Olson v. AT&T et al
Plaintiff: |
Pamela Olson |
Defendant: |
AT&T, City of Lenexa, Kansas, Veronica Gaitney Estate, Bernard Van de Velde, Rylie Equipment and Contracting Co., Allen Harmon and Chris Carroll |
Case Number: |
2:2008cv02126 |
Filed: |
March 21, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Kansas |
Office: |
Civil Rights: Other Office |
County: |
Johnson |
Presiding Judge: |
Carlos Murguia |
Presiding Judge: |
Gerald L. Rushfelt |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 29, 2010 |
Filing
258
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 253 Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside Memorandum and Order, and 256 Plaintiff's Motion to Bring Chris Carroll Back into Suit Because of Civil Fraud. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 12/29/2010. Mailed to pro se Plaintiff by regular mail on 12/30/2010. (byk)
|
March 29, 2010 |
Filing
245
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER finding as moot 231 Plaintiff's Motion on Diversity of Defendant and 242 Motion on Diversity; and denying 243 Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Summons. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT Plaintiff's allegations in her Complaint, together with the allegations of diversity set forth in her motions on diversity (docs. 231 & 242), suffice to assert diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. § 1332 and to comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 8(a) and with the Memorandum and Order of November 30, 2009 (doc. 225). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 3/29/2010. (byk)
|
September 17, 2009 |
Filing
193
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 187 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary or Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 9/17/2009. (jw)
|
June 24, 2009 |
Filing
162
ORDER denying 136 Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Under 54(b) as to Defendant Chris Carroll; denying 139 Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Under 54(b) as to Defendant City of Lenexa, Kansas. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 6/24/2009. (jw)
|
June 23, 2009 |
Filing
158
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 146 Plaintiff's Motion for Recusal. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 6/23/2009. (jw)
|
April 13, 2009 |
Filing
125
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 96 Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Summons; denying 118 Defendant AT&T Corp.'s Motion to Enforce the Court's Order Requiring Plaintiff to Show Cause Why Her Claims Against AT&T Cop. Should Not Be Di smissed For Failure To Prosecute Or, Alternatively, Motion to Dismiss For Failure To Prosecute. Plaintiff has shown cause why her claims against defendant AT&T should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute - for her failure to accomplish service within the proscribed time under Rule 4(m). Plaintiff shall have until April 20, 2009 to amend her motion and/or submit any additional information for service on defendant AT&T. If plaintiff does not amend her motion for service by April 20, 2009, the clerk's office shall serve summons on defendant AT&T at the address listed in Plaintiff's motion. See Memorandum and Order for further details. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 4/13/2009. (jw)
|
December 23, 2008 |
Filing
90
ORDER memorializing the Court's rulings at 12/18/2008 Status Conference; denying 49 Estate Defendants' Motion for Sanctions; denying 67 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions; denying 71 Estate Defendants' Motion to Strike Plainti ff's Answer to Settlement Proposal; denying without prejudice 73 Defendants' Motion for Entry Upon Land; denying without prejudice 75 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 76 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Case; denying without prejudice 79 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Arbitrator or Mediator; and denying without prejudice 80 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order. The next telephone status conference is set for 1/27/2009 at 4:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt. The Court will initiate the conference call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 12/23/2008. (byk)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?