonage's Trial Brief by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E) (Seitz, Adam) (Document title modified on 9/13/2007 to reflect this is NOT a motion. (mg))
September 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 371 Second Supplmental EXHIBIT LIST by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp..(Campbell, Terrence)
September 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 370 TRIAL BRIEF (Corrected Exhibit E) by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp..(Campbell, Terrence) (Corrected exhibit as to 354 Trial Brief.)
September 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 369 OBJECTION(S) to 349 First Supplemental EXHIBIT LIST filed by Vonage by Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Seitz, Adam)
September 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 368 SEALED EXHIBIT B re 364 Trial Brief. (Campbell, Terrence)
September 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER granting 365 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibit B to Vonage's 364 RESPONSE in Opposition. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Attorneys admitted pro hac vice must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 9/10/2007. (ses)
September 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 366 RESPONSE in Opposition to Vonage's Trial Brief on Claim Construction by Sprint Communications Company LP.(Seitz, Adam) (Document title modified on 9/10/2007. (mg))
September 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 365 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibit B to Vonage's 364 RESPONSE in Opposition by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B) (Campbell, Terrence) (Document title modified on 9/10/2007. (mg))
September 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 364 RESPONSE in Opposition to Sprint's Claim Construction Brief by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Campbell, Terrence) (Document title modified on 9/10/2007. (mg))
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 374 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Jury Trial held on 9/7/2007. Trial to resume on 9/11/2007 at 10:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 363 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Jury Trial held on 9/6/2007. Trial to resume on 9/7/2007 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 360 SUPPLEMENTARY Counter-Designation of Depositions by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Campbell, Terrence) (Document title modified on 9/7/2007. (mg))
September 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 362 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Jury Trial held on 9/5/2007. Trial to resume on 9/6/2007 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 359 SEALED EXHIBITS D and J re 354 Trial Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J)(Campbell, Terrence)
September 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 358 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT LIST by Sprint Communications Company LP.(Seitz, Adam)
September 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER granting 355 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits D and J to Vonage's trial brief. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Attorneys admitted pro hac vice must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 9/5/2007. (ses)
September 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER granting 353 Motion for Leave to File trial brief out of time and said brief is deemed timely filed. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 9/5/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 355 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits D and J to Trial Brief by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D# 2 Exhibit J) (Campbell, Terrence)
September 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 354 TRIAL BRIEF by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit E# 5 Exhibit F# 6 Exhibit G# 7 Exhibit H# 8 Exhibit I)(Campbell, Terrence)
September 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 353 MOTION for Leave to file Trial Brief Out of Time by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Campbell, Terrence)
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 361 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Jury Trial held on 9/4/2007. Trial to resume on 9/5/2007 at 9:00 a.m.(Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 352 TRIAL BRIEF ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION by Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G)(Seitz, Adam)
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 351 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 258 Motion to Exclude the opinions of Vonage's expert Joel M. Halpern regarding the disclosure-dedication rule and the all-limitations rule; granting in part and denying in part 262 Motion to Excludethe opinions of Vonage's expert Frank R. Koperda regarding obviousness and enablement; and granting 287 Motion in Limine concerning the admissibility of evidence relating to the Cisco agreements relating to the issue of damages. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 9/4/2007. (ses)
September 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 350 Amended Joint Proposed JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Seitz, Adam)
August 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 349 First Supplemental EXHIBIT LIST by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp..(Campbell, Terrence)
August 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 348 Joint Proposed JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Seitz, Adam)
August 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 347 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF Concerning Relevance of Cisco Agreement to Damages Defense by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Campbell, Terrence) (Document title modified on 9/4/2007. (mg))
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 346 SUPPLEMENTAL Brief Regarding Section 2.7 of the Sprint/Cisco License Agreement by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 345 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum - Motion Hearing held on 8/29/2007: denying 327 Motion for Leave to File; denying 331 Motion for Leave to File; taking under advisement 258 Motion to Exclude; taking under advisement 262 Motion to Exclude; withdrawing 269 Motion to Exclude; denying 274 Motion to Compel; denying 283 Motion in Limine; granted in part, denied in part and taking under advisement in part 287 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part and withdrawn in part 304 Sealed Motion; withdrawing 312 Motion to Clarify. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (ses)
August 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER granting 341 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Louis N. Jameson is granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Vonage Holdings Corp. and Vonage America, Inc.. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/forms/index.php. Access to Exhibit A to Defendant's 341 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice is sealed. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/28/07. (mg, )
August 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 343 SEALED RESPONSE by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re 304 SEALED MOTION In Limine. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H)(Seitz, Adam)
August 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 342 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. re: 274 MOTION to Compel Production of a Complete Privilege Log and the Documents Described Therein. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Campbell, Terrence)
August 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 341 MOTION for attorney Louis N. Jameson to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Credit Card Receipt Number 1026114.) by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Louis N. Jameson) (Campbell, Terrence)
August 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER directing counsel to file proposed jury instructions no later than 8/31/07. The proposed instructions shall include any proposed claim constructions upon which the parties wish the jury to be instructed. On or before 9/4/07, counsel shall file trial briefs in support of their proposed claim constructions. The parties may file responsive trial briefs on or before 9/7/07. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/27/07.(mh)
August 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 339 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re 331 MOTION for Leave to file Reply Brief in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Sprint's Pre-Litigation Letters. (Buresh, Eric)
August 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 338 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re 327 Emergency MOTION for Leave to file Motion for Summary Judgment In Light of Days-Old Intervening Change In Controlling Law. (Buresh, Eric)
August 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 337 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) re 329 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G# 2 Exhibit H# 3 Exhibit K)(Campbell, Terrence)
August 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 336 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re: 262 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Vonage's Expert Frank Koperda Regarding Obviousness and Enablement. (Seitz, Adam)
August 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 335 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re: 258 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Vonage's Expert Joel Halpern Regarding the Disclosure-Dedication Rule and the All-Limitations Rule. (Seitz, Adam)
August 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER re 304 SEALED MOTION In Limine filed by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. - The court sets a Response deadline of 8/28/2007. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 8/27/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
August 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER re 327 MOTION for Leave to file Motion for Summary Judgment In Light of Days-Old Intervening Change In Controlling Law filed by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. - The court sets a Response deadline of 4:00 p.m. on 8/27/2007. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 8/27/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
August 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER granting 328 Motion for Leave to File Response to Sprint's Motions in Limine out of time granting 330 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Attorneys admitted pro hac vice must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 8/27/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
August 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 331 MOTION for Leave to file Reply Brief in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Sprint's Pre-Litigation Letters by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Campbell, Terrence)
August 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 330 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F# 2 Exhibit G# 3 Exhibit H# 4 Exhibit K) (Campbell, Terrence)
August 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 329 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. re 287 MOTIONS in Limine. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit I# 6 Exhibit J)(Campbell, Terrence)
August 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 328 MOTION for Leave to file Response Out of Time by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Campbell, Terrence)
August 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 327 Emergency MOTION for Leave to file Motion for Summary Judgment In Light of Days-Old Intervening Change In Controlling Law by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Campbell, Terrence)
August 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 326 First Amended WITNESS LIST by Sprint Communications Company LP.(Seitz, Adam)
August 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER granting 324 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Sprint's Opposition to Vonage's Motion in limine (Doc 304) and exhibits thereto. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Attorneys admitted pro hac vice must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 8/24/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
August 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 324 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Sprint's Opposition to Vonage's Motion in limine (Doc 304) and exhibits thereto by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Sprint's Opposition to Motion in limine# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H) (Seitz, Adam)
August 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 323 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re 312 MOTION to Clarify Summary Judgment Ruling as to 35 U.S.C. § 112 Par. 2. (Seitz, Adam)
August 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 322 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re 269 MOTION to Exclude Expert Gerald J. Mossinghoff. (Seitz, Adam)
August 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re 283 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Sprint's Pre-Litigation Letters From Evidence. (Seitz, Adam)
August 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 320 OBJECTION(S) to 286 Witness List, 285 Exhibit List by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp.. (Campbell, Terrence)
August 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 319 OBJECTION(S) to 289 Witness List, 291 Exhibit List by Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Specific Objections to Vonage's Exhibits))(Seitz, Adam)
