Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London et al v. Garmin International Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company (Europe), LTD, Tokio Marine Europe Insurance Limited, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Wurttembergische Versicherung AG, Global Aerospace Underwriting Managers Limited, Swiss Re International SE UK Branch, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, National Fire & Marine Insurance Company and Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Defendant: Garmin International Inc. and Henry P. Bartle
Case Number: 2:2011cv02426
Filed: August 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Eric F. Melgren
Presiding Judge: Gerald L. Rushfelt
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 183 Motion for Relief. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 11/19/2013. (cm)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER finding as moot 26 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 67 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 71 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 7/15/2013. (aa)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 82 Defendant Henry Bartle's Motion to Compel Production of Complete Policy. As set out in the Memorandum and Order and in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(5)(B), the Court has given counsel for Defendant Bartl e an opportunity to show cause why the Court should not order him to pay the reasonable expenses incurred in responding to the motion. In addition, upon considering the 80 Response to Order to Show Cause (Doc. 75), the Court finds no cause why it should not sanction Bartle's attorney for his failure of preparation related to the final pretrial conference. The Court, however, defers deciding an appropriate sanction pending review of information it may receive, related to the issue of expenses on the motion to compel. See Memorandum and Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 10/25/2012. (bw)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 78 Motion for Protective Order. For good cause shown, Plaintiffs may not depose Defendant Bartle's expert without an appropriate stipulation under Fed. R. Civ. P. 29, Bartle's express agreement to allow the discovery out of time without objection consistent with § 13 of the Pretrial Order, or further order of the Court to extend the discovery deadline. By reaching an agreement on the proposed production of documents by Plaintiffs, the parties can themselves moot the protection herein ordered. The parties shall be responsible for their own expenses on the motion. See Memorandum and Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 9/25/2012. (bw)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion to Compel Appearance at Depositions; granting in part and denying in part 54 Defendant Garmin's Motion for Entry of Protective Order. The Court hereby limits the deposition s of Cliff Pemble, Frank McLoughlin, Phil Straub, and Tim Casey to two hours each. The motion for protective order is otherwise denied. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c)(2), the Court compels those individuals to appear for a duly noticed depositio n within thirty days of the date of this Memorandum and Order or within such other time to which the parties may agree. The motion to compel is otherwise denied. Each party shall be responsible for its or his own expenses on the two motions. See Memorandum and Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 9/6/2012. (bw)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 21 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 4/6/2012. (cm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London et al v. Garmin International Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company (Europe), LTD
Represented By: Jill A. O'Donovan
Represented By: John W. Cowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tokio Marine Europe Insurance Limited
Represented By: Jill A. O'Donovan
Represented By: John W. Cowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited
Represented By: Jill A. O'Donovan
Represented By: John W. Cowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC
Represented By: Jill A. O'Donovan
Represented By: John W. Cowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wurttembergische Versicherung AG
Represented By: John W. Cowden
Represented By: Jill A. O'Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Aerospace Underwriting Managers Limited
Represented By: Jill A. O'Donovan
Represented By: John W. Cowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swiss Re International SE UK Branch
Represented By: John W. Cowden
Represented By: Jill A. O'Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company
Represented By: John W. Cowden
Represented By: Jill A. O'Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: John W. Cowden
Represented By: Jill A. O'Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Represented By: Jill A. O'Donovan
Represented By: John W. Cowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garmin International Inc.
Represented By: Jarod G. Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry P. Bartle
Represented By: Christopher J Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?