Abbott v. Sprint Nextel Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Ralph G. Hickerson, Mary Margaret Hicks, Harold Rogers Watkins, Banche Goodman Hill, Helen R. Hill, Junie H. Hill, Robert Hock, Cecil Stockton Hodge, James Allen Hodge, Sybil Moore-Hodge, Margaret Theresa Watkins, Albert F. Watson, Frances H. Watson, Joy Poindexter Watson, William Powell Watson, Judith E. Wattenbarger, Robert L. Wattenbarger, Darlene J. Wear, Harry A. Wear, Ava V. Weatherington, Richard B. Weatherington, III, Chery H. Wert, Larry Wert, Frances S. Wesley, Linda Gayle Westbrook, Joan Brown Wheeler, Walter Thomas Wheeler, Alfred E. Wheless, Carole H. Wheless, Gina M. White, James R. White, Sheryl A. White, James M. Hodges, Jimma Lou Hodges, Dale Leroy Hofstetter, Marilyn J. Hofstetter, Barbara I. Holderread, Donavon N. Holderread, Mary V. Holland, Robert Everett Holland, Pamela Lineberry, Lillie Becky Horchler, Donald Horn, Evelyn J. Horn, William L. Horn, Carolyn McLaurin Horton, Wilton Layton Herring, Karla D. Hosek, Thomas G. Hosek, Charles E. Housel, Janice B. Housel, Callie S. Howard, Robert E. Howard, Alex Robert Hubbard, Fred Willis Hubbard, Jacqueline Ruth Hubbard, Don Ray Huber, Patricia Lou Huber, Dorothy E. Hudson, Lloyd A. Hudson, Nancy Ann Huff, Jeanne S. Huffman, Ronnie L. Huffman, Betty A. Hughes, Mabel G. Hughes, Wesley E. Hughes, Armetta Louise Blevins Hunigan, Faye Dean Spivey Hurley, Litchard Hurley, Donald Hutcheson, Marlene Hutcheson, Robert L. Hutchison, Charles White, Edith White, Ellen C. White, Henry Marshall White, Kenneth Leon White, Linda Hansley White, Mary M. White, Mary Margaret White, Rita T. White, Benny G. Whittington, Shirley F. Whittington, Agnes P. Wichael, Cyrus E. Wichael, Lovelle S. Wilkerson, Robert G. Wilkerson, Ava S. Wilkins, Gordon E. Wilkins, Jr., Betty R. Willard, Elmer L. Willard, Lonnie E. Willard, Thelma A. Willard, Doris E. Hutchison, Gloria Hyler, Merchant Hyler, Edward M. Irvine, Nellie Ruth Jordan Irvine, Charles E. Isles, Eleanor S. Jackson, John E. Jackson, Judith C. Jackson, Paul A. Jackson, Eleanor J. Jarrett, Frederick C. Jarrett, Ella Louise Jarvis, William Thomas Jarvis, Juanita F. Jenkins, Catherine Colleen Jennings, Ivan Vern Jennings, Melvin J. Jeralds, Miriam F. Jeralds, Mary Jernigan, Judith E. Jesiolowski, Neil T. Jesiolowski, Billie Joyce Johnson, Billy Gene Johnson, Jessie B. Johnson, John Franklin Johnson, Julia G. Johnson, Marylene Frank Johnson, Sharon Dee Johnson, Nettie Johnson-Childs, Dorothy Barnes Joyner, Jean Arp Joyner, Linwood Ray Joyner, Lotis W. Joyner, Ashton P. Joynes, Charlotte T. Joynes, June Cordelia Junell, Corliss A. Karr, Ronald J. Karr, Freidrich Erwin Karres, Joyce Karres, Joseph M. Kearley, Nellie Collinsworth Kearley, Gary L. Keeling, Sandra C. Keeling, Martha Honbarrier Keen, Dorothy J. McCown, Evelyn McCullen, Zack McCullen, Donna Hodges McCullough, Joan N. McCullough, William J. McCullough, Carol Sue McDaniel, Johnny Edward McDaniel, Milton E. McDaniel, Ruth H. McDaniel, John Franklin Keen, Glenn V. Keil, Helen A. Keil, Mary Elizabeth Keller, Elizabeth Ann Kelshiemer, Jeffrey Lynn Kelshiemer, George B. Kemple, Shirley A. Kemple, Arthur Bryant Kennedy, Doralee Ann Beeler Kennedy, Glenda T. Kennedy, Walter L. Kennedy, George H. Kestner, Margaret L. Kestner, Hubert