August 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 318 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re 274 MOTION to Compel Production of a Complete Privilege Log and the Documents Described Therein. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Seitz, Adam)
August 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 317 SEALED EXHIBIT (A) IN SUPPORT of 310 Response to Motion by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Campbell, Terrence)
August 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER granting 311 Motion for Leave to File Exhibit A to defendants' memorandum in oppostion to plaintiff's motion to exclude the opinions of defendants' expert Joel M. Halpern under seal and said exhibit shall be filed no later than close of business today. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Attorneys admitted pro hac vice must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 8/22/2007. (ses)
August 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER re 312 MOTION to Clarify Summary Judgment Ruling as to 35 U.S.C. § 112 Par. 2 filed by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. The court sets a Response deadline of 8/24/2007 and a Reply deadline of 8/27/2007 and this motion is set for hearing at the Limine/Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2007 at 01:00 PM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum.. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 8/22/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
August 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 314 OBJECTION(S) to 288 Objection(s) and to Sprint's Counter-Designations by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp.. (Campbell, Terrence)
August 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 313 OBJECTION(S) to 290 Objection(s) and to Vonage's Counter-Designations by Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
August 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 312 MOTION to Clarify Summary Judgment Ruling as to 35 U.S.C. § 112 Par. 2 by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Campbell, Terrence)
August 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 311 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Campbell, Terrence)
August 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 310 RESPONSE by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. re 258 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Vonage's Expert Joel Halpern Regarding the Disclosure-Dedication Rule and the All-Limitations Rule. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B# 2 Exhibit C# 3 Exhibit D# 4 Exhibit E)(Campbell, Terrence)
August 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 309 RESPONSE by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. re 262 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Vonage's Expert Frank Koperda Regarding Obviousness and Enablement. (Campbell, Terrence)
August 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER - The Federal Judicial Center, the educational arm of the United States Courts, in 2002 produced and published an approximately 17 minute long video designed to be shown to jurors in patent jury trials. It contains background information intended to help jurors understand what patents are, why they are needed, how inventors get them, the role of the PTO, and why disputes over patents arise. It was developed with the assistance of an advisory committee of district judges and patent attorneys and the FJC represents that special care was taken to be even handed. The undersigned has reviewed the video and believes that it might be helpful to the jury in this case to play it for them either in connection with jury selection or after jury selection and before opening statement. A copy of the video will be made available to the parties on Wednesday, August 22, 2007. The video can be picked up by counsel, or a representative thereof, anytime after 10:00 a.m. on August 22, 2007, in Room 517, Robert J. Dole United States Courthouse, 500 State Avenue, Kansas City, Kansas. Any objections to the court playing the video at trial shall be filed with the court no later than noon on Friday, August 24, 2007. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 8/21/2007.(ses)
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER granting 302 Emergency Motion to Strike defendant's motions in limine; striking 292 Motion in Limine; striking 294 Motion in Limine; striking 296 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 8/20/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 306 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Motion Hearing held by telephone on 8/20/2007 re 302 Emergency MOTION to Strike Vonage's Motions in Limine filed by Sprint Communications Company LP. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 305 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 302 MOTION to Strike 292 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Infringement of the '052 Patent and the '561 Patent Under the Doctrine of Equivalents, 295 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 293 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 297 MOTION to Strike 292 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Infringement of the '052 Patent and the '561 Patent Under the Doctrine of Equivalents, 295 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 293 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 297 MOTION to Strike 292 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Infringement of the '052 Patent and the '561 Patent Under the Doctrine of Equivalents, 295 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 293 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 297 : (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Motion Hearing by telephone set for 8/20/2007 at 04:30 PM (Central) before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. All counsel who wish to participate in this conference call shall call the conference operator prior to 4:30 p.m. The conference operator can be reached by dialing 1-866-207-0261 and the conference ID # is 14190876.(ses)
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 304 SEALED MOTION In Limine by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E-1# 6 Exhibit E-2# 7 Exhibit E-3# 8 Exhibit F# 9 Exhibit G# 10 Exhibit H# 11 Exhibit I) (Theisen, Catherine)
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 303 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 302 Emergency MOTION to Strike Vonage's Motions in Limine regarding 292 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Infringement of the '052 Patent and the '561 Patent Under the Doctrine of Equivalents, 295 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 293 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 297 MOTION to Strike 292 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Infringement of the '052 Patent and the '561 Patent Under the Doctrine of Equivalents, 295 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 293 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 297 MOTION to Strike 292 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Infringement of the '052 Patent and the '561 Patent Under the Doctrine of Equivalents, 295 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 293 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 297 by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam) (Motion title modified on 8/21/2007. (mg))
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 302 Emergency MOTION to Strike Vonage's Motions in Limine regarding 292 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Infringement of the '052 Patent and the '561 Patent Under the Doctrine of Equivalents, 295 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 293 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 297 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 294 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Arguements Under the 932 Patent That the Claimed Step Of "Selecting a Narrowband Switch" Can Be Read On Vonage's System Selecting A DS0 Connection, 296 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of the 301 Family Patents by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam) (Motion title modified on 08/21/07. (mg))
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER granting 298 Motion for Leave to File Motion in limine and brief in support, as well as related exhibits, Under Seal by the close of business today. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Attorneys admitted pro hac vice must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 8/20/2007. (ses)
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 300 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Vonage's Fifth Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp.. (Kaine, Patrick)
August 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 299 First Supplemental EXHIBIT LIST by Sprint Communications Company LP.(Seitz, Adam)
August 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 298 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Motion In Limine# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E-1# 7 Exhibit E-2# 8 Exhibit E-3# 9 Exhibit F# 10 Exhibit G# 11 Exhibit H# 12 Exhibit I) (Theisen, Catherine)
August 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 297 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 296 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of the 301 Family Patents Under the Doctrine of Equivalents by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G)(Campbell, Terrence)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 296 (STRICKEN; See 307 . MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of the 301 Family Patents by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Campbell, Terrence) (Stricken on 8/22/2007. (mg))
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 295 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 294 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Arguements Under the 932 Patent That the Claimed Step Of "Selecting a Narrowband Switch" Can Be Read On Vonage's System Selecting A DS0 Connection by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Campbell, Terrence)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 294 (STRICKEN; See 307 . MOTION in Limine to Preclude Arguements Under the 932 Patent That the Claimed Step Of "Selecting a Narrowband Switch" Can Be Read On Vonage's System Selecting A DS0 Connection by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Campbell, Terrence) (Stricken on 8/22/2007. (mg))
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 293 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 292 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Infringement of the '052 Patent and the '561 Patent Under the Doctrine of Equivalents by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Campbell, Terrence)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 292 (STRICKEN; See 307 . MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Infringement of the '052 Patent and the '561 Patent Under the Doctrine of Equivalents by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Campbell, Terrence) (Stricken on 8/22/2007. (mg))
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 291 EXHIBIT LIST by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp..(Theisen, Catherine)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 290 OBJECTION(S) to 281 Designation of Depositions and Counter-Designations by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp.. (Theisen, Catherine)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 289 WITNESS LIST by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp..(Campbell, Terrence)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 288 OBJECTION(S) to 280 Designation of Depositions and Counter-Designations by Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MOTIONS in Limine and Briefs in Support by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C) (Seitz, Adam)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 286 WITNESS LIST by Sprint Communications Company LP.(Seitz, Adam)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 285 EXHIBIT LIST by Sprint Communications Company LP.(Seitz, Adam)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 284 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 283 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Sprint's Pre-Litigation Letters by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9)(Campbell, Terrence)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Sprint's Pre-Litigation Letters by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Campbell, Terrence)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER Granting 269 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Motion Regarding Gerald J. Mossinghoff. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 8/17/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
August 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 281 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION(S) by Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
August 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 280 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION(S) by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp.. (Campbell, Terrence)
August 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER expediting the response and reply deadlines regarding 274 MOTION to Compel Production of a Complete Privilege Log and the Documents Described Therein filed by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. Response deadline set for 8/22/2007 and Reply deadline set for 8/27/2007. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 8/15/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
