Faith Technologies, Inc. et al v. Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland
Plaintiff: Faith Technologies, Inc., Lithko Contracting, Inc., Summit Concrete, LLC, Arrowhead Services, Inc., Saladino Plumbing and Heating Company, Doing Steel Fabrication, LLC, Wachter Electric Company, Heartland Masonry, Inc., Tex-Plastering, Inc., Kansas City Brick Company, O'Donnell & Sons Construction Company, Inc., McCorkendale Construction, Inc., Supply Network, Inc., Tri-State Masonry, Inc., ARR Roofing, LLC, D & D Masonry, Inc., Heartland Midwest, LLC, Great Plains Roofing and Sheet Metal, Inc., Aegis Fire Protection, LLC, Summit Specialty Products, Inc., Industrial Sales Company, Inc., Shawnee Steel & Welding, Inc., Central Plumbing Heating & A.C., Inc., Larry Bair Excavating, Inc., Schindler Elevator Corporation, Hertz Equipment Rental Corporation, Olsson Associates, Inc., Landworks, Inc., B & C Mechanical Services, LLC and Bamford Fire Sprinkler Co., Inc.
Defendant: Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland
Case Number: 2:2010cv02375
Filed: July 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James P. O'Hara
Presiding Judge: Julie A. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining 219 Motion for Summary Judgment. On or before October 5, 2012, the parties shall file a status report which lists any remaining plaintiffs, their claims and the parties' plan for resolving any remaining claims. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 9/27/12. (mm)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining in part 185 Motion for Summary Judgment; overruling 191 Motion for Reconsideration ; overruling 210 Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 8/25/2011. (yh)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining 35 Defendant's Motion To Strike The Entries Of Appearance By Desarae G. Harrah, Steven M. Leigh, And Thomas James Fritzlen And Memorandum In Support; sustaining 36 Defendant's Motion To Strike Bank Of Ame rica, N.A.'s Motion For Approval And Filing Of Payment Bond And Memorandum In Support; overruling 87 Bank Of America, N.A.'s Motion For Leave To File Declaratory Judgment Claim Or, In The Alternative, To Intervene; and overruling 194 Request For Oral Argument. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 3/29/2011. (bc)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER taking under advisement 35 Motion to Strike ; taking under advisement 36 Motion to Strike ; taking under advisement 87 Motion for Leave to File. Please see order for details. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 2/3/2011. (rm)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 73 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 116 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 158 Motion for Joinder; granting 159 Motion for Joinder; finding as moot 160 Motion for Leave to File; denying 161 Motion for Hearing; granting 162 Motion for Joinder. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 1/26/2011. (rm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faith Technologies, Inc. et al v. Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faith Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: David C. DeGreeff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lithko Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: David C. DeGreeff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Concrete, LLC
Represented By: David C. DeGreeff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arrowhead Services, Inc.
Represented By: Amy J. Tillery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saladino Plumbing and Heating Company
Represented By: Amy J. Tillery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doing Steel Fabrication, LLC
Represented By: J. Nick Badgerow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wachter Electric Company
Represented By: Leslie A. Boe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heartland Masonry, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony L. Gosserand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tex-Plastering, Inc.
Represented By: Christina I. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kansas City Brick Company
Represented By: J. Nick Badgerow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O'Donnell & Sons Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: T. Bradley Manson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McCorkendale Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Supply Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tri-State Masonry, Inc.
Represented By: Gary V. Fulghum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARR Roofing, LLC
Represented By: Marty T. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D & D Masonry, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph R. Colantuono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heartland Midwest, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Plains Roofing and Sheet Metal, Inc.
Represented By: R. Mark Nasteff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aegis Fire Protection, LLC
Represented By: Charles J. Hyland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Specialty Products, Inc.
Represented By: J. Nick Badgerow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Industrial Sales Company, Inc.
Represented By: Louis A. Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawnee Steel & Welding, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Plumbing Heating & A.C., Inc.
Represented By: Denise E. Farris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Bair Excavating, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt S. Brack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schindler Elevator Corporation
Represented By: Lynn Weddle Judkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hertz Equipment Rental Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olsson Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Colby Kirkham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landworks, Inc.
Represented By: Marty T. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B & C Mechanical Services, LLC
Represented By: Samuel P. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bamford Fire Sprinkler Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland
Represented By: Kathryn Goldsmith Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?