J. Kimbrell, Irma E. King, Laurel L. King, Ralph E. King, Thelma V. King, William M. King, Juanita Mildred Kinsey, Bruce R. Kirkwood, Lorraine E. Kirkwood, Adeline Kirsch, Eitel J. Kirsch, Carolyn G. Kissel, Donald L. Kissel, Donald E. Klingle, Jacqueline J. Klingle, George Knapic, Bennie Gene Williams, Bessie A. Williams, Betty A. Williams, Betty Ann Williams, Frank J. Williams, Geneva Crawford Williams, Hazel Carrow Williams, James Daniel Williams, James B. Williams, Jesse A. Williams, Kay L. Williams, Marie Elizabeth Williams, Olivera Davis Williams, Wanda E. Williams, Mary Sue Williamson, Alice Lee Williford, Bivion Williford, Eddie C. Williford, Owen C. Williford, Florine E. Willis, Samuel Willis, Gerald B. McDonald, Janet H. McDonald, Priscilla McDonald, Samuel McDonald, Jr., Robert Jack McGann, Sheryl Lee McGann, Mary C. McGrady, Samuel J. McGrady, James Leroy McGraw, Joyce Ellen McGraw, Catherine McGuire, Joseph McGuire, Helen McHamb, Glen C. McKee, Sue McKee, Frederick W. McKenzie, David E. McKenzie, Kathleen A. McKenzie, Myrtle McKenzie, Beatrice W. McLamb, Daniel B. McLamb, John A. McLendon, Margaret M. McLendon, Marilyn Jane McNamee, Roger Eugene McNamee, Kenneth Ray Meade, Nancy Ellen Meade, Bruce E. Meadows, Jane E. Meadows, Josephine E. Knapic, Janice S. Knecht, Michael G. Kochevar, Lois J. Koogler, Warren L. Koogler, Sharon Ann Koubele, Michael P. Kowal, Verna L. Kowal, Amelia E. Kowalczyk, Douglas Carl Krause, Martha R. Krause, Laura M. Krebs, Charles Daniel Krepps, Valerie Ann Krepps, Marie Annette Keyton, Doris F. Meckley, Latty L. Meckley, Bryan B. Melton, Dale Henry Meredith, Lois May Meredith, Louise H. Merkle, Peter J. Merkle, Edna Wood Messick, Carlton V. Metts, Frances A. Metts, Carole A. Meyer, David L. Meyer, Joyce Ann Meyers, Denis Edwin Meyers, Edith F. Michael, Robert E. Michael, Edna Kennedy Miller, James Truett Miller, Joan White Miller, Leon Gene Miller, Mary M. Miller, Cheryl W. Mills, Halford Dean Mills, Nancy N. Mills, Thomas H. Mills, Sr., Bonnie M. Mills, Darling David Mills, Christine C. Mink, Lowell R. Mink, Joanna M. Mise, Roger B. Mitchell, Rosalee Mitchell, James Horace Mizelle, Linda Hill Mizelle, Carol Mongello, Lessie M. Montel, Merl Montel, Gilbert T. Montoya, George Moore, Jr., Idella E. Moore, John T. Moore, Rena Dell Moore, Willene Frances Moore, Horace D. Morgan, Loretta A. Morgan, Donna Louise Shellenberger, Michael Lee Shellenberger, David F. Morgan, Rita A. Morgan, Charlotte A. Morris, Jackie D. Morris, Julia H. Morris, Margaret Elizabeth Morris, Warren T. Morris, Jerry Doyle Morrison, Patricia Morrow, Sharon L. Morse, William F. Morse, Frank Muhlebach, Lorraine Murnane, Harriet L. Muro, John Myers, Linda S. Myers, Lloyd G. Myers, Sharon Myers, Wade A. Myers, Gloria D. Nafziger, Doris Minshew Nelms, Lonnie R. Nelms, Barbara Joan Nelson, Dorothy Malessia Nelson, Gary Lee Nelson, June Wooten Newberry, Larry W. Newberry, Shirley Ann Newland, Annie Joyce Newton, Blanche E. Newton, Robert L. Newton, Evelyn W. Nicholson, Anne M. Nicolosi, Anthony C. Nicolosi, Charles L. Nieft, Jr., Marie B. Nieft, Elizabeth D. Nobles, William Haywood Nobles, Johnny E. Nolen, Linda D. Nolen, Charles Norman, Sr., Marjorie Norman, John H. O'Flaherty, Grace P. O'Geary, James D. O'Geary, Sigrid V. Odle, Jacqueline Link O'Neal, Paul