August 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 278 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 274 MOTION to Compel Production of a Complete Privilege Log and the Documents Described Therein: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2007 at 01:00 PM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. (ses)
August 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER finding as moot 222 Motion for Protective Order on grounds that the disputed issue has been resolved within the Court's Order Nunc Pro Tunc (doc. 276). Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 08/15/2007. (mts)
August 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC re 192 Order Granting Vonage's Motion to Compel. Original Order is revised to grant motion in part and deny motion in part. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 08/15/2007. (mts)
August 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 274 MOTION to Compel Production of a Complete Privilege Log and the Documents Described Therein by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit List# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Exhibit K# 13 Exhibit L# 14 Exhibit M# 15 Exhibit N# 16 Exhibit O# 17 Exhibit P)(Campbell, Terrence) (Motion title modified on 8/15/2007. (mg))
August 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MOTION to Compel Production of a Complete Privilege Log and the Documents Described Therein by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Campbell, Terrence) (Motion title modified on 8/15/2007. (mg))
August 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER granting 272 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Helesa K. Lahey for Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc.. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/forms/index.php. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/14/07.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
August 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 272 MOTION for attorney Helesa K. Lahey to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50.00, Credit Card Receipt Number 1016079.) by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit # 2 Electronic Filing Registration Form) (Kaine, Patrick)
August 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 271 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 269 MOTION to Exclude Expert Gerald J. Mossinghoff: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2007 at 01:00 PM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. (ses)
August 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 270 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 269 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Motion Regarding Gerald J. Mossinghoff, and Subject Thereto, Motion to Preclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Proffered Expert Gerald J. Mossinghoff by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D)(Theisen, Catherine) (Duplicate filers removed on 8/13/2007. (mg)) (Motion title modified on 8/17/2007. (Sealed User MG))
August 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 269 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Motion Regarding Gerald J. Mossinghoff, and Subject Thereto, Motion to Preclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Proffered Expert Gerald J. Mossinghoff by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Theisen, Catherine) (Duplicate filers removed on 8/13/2007. (mg)) (Motion title modified on 8/17/2007. (Sealed User MG))
August 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER - The 266 Order previously entered in this case incorrectly schedules the trial in this case to begin at 9:30 AM on 9/4/2007. The correct time is 10:30 AM on 9/4/2007 before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. All other deadlines remain in effect. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 8/10/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
August 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 267 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions: 258 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Vonage's Expert Joel Halpern Regarding the Disclosure-Dedication Rule and the All-Limitations Rule and 262 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Vonage's Expert Frank Koperda Regarding Obviousness and Enablement. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Motion Hearing (limine conference) set for 8/29/2007 at 01:00 PM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. (ses)
August 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER - Jury Trial set for 9/4/2007 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. Status (LIMINE) Conference set for 8/29/2007 at 01:00 PM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. Motions in limine shall be filed by 8/17/2007 and responses thereto shall be filed by 8/24/2007. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DEADLINE INFORMATION. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 8/8/2007.(ses, )
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting 261 Sealed Motion for Leave to file Under Seal its Brief in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Vonages Expert Joel M. Halpern Regarding the Disclosure-Dedication Rule and the All-Limitations Rule and Exhibits thereto. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Attorneys admitted pro hac vice must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 8/7/2007. (ses)
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 264 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 196 Motion to Exclude; granting in part and denying in part 198 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 200 Motion for Summary Judgment; overruling 210 Motion for Review; granting 215 Motion to Strike, and granting 245 MOTION to Strike Arguments Raised for the First Time by Vonage in its Summary Judgment 237 Reply Brief. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 8/7/2007. (ses)
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 263 SEALED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 262 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Vonage's Expert Frank Koperda Regarding Obviousness and Enablement by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Seitz, Adam)
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 262 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Vonage's Expert Frank Koperda Regarding Obviousness and Enablement by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 261 SEALED MOTION (Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Vonage's Expert Joel Halpern Regarding the Disclosure-Dedication Rule and the All-Limitations Rule by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Seitz, Adam)
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER granting 257 motion for leave to file under seal. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/07/07. (mh)
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER granting 256 motion for leave to file under seal. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/07/07. (mh)
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 258 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Vonage's Expert Joel Halpern Regarding the Disclosure-Dedication Rule and the All-Limitations Rule by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 257 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal its Brief in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Frank Koperda Regarding Obviousness and Enablement and all Exhibits Thereto by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support re Koperda Motion# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E) (Seitz, Adam)
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 256 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal its Brief in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Vonage's Expert Joel Halpern Regarding the Disclosure-Dedication Rule and the All-Limitations Rule and all Exhibits Thereto by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support- Motion to Exclude Halpern Opinions# 2 Exhibit A) (Seitz, Adam)
August 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 255 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Notice of Prior Art Under 35 U.S.C. § 282 by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp.. (Theisen, Catherine)
July 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Telephone Conference held on 7/20/2007. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
July 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 253 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re: 245 MOTION to Strike Arguments Raised for the First Time by Vonage in its Summary Judgment 237 Reply Brief. (Seitz, Adam)
July 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Catherine C. Theisen on behalf of Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp.. (Theisen, Catherine)
July 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Terrence J. Campbell on behalf of Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp.. (Campbell, Terrence)
July 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 250 NOTICE of Hearing: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Telephone Conference set for 7/20/2007 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. All counsel who wish to participate in this conference call shall contact the conference operator prior to 10:00 a.m. on 7/20/2007. The conference operator can be reached by dialing 1-866-207-0261 and the conference ID # is 10418498.(ses)
July 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. re 245 MOTION to Strike Arguments Raised for the First Time by Vonage in its Summary Judgment 237 Reply Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lolli, Don)
July 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER - The court sets the following expedited response/reply deadlines re 245 MOTION to Strike Arguments Raised for the First Time by Vonage in its Summary Judgment 237 Reply Brief filed by Sprint Communications Company LP: Defendant's Response deadline is 7/16/2007 and plaintiff's Reply deadline is 7/18/2007. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 7/13/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses) (Motion title modified on 7/13/2007. (mg))
July 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 247 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re: 222 MOTION for Protective Order on Topic 18 of Vonage's 2nd 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice. (Seitz, Adam)
July 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 245 MOTION to Strike Arguments Raised for the First Time by Vonage in its Summary Judgment 237 Reply Brief by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam) (Motion title modified on 7/13/2007. (mg))
July 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MOTION to Strike Arguments Raised for the First Time by Vonage in its Summary Judgment 237 Reply Brief by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam) (Motion title modified on 7/13/2007. (mg))
July 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 244 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re: 215 MOTION to Strike or Disregard Portions of Vonage's Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. (Seitz, Adam)
July 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting 242 Motion for leave to file reply in support of motion for summary judgment and exhibits conventionally under seal and to withdraw doc. 237. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 7/10/2007. (ses)
July 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Conventionally Under Seal and to Withdraw Document No. 237 and Memorandum in Support by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. (Lolli, Don)
July 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 241 SEALED EXHIBITS (26, 27, 28, 29, 30, 36, & 37) IN SUPPORT of 236 Reply to Response to 198 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Filed Under Seal.)(mg)
July 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 240 SEALED EXHIBITS (1 & 2) IN SUPPORT of 235 Reply to Response to 198 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Vonage's Expert Joel M. Halpern by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Filed Under Seal.)(mg)
July 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 239 SEALED EXHIBITS (X-Z and CC-II) IN SUPPORT of 237 Reply to Response to 200 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiffs Vonage America, Inc. and Vonage Holdings Corp. (Filed Under Seal.)(mg)
July 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 238 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of 237 Reply to Response to Motion by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit T (Part 1)# 2 Exhibit T (Part 2)# 3 Exhibit T (Part 3)# 4 Exhibit T (Part 4)# 5 Exhibit U# 6 Exhibit V# 7 Exhibit W# 8 Exhibit X (filed under seal)# 9 Exhibit Y (filed under seal)# 10 Exhibit Z (filed under seal)# 11 Exhibit AA# 12 Exhibit BB# 13 Exhibit CC (filed under seal)# 14 Exhibit DD (filed under seal)# 15 Exhibit EE (filed under seal)# 16 Exhibit FF (filed under seal)# 17 Exhibit GG (filed under seal)# 18 Exhibit HH (filed under seal)# 19 Exhibit II (filed under seal)# 20 Exhibit JJ# 21 Exhibit KK# 22 Exhibit LL# 23 Exhibit MM)(Lolli, Don) (Filer title modified on 7/10/2007. (mg))
July 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 237 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. re: 200 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Lolli, Don) (Temporary seal pending motion to seal being filed. Modified on 7/9/2007. (mg)) (Sealed on 7/10/2007; see 243 . (mg))
July 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 236 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re: 198 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 23# 2 Exhibit 24# 3 Exhibit 25# 4 Exhibit 26 (filed Under Seal)# 5 Exhibit 27 (filed Under Seal)# 6 Exhibit 28 (filed Under Seal)# 7 Exhibit 29 (filed Under Seal)# 8 Exhibit 30 (filed Under Seal)# 9 Exhibit 31 (Part A)# 10 Exhibit 31 (Part B)# 11 Exhibit 31 (Part C)# 12 Exhibit 31 (Part D)# 13 Exhibit 32# 14 Exhibit 33# 15 Exhibit 34# 16 Exhibit 35# 17 Exhibit 36 (filed Under Seal)# 18 Exhibit 37 (filed Under Seal)# 19 Exhibit 38)(Seitz, Adam)