G. O'Neal, Audrey Nadine Oliver, Marvin Lawton Oliver, Patricia Beville Oliver, Barbara G. Olsen, Marlene Diane Olson, Robert Dwayne Olson, Arline K. Orchowski, Joan F. Outland, Barbara B. Overby, Alice B. Owens, George W. Owens, Joyce Harrel Owens, Charles Edward Page, Sr., Lois Jerivigan Page, Jean Hawn Painter, Robert Franklin Painter, Juliette Parham, William Parham, James W. Parker, Shirley A. Parker, Margaret Blackwell Parks, Stuart Wood Parks, Beverly Overby Parrish, Bobby Furman Parrish, Courtney E. Patton, Irene Willits, Billy P. Wilmoth, Janie M. Wilmoth, Donald E. Wilson, Ernest M. Wilson, Jr., Florence A. Wilson, Helen Gardner Wilson, Kathleen L. Wilson, Margaret L. Wilson, Rickey Sylvester Wilson, Mary F. Wise, Russell B. Wise, Selma Mae Withers, Daniel F. Wittman, Donna K. Wittman, Darlene E. Wojcieszek, Carol Wolchik, Marjorie Louise Wolf, Anna H. Wolford, John F. Wolford, Barbara Anne Womack, Elbert Redd Womack, Betty Wonds, Robert Wonds, Clara A. Woodcock, Walter James Woodcock, Lynette S. Woods, Ralph T. Woods, Eunice Ruth Woody, Wendell D. Woody, Billy B. Worley, Christeen H. Worley, Andrew Lynn Wortham, Phyllis Gupton Wortham, Pamela A. Wray, Wayne Wray, Barry Richard Wright, Iretta Wright, Annie Taylor Wynne, Jesse F. Yarger, Patty L. Yarger, Judith M. Yetsky, Corlan Young, Venita S. Young, William B. Young, Donald Howard Zehnder, Edna Juanita Zehnder, Jean Marie Zerwas, Phillip Henry Zerwas, Janet J. Zimmerman, Ronald L. Zimmerman, Rosemary Zimmerman, Benjamin F. Scitt, Jr., Myrtle Jeann Scott, Nina Oakley Scott, Richard C. Semmes, Carmen B. Seney, Jack Choate Setzer, Marilyn Chapman Setzer, Walter L. Sexton, Gary D. Shambo, Geraldine M. Shambo, Ann M. Shaner, Shirley Sharpe-Terrell, Marilynn K. Shaw, Jeanne O. Shearer, Wallace F. Shearer, Ann L. Shiflett, Aubrey Shiflett, Beatrice L. Sholes, Jerry G. Shuetz, Opal Marine Shuetz, Milford L. Simmons, Regenia B. Simmons, Alice Sinclair, George L. Sinclair, Gerald R. Skinner, Sr., Joann L. Skinner, Nancy G. Slegar, Lavon M. Patton, Polly Whitehurst Peaden, Willis Ray Peaden, Sidney Scott Peaks, Dennis J. Pendarvis, Jack Lee Pendroy, Lanora I. Pendroy, Delia J. Perkins, Rayfield Perkins, Bruce Perry, Charlotte L. Perry, John W. Perry, Linda Price Perry, Jerry C. Sluss, Joyce A. Sluss, Bedford R. Smith, Betty N. Smith, Cassa Smith, Cecilia Selph Smith, Edward F. Smith, Frances Junann Smith, Franklin D. Smith, Gloria G. Smith, James Allen Smith, Jerry G. Smith, Lacy T. Smith, Mary Alice Smith, Mercedes J. Smith, Nancy C. Smith, Gene R. Smithers, Mildred S. Smithers, James R. Smoker, II, Karl Eugene Snyder, Sharon Starner Snyder, Robert Michael Sofranko, Ruth Lyn Sofranko, Charles R. Souders, Mary C. Souders, Billy J. Southard, Dolores B. Southard, James Adrian Spruill, Joyce E. Sugar-Smoker, Mary Ruth Pettiette, Clarence E. Pfeiffer, Lorna L. Pfeiffer, James J. Pfieffer, Sandra K. Pfieffer, Charles Phillips, Debra Phillips, Darlene Paris Pipkin, Nathan Pipkin, Sr., Jimmy Donald Pitts, Caroline M. Platvoet, William F. Platvoet, Susan J. Plummer, William D. Plummer, Ronald L. Poage, Brenda S. Poage, Alma Mae Poindexter, Alice M. Postans, George L. Postans, Elizabeth Ann Poythress, Ben H. Price, Betty Jane Price, Donald R. Price, Donald Wayne Price, Gail P. Price, Hilda B. Price, Howard P. Price, Irene