July 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 235 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re: 196 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Vonage's Expert Joel M. Halpern. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (filed Under Seal)# 2 Exhibit 2 (filed Under Seal))(Seitz, Adam)
July 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting 233 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Lauren E. DeBruicker for Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc.. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/forms/index.php. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05-2433. (ses)
July 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MOTION for attorney Lauren E. DeBruicker to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Credit Card Receipt Number 990289.) by Defendants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp., Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit # 2 Electronic Filing Registration Form) (Kaine, Patrick)
July 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Waxse - 222 MOTION for Protective Order on Topic 18 of Vonage's 2nd 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice filed by Sprint Communications Company LP. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 7/2/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
June 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 231 SEALED EXHIBIT (1) IN SUPPORT of 229 Memorandum in Opposition to 222 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiffs Vonage America, Inc. and Vonage Holdings Corp. (Filed Under Seal.)(mg)
June 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. re 215 MOTION to Strike or Disregard Portions of Vonage's Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lolli, Don)
June 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. re 222 MOTION for Protective Order on Topic 18 of Vonage's 2nd 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (filed under seal)# 2 Exhibit 2)(Lolli, Don)
June 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 228 SEALED EXHIBITS (3, 4, 5, and 7) IN SUPPORT of 227 Memorandum in Opposition to 210 Motion for Review and Objections to Orders of May 14, 2007 and May 16, 2007 Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 72 by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Filed Under Seal.)(mg)
June 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 227 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re 210 MOTION for Review and Objections to Orders of May 14, 2007 and May 16, 2007 Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 72. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3 [Filed Under Seal]# 4 Exhibit 4 [Filed Under Seal]# 5 Exhibit 5 [Filed Under Seal]# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7 [Filed Under Seal]# 8 Exhibit 8 [Part 1 Of 2]# 9 Exhibit 8 [Part 2 Of 2]# 10 Exhibit 9 [Part 1 Of 2]# 11 Exhibit 9 [Part 2 Of 2]# 12 Exhibit 10# 13 Exhibit 11)(Seitz, Adam)
June 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 226 RESPONSE re 221 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
June 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 225 SEALED EXHIBITS (C,G,H,I,J,K,and L) IN SUPPORT of 218 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion 219 Amended Affidavit. Maintained in clerks office and copy to chambers. (mm)
June 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 224 SEALED EXHIBITS (A,F,G, and H) IN SUPPORT of 218 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion 220 and Exhibits. Maintained in clerks office and copy to chambers. (mm)
June 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 222 MOTION for Protective Order on Topic 18 of Vonage's 2nd 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O)(Seitz, Adam)
June 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MOTION for Protective Order on Topic 18 of Vonage's 2nd 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
June 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiff shall show good cause in writing by 6/18/2007 why it has filed to respond to defendants' objection/motion to review (doc. 132). Plaintiff must file, on or before 6/18/2007, any response to defendant's objection/motion that it wishes the court to consider if it finds good cause. If plaintiff fails to respond to defendants' objection/motion to review, defendants' objection/motion to review will be considered and decided as uncontested. If plaintiff files a response, the court will promptly schedule a telephone hearing on the motion. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 6/13/2007.(ses)
June 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 220 AFFIDAVIT of Donald R. McPhail and EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of 218 Memorandum in Opposition to 198 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (filed under seal)# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F (filed under seal)# 7 Exhibit G (filed under seal)# 8 Exhibit H (filed under seal)# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J-1# 11 Exhibit J-2# 12 Exhibit K-1# 13 Exhibit K-2# 14 Exhibit K-3# 15 Exhibit L# 16 Exhibit M# 17 Exhibit N# 18 Exhibit O# 19 Exhibit P# 20 Exhibit Q-1# 21 Exhibit Q-2# 22 Exhibit Q-3# 23 Exhibit R# 24 Exhibit S-1# 25 Exhibit S-2# 26 Exhibit T)(Lolli, Don) (Modified on 6/13/2007. (mg))
June 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 219 Amended AFFIDAVIT of Patrick D. McPherson re 218 Memorandum in Opposition to 198 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C (filed under seal)# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G (filed under seal)# 8 Exhibit H (filed under seal)# 9 Exhibit I (filed under seal)# 10 Exhibit J (filed under seal)# 11 Exhibit K (filed under seal)# 12 Exhibit L (filed under seal)# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N)(Lolli, Don) (Modified on 6/13/2007. (mg))
June 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Defendants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. re 198 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Patrick D. McPherson, Esq. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f))(Lolli, Don)
June 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 217 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Opposition (with sealed exhibits A-U) by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP regarding 200 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Filed Under Seal.)(mg)
June 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 215 MOTION to Strike or Disregard Portions of Vonage's Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
June 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MOTION to Strike or Disregard Portions of Vonage's Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
June 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. re 196 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Vonage's Expert Joel M. Halpern. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B-1# 3 Exhibit B-2# 4 Exhibit B-3# 5 Exhibit C)(Lolli, Don)
June 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 213 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. of Defendants' Objections to Plaintiff's First Notice of Deposition of Vonage Holdings Corp. and Vonage America, Inc. Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6). (Lolli, Don)
May 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 212 SEALED EXHIBITS (A, B and O) IN SUPPORT of 210 MOTION for Review and Objections to Orders of May 14, 2007 and May 16, 2007 Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 72 by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Filed Under Seal.)(mg)
May 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 210 MOTION for Review and Objections to Orders of May 14, 2007 and May 16, 2007 Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 72 by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (filed under seal)# 2 Exhibit B (filed under seal)# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D-1# 5 Exhibit D-2# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H-1# 10 Exhibit H-2# 11 Exhibit I# 12 Exhibit J# 13 Exhibit K# 14 Exhibit L# 15 Exhibit M# 16 Exhibit N-1# 17 Exhibit N-2# 18 Exhibit N-3# 19 Exhibit N-4# 20 Exhibit O (Filed under Seal))(Kaine, Patrick) (Filers title modified on 5/30/2007. (mg))
May 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MOTION for Review and Objections to Orders of May 14, 2007 and May 16, 2007 Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 72 by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. (Kaine, Patrick) (Filer titles modified on 5/30/2007. (mg))
May 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER granting 208 Motion to extend deadlines. Opposition to motion for summary judgment deadline extended to 6/11/2007; reply to opposition to motion for summary judgment deadline extended to 7/6/2007; Vonage's opposition to Sprint's motion to exclude the opinions of Joel M. Halpern due 6/11/2007; and Sprint's reply to opposition to Sprint's motion to exclude due 7/6/2007. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 5/28/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
May 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File oppositions and replies as to 196 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Vonage's Expert Joel M. Halpern, 198 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 200 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Kaine, Patrick)
May 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 207 PRETRIAL ORDER ENTERED: estimated trial time 10 days. Dispositive motion deadline 5/15/2007. Jury Trial set for 9/4/2007 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DEADLINE INFORMATION. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 5/21/2007.(ses)
May 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 206 SEALED MEMORANDUM (and Exhibits A-S) IN SUPPORT of 200 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Vonage America, Inc. and Vonage Holdings Corp. (Filed Under Seal.)(mg)
May 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 205 SEALED EXHIBITS (10, 11, and 12) to 199 Memorandum in Support of 198 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Filed Under Seal.) (mg)
May 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 204 SEALED EXHIBITS (A-E) to 197 Memorandum in Support of 196 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Vonage's Expert Joel M. Halpern by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Filed Under Seal.) (mg)
May 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 203 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Sprint Communications Company LP of Its Supplemental Responses to Vonage's 3rd Set of Requests for Production of Documents/Things (regarding Joe Christie documents). (Seitz, Adam)
May 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER regarding the revisions to the proposed pretrial order submitted by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 5/16/2007.(jm) (Docket text modified on 5/17/2007 to accurately reflect the content of this order. (mg))
May 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 201 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Consolidated Revised Privilege Log by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp.. (Lolli, Don)
May 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Memorandum in support and exhibits filed conventionally under seal by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. (Lolli, Don) (Filers modified on 5/16/2007. (mg))
May 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 198 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10 (Under Seal)# 11 Exhibit 11 (Under Seal)# 12 Exhibit 12 (Under Seal)# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22# 23 Affidavit Adam Seitz)(Seitz, Adam) (Motion title modified on 5/16/2007. (mg))
May 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam) (Motion title modified on 5/16/2007. (mg))
May 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 196 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Vonage's Expert Joel M. Halpern by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A (Under Seal) #(2) Exhibit B (Under Seal) #(3) Exhibit C (Under Seal) #(4) Exhibit D (Under Seal) #(5) Exhibit E (Under Seal))(Seitz, Adam)
May 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Vonage's Expert Joel M. Halpern by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
May 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting 194 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Conventionally Under Seal. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 5/15/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
May 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MOTION for Leave to file Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Conventionally Under Seal by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. (Lolli, Don) (Filers titles modified on 5/30/2007. (mg))
May 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum - Motion Hearing (by telephone) held on 5/14/2007: granting in part 188 Motion for Leave to file Two Separate Summary Judgment Motions with Arguments and Authorities not to Exceed Sixty (60) Pages in Total filed by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp.. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (ses)
May 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER denying 148 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend Answer; granting 150 Defendants' Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony; and finding as moot 180 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 05/14/2007. (mts)