M. Price, Janice Hankins Price, Jesse E. Price, Retha A. Price, Frances M. Priddy, Nelson Wayne Priddy, Alice Prince, John Prince, Robert C. Prine, Frankie S. Propes, Edwin Richard Pryer, Mary M. Pryer, Rita M. Puckett, Arnold D. Pugh, Betty U. Pugh, Teresa B. Pugh, Charlie H. Puryear, Ruth G. Puryear, Carolyne Marie Quisenberry, Ray David Quisenberry, Thomas P. Rackers, Barbara Rackley, John Rackley, Janet A. Raiche, David R. Ramp, Josephine Ramp, Glenard Wilford Randall, Frances M. Van Puymbrouck, Margaret S. Randall, Genene Dusenbury Rawls, Kenneth E. Ray, Marilyn J. Ray, Patricia Louise Rea, Neater F. Reddick, Robert B. Reddick, Wilma M. Redding, Illys Ann Reeves, Richard Verle Reeves, Shirley A. Register, Gwyn A. Reid, Scheryl A. Reidenbach, Leonard E. Renquin, Bessie M. Reveal, Norman E. Reveal, Beverly A. Rhine, Palmer K. Rhine, Harry W. Rhodes, Josephine Rhodes, Mary A. Rhodes, Beverly Ann Rice, Lila E. Richardson, Peggy Nobles Richardson, Waldron Street Richardson, Marvin Loy Rickerson, Cecil T. Rigdon, Nelle F. Rigdon, James Riggs, Paulette Victoria Honeyc Riggs, Peggy K. Roberts, Browning Robertson, Dorothy H. Robertson, Folyd D. Robertson, Janet Robertson, Charles V. Robinson, Ethel C. Robinson, William Murray Robinson, Rulon Michael Robison, Henry John Roehr, Barbara Rogalia, Lawrence A. Rogalia, Dedra A. Rogers, Gwendolyn H. Rogers, James H. Rogers, Ronnie Rogers, Rosemary Weronica Romanus, Garland D. Rose, Jr., Judy B. Rose, John Thomas Roundtree, Naomi Mooring Roundtree, Clifton E. Ruffin, Linda D. Ruffin, Herman Wayne Rushing, Betty Stewart Russell, Henry L. Russell, Venna M. Russell and Vincent Salvato
Petitioner: Patricia S. Sexton
Case Number: 2:2011cv02572
Filed: October 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: Gerald L Rushfelt
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2017 Filing 132 STATUS REPORT by Faye P. Abbott. (O'Connell, Mary)
May 4, 2017 ***Civil Case Terminated per Doc # 131 Stipulation of Dismissal.(ydm)
May 4, 2017 Filing 131 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Stipulation Dismissing Claims of All Remaining Plaintiffs by Randall T. Parker, Sprint Communications, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1 - List of Plaintiffs)(Leopold, Christopher)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting #128 Motion to Substitute Party. Carson Browning, Gene D. Camper, Raymon Doyle, Nancy B. Garlanger, Nancy B. Garlanger, David B. Hall, Maryann Hall, Sharon Hall, Kenneth S. Knapic, Suzanne Nicole McClure, Tara Dee McClure, Nicole M. Rickmon, David B. Robertson, Christopher A. Southers, Michael B. Southers, Paul A. Southers, Eric R. Thames and Harold R. Watkins added. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 5/1/2017. (sz)
May 1, 2017 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #128 Third MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiffs for Deceased Plaintiffs. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ko)
April 28, 2017 Filing 129 NOTICE of Parties Agreement to Extend Discovery Due Date for Three Plaintiff Households Pending Their Completion of Settlement Acceptance Process by Faye P. Abbott (O'Connell, Mary)
April 28, 2017 Filing 128 Third MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiffs for Deceased Plaintiffs by Plaintiff Faye P. Abbott (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Exhibit 1)(O'Connell, Mary)