May 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE of Hearing on 188 MOTION for Leave to file Two Separate Summary Judgment Motions with Arguments and Authorities not to Exceed Sixty (60) Pages in Total: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Motion Hearing (by telephone conference) set for 5/14/2007 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. All counsel who wish to participate in the conference call shall call the conference operator prior to 10:00 AM on 5/14/2007. The conference operator can be reached at 1-866-207-0261 and the conference ID number is 9062121.(ses)
May 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re 188 MOTION for Leave to file Two Separate Summary Judgment Motions with Arguments and Authorities not to Exceed Sixty (60) Pages in Total. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Seitz, Adam) (Duplicate text removed on 5/11/2007. (mg))
May 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 188 MOTION for Leave to file Two Separate Summary Judgment Motions with Arguments and Authorities not to Exceed Sixty (60) Pages in Total by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc.(Kaine, Patrick)
May 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MOTION for Leave to file Two Separate Summary Judgment Motions with Arguments and Authorities not to Exceed Sixty (60) Pages in Total by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. (Kaine, Patrick)
May 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 137 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Financial Documents; and granting 181 Defendant Vontage's Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Vonage shall provide the supplemental written answers as specifically described herein within five (5) days of the date of filing of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 5/9/2007.(jm)
May 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 146 Defendants' Motion to Compel Christie Documents, as set out herein. Additionally, Plaintiff's request for sanctions is denied; and Plaintiff shall provide the supplemental written answers as specifically described above within five (5) days of the date of filing of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 5/9/2007.(jm)
May 9, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse: Final Pretrial Conference held on 5/9/2007. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mts)
May 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting 182 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. For a discussion of this ruling, refer to the Court's Memorandum and Order at document 184. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 05/8/2007. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mts)
May 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 134 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 5/8/2007.(jm)
April 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re 182 MOTION for Leave to file Surreply in Support of Vonage Holdings Corp. and Vonage America, Inc.'s Opposition to Sprint Communications Co. L.P.'s Motion to Compel Production of a Privilege Log. (Seitz, Adam)
April 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MOTION for Leave to file Surreply in Support of Vonage Holdings Corp. and Vonage America, Inc.'s Opposition to Sprint Communications Co. L.P.'s Motion to Compel Production of a Privilege Log by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Kaine, Patrick)
April 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MOTION for Leave to file Surreply in Support of Vonage Holdings Corp. and Vonage America, Inc.'s Opposition to Sprint Communications Co. L.P.'s Motion to Compel Production of Financial Documents by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Kaine, Patrick)
April 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MOTION for Leave to file to File Sur-Reply to Vonage's Reply in Support of Vonage's Motion Seeking Leave to Amend (Doc 148) by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Sur-Reply)# 2 Exhibit 1 (to Sur-Reply)) (Seitz, Adam)
April 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 179 SEALED EXHIBITS (1, 2, and 3) IN SUPPORT of 176 Reply to Response to 148 MOTION for Leave to file to Amend Their Respective Answers, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 15 by Defendants Vonage America, Inc. and Vonage Holdings Corp. (Filed Under Seal.)(mg)
April 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 178 SEALED EXHIBITS (1 and 3) IN SUPPORT of 175 Reply to Response to 150 MOTION to Compel Testimony in Response to Their Second Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fe d.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(6) by Defendants Vonage America, Inc. and Vonage Holdings Corp. (Filed Under Seal.)(mg)
April 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 177 SEALED EXHIBITS (3, 4, and 5) IN SUPPORT of 174 Reply to Response to 146 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents of Joseph Michael Christie by Defendants Vonage America, Inc. and Vonage Holdings Corp. (Filed Under Seal.)(mg)
April 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 176 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. re: 148 MOTION for Leave to file to Amend Their Respective Answers, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 15. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (under seal)# 2 Exhibit 2 (under seal)# 3 Exhibit 3 (under seal)# 4 Exhibit 4)(Kaine, Patrick)
April 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 175 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. re: 150 MOTION to Compel Testimony in Response to Their Second Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(6). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (under seal)# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3 (under seal))(Kaine, Patrick)
April 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 174 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. re: 146 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents of Joseph Michael Christie. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3 (under seal)# 4 Exhibit 4 (under seal)# 5 Exhibit 5 (under seal))(Kaine, Patrick)
April 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 173 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re: 137 MOTION to Compel Production of Financial Documents. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(Seitz, Adam)
April 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 172 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re: 134 MOTION to Compel Vonage Holdings, Corp., and Vonage America, Inc. to Produce a Privilege Log. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G)(Seitz, Adam)
April 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 171 SEALED EXHIBITS (1-6) IN SUPPORT of 167 Memorandum in Opposition to 148 MOTION for Leave to file to Amend Their Respective Answers, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 15 by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Filed Under Seal.)(mg)
April 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 170 SEALED EXHIBITS (D and E) IN SUPPORT of 166 Memorandum in Opposition to 150 MOTION to Compel Testimony in Response to Their Second Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(6) by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Filed Under Seal.)(mg)
April 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 169 SEALED EXHIBITS (B and C) IN SUPPORT of 165 Memorandum in Opposition to 146 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents of Joseph Michael Christie by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Filed Under Seal.)(mg)
April 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER denying 156 Defendants' Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The motion is denied on grounds that Defendants have failed to show sufficient good cause for the proposed amendments. Accordingly, and as specifically discussed during the conference, all outstanding discovery must be completed by May 1, 2007. As also discussed at the conference, if counsel are unable to reach agreement on dates for previously agreed upon depositions, the deposing party shall unilaterally issue notices for such depositions in order to complete them prior to the May 1, 2007 deadline. Any Reply brief in support of Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Privilege Log (doc. 134) shall be filed no later than April 17, 2007. Any Reply brief in support of Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Financial Documents (doc. 137)shall be filed no later than April 17, 2007. Any Reply brief in support of Defendants Motion to Compel Christie Documents (doc. 146) shall be filed no later than April 19, 2007. Any Reply brief in support of Defendants Motion to Amend Answer and Counterclaims (doc. 148) shall be filed no later than April 19, 2007. Any Reply brief in support of Defendants Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony (doc. 150) shall be filed no later than April 19, 2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 4/16/2007.(jm)
April 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re 148 MOTION for Leave to file to Amend Their Respective Answers, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 15. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (UNDER SEAL)# 2 Exhibit 2 (UNDER SEAL)# 3 Exhibit 3 (UNDER SEAL)# 4 Exhibit 4 (UNDER SEAL)# 5 Exhibit 5 (UNDER SEAL)# 6 Exhibit 6 (UNDER SEAL)# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8)(Seitz, Adam)
April 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re 150 MOTION to Compel Testimony in Response to Their Second Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(6). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D (UNDER SEAL)# 5 Exhibit E (UNDER SEAL)# 6 Exhibit F)(Seitz, Adam)
April 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re 146 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents of Joseph Michael Christie. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B (UNDER SEAL)# 3 Exhibit C (UNDER SEAL))(Seitz, Adam)
April 13, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/13/2007. Order to follow. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mts)
April 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re 156 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(Seitz, Adam)
April 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 163 RESPONSE by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. re 137 MOTION to Compel Production of Financial Documents. (Kaine, Patrick) (Modified on 4/12/2007. (mg))
April 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE: Telephone Status Conference set for 4/13/2007 at 01:30 PM (central standard time) before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse. The Court will initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 04/11/2007. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mts)
April 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting 159 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 137 MOTION to Compel Production of Financial Documents. Response deadline 4/11/2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 4/10/2007.(jm)
April 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting 155 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Joshua Reuben Brown is granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf Sprint Communications Company LP. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/forms/index.php. Signed by Magistrate JudgeDavid J. Waxse on 04/09/07. (mg)
April 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 137 Motion to Compel Production of Financial Documents by Defendants/ Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. (Kaine, Patrick) (Modified on 4/11/2007. (mg))
April 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 158 RESPONSE by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. re 134 MOTION to Compel Vonage Holdings, Corp., and Vonage America, Inc. to Produce a Privilege Log. (Kaine, Patrick) (Modified on 4/6/2007. (mg))
April 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 156 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G)(Kaine, Patrick)
April 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. (Kaine, Patrick)
April 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MOTION for attorney Joshua R. Brown to appear pro hac vice by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit from admittee Joshua Brown) (Seitz, Adam)
April 4, 2007 Opinion or Order PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID: On 4/4/2007 in the amount of $50.00 for attorney Joshua R. Brown re: 155 MOTION for attorney Joshua R. Brown to appear pro hac vice. Receipt Number K4631007567. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(kao)
April 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 107 Motion to Compel Search Terms; granting in part and finding moot in part 110 Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories 4, 5, 7; granting 120 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Surreply; granting in part and denying in part 143 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Pretrial Order. Dispositive motion deadline extended to 5/15/2007. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5:00 PM on 5/7/2007. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2007 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 04/03/2007. (mts)
April 2, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY for Telephone Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 4/2/2007. Written Order to follow. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ll)
April 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 153 SEALED EXHIBITS "D" and "E" IN SUPPORT of 150 MOTION to Compel Testimony in Response to Their Second Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(6) by Defendants Vonage America, Inc. and Vonage Holdings Corp. (Filed Under Seal.)(mg)
April 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 152 SEALED EXHIBIT "G" IN SUPPORT of 146 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents of Joseph Michael Christie by Defendants Vonage America, Inc. and Vonage Holdings Corp. (Filed Under Seal.)(mg)
March 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 150 MOTION to Compel Testimony in Response to Their Second Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(6) by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D (filed under seal)# 5 Exhibit E (filed under seal))(Kaine, Patrick) (Duplicate text removed on 4/2/2007. (mg))
March 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MOTION to Compel Testimony in Response to Their Second Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(6) by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Kaine, Patrick) (Modified on 4/2/2007. (mg))
March 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 148 MOTION for Leave to file to Amend Their Respective Answers, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 15 by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(Kaine, Patrick)
March 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MOTION for Leave to file to Amend Their Respective Answers, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 15 by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Kaine, Patrick) (Modified on 4/2/2007. (mg))
March 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 146 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents of Joseph Michael Christie by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F-1# 7 Exhibit F-2# 8 Exhibit G (filed under seal))(Kaine, Patrick) (Modified on 4/2/2007. (mg))
March 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents of Joseph Michael Christie by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Kaine, Patrick) (Modified on 4/2/2007. (mg))
March 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER finding as moot 129 Motion to Compel pursuant to the Notice of Withdrawal 142 of this Motion by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 03/30/2007. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mts)
March 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE: Telephone Status Conference set for 4/2/2007 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse to discuss scheduling and other pretrial matters. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 03/30/2007. The Court will initiate this telephone call and there will be no further notice of this call.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mts)
March 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Joint MOTION for extension of time to File Proposed Pretrial Order by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp., Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Lolli, Don)
March 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 142 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Sprint's Motion by Sprint Communications Company LP re 129 MOTION to Compel Defendants Vonage America and Vonage Holdings to Produce Documents Relating to Massoud Kamali and/or Michael Hughes. (Seitz, Adam)
March 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 141 SEALED EXHIBIT J IN SUPPORT of 137 MOTION to Compel Production of Financial Documents by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Filed Under Seal.) (mg)
March 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting 133 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Response to Motion to Compel 129 due 3/23/2007. Reply due 4/6/2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 03/25/2007. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mts)
March 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER finding as moot 128 Motion to Compel pursuant to the Notice of Withdrawal 136 of this Motion by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 03/25/2007. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mts)
March 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 137 MOTION to Compel Production of Financial Documents by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P# 17 Exhibit Q# 18 Exhibit R# 19 Exhibit S# 20 Exhibit T)(Seitz, Adam)
March 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MOTION to Compel Production of Financial Documents by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
March 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 136 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Sprint's Motion to Compel by Sprint Communications Company LP re 128 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents relevant to Vonage's Noninfringement and Invalidity Contentions. (Seitz, Adam)
March 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 134 MOTION to Compel Vonage Holdings, Corp., and Vonage America, Inc. to Produce a Privilege Log by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Seitz, Adam)
March 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MOTION to Compel Vonage Holdings, Corp., and Vonage America, Inc. to Produce a Privilege Log by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
March 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 129 MOTION to Compel Defendants Vonage America and Vonage Holdings to Produce Documents Relating to Massoud Kamali and/or Michael Hughes by Defendants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp., Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. (Kaine, Patrick)
March 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Sprint Communications Company LP of Sprint's 1st Supplemental Responses to Vonage Holdings' 1st Set of Requests for Admission and Sprint's 1st Supplemental Responses to Vonage America's 1st Set of Interrogatories. (Seitz, Adam)
March 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 131 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Vonage Holdings Corp. and Vonage America, Inc.'s Preliminary Witness and Exhibit Disclosures by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp.. (Kaine, Patrick)
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Sprint Communications Company LP of Sprint's Preliminary Exhibit List, Preliminary Witness List and 2nd Supplemental Initial Disclosures (per FRCP 26a1). (Seitz, Adam)
March 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MOTION to Compel Defendants Vonage America and Vonage Holdings to Produce Documents Relating to Massoud Kamali and/or Michael Hughes by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
March 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents relevant to Vonage's Noninfringement and Invalidity Contentions by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K) (Seitz, Adam)
February 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 127 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Vonage Holdings Corp.'s Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP by Vonage Holdings Corp.. (Kaine, Patrick)
February 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 126 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Vonage Holdings Corp.'s Fourth Set of Requests to Sprint Communications Company for the Production of Documents and Things by Vonage Holdings Corp.. (Kaine, Patrick)
February 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting 124 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Disclosure of Preliminary Witnesses and Exhibit Disclosures. The parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time is granted and the deadline for preliminary witness and exhibit disclosures is extended to March 7, 2007. Entered by Magistrate JudgeDavid J. Waxse on 2/22/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
February 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Joint MOTION for extension of time for Disclosure of Preliminary Witnesses and Exhibit Disclosures by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
February 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE of Service of Sprint's Responses to Vonage's 1st Set of Interrogatories; Sprint's Responses to Vonage's 3rd Set of Requests for Production of Documents/Things; and Sprint's Responses to Vonage's 1st Set of Requests for Admissions by Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
February 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 122 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re: 110 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatory Nos 4, 5 and 7. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Seitz, Adam)
February 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Sprint Communications Company LP of Sprint's Responses to Vonage's 2nd Set of Requests for Production of Documents/Things. (Seitz, Adam)
February 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION for Leave to file Sprint's Sur-Reply to Vonage's Reply in Support of Vonage's Motion to Compel (Doc 107) by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Sprint's Sur-Reply# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F) (Seitz, Adam)
February 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 119 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp., Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. re: 107 MOTION to Compel Sprint Communications Co., L.P. to Identify Search Terms used to Search for Relevant Documents Responsive to Vonage's Document Requests. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Kaine, Patrick)
February 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Sprint Communications Company LP of Their 1st Supplemental Responses to Vonage's Interrogatory Nos. 4,6,8,9 and 10. (Seitz, Adam)
February 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. of First Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's Interrogatory No. 5. (Kaine, Patrick)
February 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. re 110 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatory Nos 4, 5 and 7. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kaine, Patrick) (Duplicate text removed on 2/2/2007. (mg))
January 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting 114 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Robert H. Reckers is granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Sprint Communications Company LP. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/forms/index.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 01/31/07. (mg)
January 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MOTION for attorney Robert Reckers to appear pro hac vice by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
January 30, 2007 Opinion or Order PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID: On 1/30/2007 in the amount of $50.00 for attorney Robert H. Reckers re: 114 MOTION for attorney Robert Reckers to appear pro hac vice. Receipt Number K4631006653. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kao)
January 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 106 the parties' Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery deadline 3/30/2007. Dispositive motion deadline 4/30/2007. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/6/2007. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/13/2007 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse. Jury Trial set for 9/4/2007 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DEADLINES.)Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 1/26/2007.(jm)
January 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 112 SEALED EXHIBIT (F) IN SUPPORT of 111 Memorandum in Opposition to 107 MOTION to Compel Sprint Communications Co., L.P. to Identify Search Terms used to Search for Relevant Documents Responsive to Vonage's Document Requests by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Filed Under Seal.)(mg)
January 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re 107 MOTION to Compel Sprint Communications Co., L.P. to Identify Search Terms used to Search for Relevant Documents Responsive to Vonage's Document Requests. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F [Manually Filed Under Seal])(Seitz, Adam)
January 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatory Nos 4, 5 and 7 by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L) (Seitz, Adam)
January 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 109 SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of Motion 107 and Memorandum in Support 108 of motion to compel Sprint Communications Co., L.P to Identify Search Terms used to Search for Relevant Documents Responsive to Vonage's Document Requests by Defendants Vonage America, Inc. and Vonage Holdings Corp. Original document maintained in the Clerk's Office, copy to DJW chambers. (ck )
January 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 107 MOTION to Compel Sprint Communications Co., L.P. to Identify Search Terms used to Search for Relevant Documents Responsive to Vonage's Document Requests by Defendants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp., Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. (Exhibits filed Under Seal pursuant to Stipulated Protective Order dated March 6, 2006) (Kaine, Patrick) (Modified on 2/8/2007. (mg))
January 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION to Compel Sprint Communications Co., L.P. to Identify Search Terms used to Search for Relevant Documents Responsive to Vonage's Document Requests by Defendants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp., Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. (Kaine, Patrick)
December 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Joint MOTION for extension of time regarding certain Discovery deadlines by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
December 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting 100 Defendants' Motion to Extend Certain Discovery Deadlines, as set out herein. Discovery deadline 2/16/2007. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/16/2007. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2007 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse. All other deadlines set forth in the current Scheduling Order, including but not limited to the February 28, 2007 dispositive motion deadline and the August 7, 2007 trial setting, shall remain in full force and effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 12/15/2006.(jm)
December 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Amended MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re 100 MOTION to Extend Certain Discovery Deadlines. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Affidavit ADAM SEITZ)(Seitz, Adam)
November 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting 98 Third Parties' Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 11/27/2006.(jm)
November 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re 100 MOTION to Extend Certain Discovery Deadlines. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Affidavit of Adam Seitz)(Seitz, Adam)
November 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 99 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Donald R. McPhail is granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Vonage Holdings Corp. and Vonage America, Inc.. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/forms/index.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 11/06/06. (mg)
November 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MOTION to Extend Certain Discovery Deadlines by Defendants/Counter Claimants Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E) (Kaine, Patrick) (Motion titke modified on 11/6/2006. (mg))
November 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MOTION for attorney Donald R. McPhail to appear pro hac vice by Defendants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit) (Kaine, Patrick)
November 1, 2006 Opinion or Order PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID: On 11/1/06 in the amount of $50.00 for attorney Donald R. McPhail re: 99 MOTION for attorney Donald R. McPhail to appear pro hac vice. Receipt Number K4631005410. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kao)
October 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Third Party Discovery by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A) (Seitz, Adam)
October 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 96 Stipulation of Dismissal as to defendants Voiceglo Holdings, Inc. and Theglobe.com Inc. (Collectively "Voiceglo"). Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/03/2006.(ses)
October 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice (regarding DEFs Voiceglo Holdings, Inc and Theglobe.com, Inc.) by Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
September 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 94 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Peter E. Strand for Sprint Communications Company LP. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/forms/index.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 9/20/06. (mm)
September 19, 2006 Opinion or Order PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID: on 9/19/06 re: 94 MOTION for attorney Peter E. Strand to appear pro hac vice in the amount of $50.00. Receipt Number 1004697. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jb)
September 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MOTION for attorney Peter E. Strand to appear pro hac vice by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
September 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 93 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Vonage's Response to Plaintiff's Third Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 10-13) and Vonage's Response to Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 56-65) by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp.. (Kaine, Patrick)
August 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 91 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Scott W. Doyle is granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Vonage Holdings Corp. and Vonage America, Inc.. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/forms/index.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 08/18/06. (mg)
August 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION for attorney Scott W. Doyle to appear pro hac vice by Defendants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp.. (Attachments: #(1) Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Kaine, Patrick)
August 17, 2006 Opinion or Order PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID: On 8/17/2006 in the amount of 50.00 for attorney Scott W. Doyle re: 91 MOTION for attorney Scott W. Doyle to appear pro hac vice. Receipt Number K4631004197. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kao)
August 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 90 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of 3rd set of interrogatories and 2nd set of requests for production of documents/things (both to Defendants Vonage Holdings and Vonage America) by Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
April 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 89 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant Voiceglo Holdings, Inc. of taking deposition of Sprint Communications Company L.P. on 4/28/06. (Nehrbass, Scott)
April 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE by Defendants theglobe.com, Inc., Voiceglo Holdings, Inc. of taking deposition of Sprint Communications L.P. on April 19, 2006. (Nehrbass, Scott)
April 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE by Defendants theglobe.com, Inc., Voiceglo Holdings, Inc. of taking deposition of Sprint Communications Company L.P. on April 20, 2006. (Nehrbass, Scott)
April 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying 46 Motion for Protective Order, finding as moot 69 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 04/10/2006. (mts)
March 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Sprint Communications Company LP of Responses to Vonage's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production. (Seitz, Adam)
March 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE OF SERVICE by theglobe.com, Inc., Voiceglo Holdings, Inc. of Response to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories to Voiceglo Holdings, Inc. and theglobe.com, Inc.. (Nehrbass, Scott)
March 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Sprint Communications Company LP.(Seitz, Adam)
March 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Sprint Communications Company LP.(Seitz, Adam)
March 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 81 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company L.P.'s Second Set of Interrogatories by Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage Holdings Corp.. (Kaine, Patrick)
March 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 80 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company L.P.'s Second Set of Interrogatories by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage America, Inc.. (Kaine, Patrick)
March 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 3/6/2006.(jm)
March 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER finding as moot 55 Motion for Protective Order based on Notice of Withdrawal filed by the parties informing the Court that the dispute has been resolved. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 03/06/2006. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mts)
March 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion for Protective Order by Sprint Communications Company LP re 55 MOTION for Protective Order Including an In-House Counsel Provision. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Copy of Stipulated Protective Order)(Seitz, Adam)
February 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 75 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order that Includes an In-House Confidentiality Provision. Defendants shall file such response by March 3, 2006. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 2/28/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
February 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Second MOTION for extension of time (Unopposed) for All Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Protective Order Governing Discovery That Includes An In-House Counsel Provision by Defendants theglobe.com, Inc., Voiceglo Holdings, Inc. (Nehrbass, Scott)
February 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 74 AMENDED ANSWER to 2 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Sprint Communications Company LP, Sprint Communications Company LP by Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage Holdings Corp.. (Kaine, Patrick)
February 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 73 AMENDED ANSWER to 2 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Sprint Communications Company LP, Sprint Communications Company LP by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage America, Inc.. (Kaine, Patrick)
February 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 66 Vonage Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 55 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order Including an In-House Counsel Provision. All Defendants shall have until February 27, 2006 to respond to Plaintiff Sprint's Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 2/23/2006.(jm)
February 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re 69 MOTION for Leave to file Surreply (Seitz, Adam)
February 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEDIATION MINUTE ORDER - Upon the parties request in the footnote of Document 68, the Mediation deadline is hereby extended by two days, up to and including 5/11/2006. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 2/21/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
February 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to file Surreply by Defendant Voiceglo Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A -- Proposed Surreply #(2) Exhibit to Voiceglo's Proposed Surreply) (Nehrbass, Scott) (Duplicate text removed on 02/21/06. (mg))
February 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE of Selection of Mediator and Date of Mediation by Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
February 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Vonage Holdings Corp. of First Requests for Production of Documents and Things and First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff. (Kaine, Patrick)
February 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 55 MOTION for Protective Order Including an In-House Counsel Provision for all defendants to and including February 27, 2006 by Defendants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp.(Kaine, Patrick)
February 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Sprint Communications Company LP of Initial Disclosures. (Seitz, Adam)
February 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 64 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re: 46 MOTION for Protective Order. (Seitz, Adam)
February 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. of Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Documents. (Kaine, Patrick)
February 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE OF SERVICE by theglobe.com, Inc., Voiceglo Holdings, Inc. of Rule 26 production documents. (Nehrbass, Scott)
February 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - denying 32 Motion to Severbased on improper joinder, and granting 24 MOTION to Strike Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim and or MOTION to Dismiss certain affirmative defenses by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP 26 MOTION to Strike 14 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim and or dismiss certain affirmative defenses by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. with leave to file an amended answer and counterclaims no later than February 26, 2006. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 02/10/2006. (ses)
February 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Sprint Communications Company LP of Responses to Voiceglo's Request for Production and First Set of Interrogatories. (Seitz, Adam)
February 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE OF SERVICE by theglobe.com, Inc., Voiceglo Holdings, Inc. of Response to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Response to Plaintff's First Request for Production of Documents and Things. (Nehrbass, Scott)
February 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Sprint Communications Company LP of Second Set of Interrogatories to Voiceglo and theglobe.com. (Seitz, Adam)
February 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company L.P.'s First Request for Production of Documents and Things and Responses and Objections to Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company L.P.'s First Set of Interrogatories by Vonage America, Inc., Vonage America, Inc.. (Kaine, Patrick)
February 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 56 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company L.P.'s First Request for Production of Documents and Things and Responses and Objections to Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company L.P.'s First Set of Interrogatories by Vonage Holdings Corp., Vonage Holdings Corp.. (Kaine, Patrick)
February 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 55 (WITHDRAWN: See 77 Notice of Withdrawal.) MOTION for Protective Order Including an In-House Counsel Provision by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Sprint's Proposed Protective Order) (Seitz, Adam) (Withdrawn on 3/6/2006. (mg))
January 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Defendant Voiceglo Holdings, Inc. re 46 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition. (Nehrbass, Scott)
January 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Voiceglo Holdings, Inc. and theglobe.com, Inc. re: 32 MOTION to Sever and Drop Misjoined Parties. (Oliver, James) (Filer name added on 1/30/2006. (mg))
January 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE by theglobe.com, Inc., Voiceglo Holdings, Inc. of Disclosures pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26. (Nehrbass, Scott)
January 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Sprint Communications Company LP of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures. (Seitz, Adam)
January 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Vonage America, Inc.. (Kaine, Patrick)
January 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Vonage Holdings Corp.. (Kaine, Patrick)
January 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SCHEDULING ORDER from Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 1/28/2006. Discovery deadline 12/29/2006. Dispositive motion deadline set for 2/28/2007. Confidential settlement reports due 3/30/3006. Mediation deadline 5/9/2006. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/17/2007. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2007 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse. Jury Trial set for 8/7/2007 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. (SEE SCHEDULING ORDER FOR FURTHER DEADLINES.) Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 1/18/2006.(jm)
January 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse: A Scheduling Conference was held on 1/18/2006. Scheduling Order to follow. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
January 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company, LP. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A #(2) Exhibit B #(3) Exhibit C #(4) Exhibit D #(5) Exhibit E) (Buresh, Eric) (Text modified on 1/18/2006. (mg))
January 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re: 24 MOTION to Strike 13 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim MOTION to Dismiss, 26 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike 13 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim. (Seitz, Adam)
January 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 44 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP re 32 MOTION to Sever and Drop Misjoined Parties. (Seitz, Adam)
January 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Sprint Communications Company LP of Interrogatories and Document Requests on All Defendants. (Seitz, Adam)
January 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Voiceglo Holdings, Inc. of Voiceglo's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff and Voiceglo's First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Nehrbass, Scott)
January 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE by Defendant Voiceglo Holdings, Inc. of taking deposition of Sprint Representative pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) on January 19, 2006 (Nehrbass, Scott)
December 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by theglobe.com, Inc., Voiceglo Holdings, Inc.. (Nehrbass, Scott)
December 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Defendants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. re 26 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike 13 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, 24 MOTION to Strike 13 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2-A# 3 Exhibit 2-B# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4)(Kaine, Patrick)
December 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vonage America, Inc. identifying Vonage Holdings Corp. as corporate parent (Kaine, Patrick)
December 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vonage Holdings Corp. identifying Vonage Holdings Corp. as corporate parent (Kaine, Patrick)
December 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsere 32 MOTION to Sever and Drop Misjoined Parties. Response deadline extended to 1/13/2006. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/20/2005.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
December 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 33 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 32 MOTION to Sever and Drop Misjoined Parties by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP.(Seitz, Adam)
December 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 30 Stipulated Motion for Modification of the Court's Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling. Parties' planning conference set for 1/4/2006. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 1/11/2006. Scheduling Conference set for 1/18/2006 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 12/19/2005.(jm)
December 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 32 MOTION to Sever and Drop Misjoined Parties by Defendants theglobe.com, Inc., Voiceglo Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Edward A. Cespedes# 2 Exhibit Declaration of James W. Dabney, attaching decision in Electronic Trading)(Nehrbass, Scott)
December 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Sever and Drop Misjoined Parties by Defendants theglobe.com, Inc., Voiceglo Holdings, Inc.. (Nehrbass, Scott)
December 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsere 26 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike 13 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim. Response deadline extended to 12/23/2005. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/16/2005.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ses)
December 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Joint MOTION for extension of time of the deadlines set forth in the Court's Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (Seitz, Adam)
December 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 26 MOTION to Strike, MOTION to Dismiss Certain Affirmative Defenses and 13 Counterclaims by Defendants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp.. (Kaine, Patrick) (Document title modified on 12/16/2005. (mg))
December 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Voiceglo Holdings, Inc. by Sprint Communications Company LP.(Seitz, Adam)
December 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2006 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 12/28/2005. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 12/2/05. (ll)
November 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Strike 14 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim and or dismiss certain affirmative defenses by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP(mm)
November 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ANSWER to Vonage Holdings Corp.'s Counterclaim by Sprint Communications Company LP.(mm)
November 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Strike 13 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim and or MOTION to Dismiss certain affirmative defenses by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company LP. (mm)
November 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWER to Vonage America, Inc.'s Counterclaim by Sprint Communications Company LP.(mm)
November 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by theglobe.com, Inc., Voiceglo Holdings, Inc..(Nehrbass, Scott)
November 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Barry Golob is granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Vonage America, Inc. and Vonage Holdings Corp.. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a registration form at www.ksd.uscourts.gov/features/forms/pdfforms/efilereg.pdf. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 11/08/05. (mg)
November 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 15 and 16 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Patrick D. McPherson and Patrick C. Muldoon are granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Vonage America, Inc. and Vonage Holdings Corp.. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a registration form at www.ksd.uscourts.gov/features/forms/pdfforms/efilereg.pdf. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 11/08/05. (mg)
November 8, 2005 Opinion or Order PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID: on 11/8/05 re: 18 MOTION for attorney Barry Golob to appear pro hac vice in the amount of $50.00. Receipt Number K4631000121. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jb)
November 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by theglobe.com, Inc., Voiceglo Holdings, Inc..(Nehrbass, Scott)
November 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for attorney Barry Golob to appear pro hac vice by Defendants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Lolli, Don)
November 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 9 , 10 , and 11 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys James W. Dabney, Malcolm J. Duncan, and Henry C. Lebowitz are granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of theglobe.com, Inc. and Voiceglo Holdings, Inc.. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a registration form at www.ksd.uscourts.gov/features/forms/pdfforms/efilereg.pdf. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 11/04/05. (mg)
November 4, 2005 Opinion or Order PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID: on 11/4/05 re: 15 MOTION for attorney Patrick D. McPherson to appear pro hac vice, 16 MOTION for attorney Patrick C. Muldoon to appear pro hac vice in the amount of $100.00. Receipt Number K4631000085. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jb)
November 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for attorney Patrick C. Muldoon to appear pro hac vice by Defendants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Lolli, Don)
November 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Patrick D. McPherson to appear pro hac vice by Defendants Vonage America, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Lolli, Don)
November 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Sprint Communications Company LP, Sprint Communications Company LP by Vonage America, Inc..(Lolli, Don)
November 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Sprint Communications Company LP by Vonage Holdings Corp..(Lolli, Don)
November 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline before which Vonage Holdings Corp. must answer or otherwise respond to Amended Complaint is 11/03/2005. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 11/02/2005. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (mat).
November 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Henry C. Lebowitz to appear pro hac vice by Defendants theglobe.com, Inc., Voiceglo Holdings, Inc.. (Nehrbass, Scott)
November 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Malcolm J. Duncan to appear pro hac vice by Defendants theglobe.com, Inc., Voiceglo Holdings, Inc.(Nehrbass, Scott)
November 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for attorney James W. Dabney to appear pro hac vice by Defendants theglobe.com, Inc., Voiceglo Holdings, Inc.(Nehrbass, Scott)
November 2, 2005 Opinion or Order PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID: on 11/2/05 re: 11 MOTION for attorney Henry C. Lebowitz to appear pro hac vice, 10 MOTION for attorney Malcolm J. Duncan to appear pro hac vice, 9 MOTION for attorney James W. Dabney to appear pro hac vice in the amount of $150.00. Receipt Number K4631000022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jb)
October 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Plead by Defendant Vonage Holdings Corp.. (Lolli, Don)
October 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S ORDER extending time until 11/7/05 for Defendants theglobe.com, Inc., Voiceglo Holdings, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Deputy clerk on 10/27/05.(jb)
October 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed -- personal service by Sprint Communications Company LP upon Vonage America, Inc. served on 10/14/2005, answer due 11/3/2005. (Seitz, Adam)
October 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed -- personal service by Sprint Communications Company LP upon Vonage Holdings Corp. served on 10/7/2005, answer due 10/27/2005. (Seitz, Adam)
October 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed -- personal service by Sprint Communications Company LP upon Voiceglo Holdings, Inc. served on 10/7/2005, answer due 10/27/2005. (Seitz, Adam)
October 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed -- personal service by Sprint Communications Company LP upon theglobe.com, Inc. served on 10/7/2005, answer due 10/27/2005. (Seitz, Adam)
October 13, 2005 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vonage America, Inc.. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jb)
October 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 2 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G)(Seitz, Adam)
October 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City, Kansas filed by Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G)(jb)
October 4, 2005 Opinion or Order FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $250.00, receipt number 110324. (jb)
October 4, 2005 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to theglobe.com, Inc, Voiceglo Holdings, Inc., Vonage Holdings Corp. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sprint Communications Company LP v. Vonage Holdings Corp., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company LP
Represented By: Basil Trent Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vonage Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Catherine C. Theisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vonage America, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine C. Theisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Vonage Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Catherine C. Theisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Vonage America, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine C. Theisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Sprint Communications Company LP
Represented By: Basil Trent Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?