April 3, 2017 DOCKET ANNOTATION: CASE REOPENED. CLOSED IN ERROR (ydm)
April 3, 2017 ***Civil Case Terminated.(ydm)
March 31, 2017 Filing 127 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by All Defendants Joint Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims by Plaintiffs Listed on Attachment 1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: List of Dismissed Parties)(Leopold, Christopher)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting #125 Motion to Substitute Party.. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 3/13/2017. (sz)
March 10, 2017 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #125 Second MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiffs for Deceased Plaintiffs. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ko)
March 10, 2017 Filing 125 Second MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiffs for Deceased Plaintiffs by Plaintiff Faye P. Abbott (ref (Attachments: #1 List of Deceased Plaintiffs and Substitute Plaintiffs)(Nygaard, Diane)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF DECEASED PLAINTIFFS granting #121 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 3/7/2017. (sz)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #119 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 3/8/2017. Party name Martha E. Goharm has been corrected to read Martha E. Johnson. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sz)
March 7, 2017 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #119 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #82 Amended Complaint Name of One Plaintiff in Caption, #121 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiffs on Account of Death. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ko)
February 27, 2017 Filing 122 NOTICE of Deaths of Certain Plaintiffs by Faye P. Abbott (Nygaard, Diane)
February 27, 2017 Filing 121 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiffs on Account of Death by Plaintiff Faye P. Abbott (referred to Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt) (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - List of Substitute Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19)(Nygaard, Diane)
February 27, 2017 Filing 120 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Faye P. Abbott of Claims of Three Plaintiffs (Nygaard, Diane)
February 27, 2017 Filing 119 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #82 Amended Complaint, Name of One Plaintiff in Caption by Plaintiff Faye P. Abbott (Nygaard, Diane).
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #117 Motion to Modify Case Management Order. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 1/30/2017. (cm)
January 25, 2017 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #117 Joint MOTION to Modify Case Management Order. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ko)
January 25, 2017 Filing 117 Joint MOTION to Modify Case Management Order by Defendants Randall T. Parker, Sprint Communications, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation (Leopold, Christopher)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #114 Motion for Case Management Order. See attached Order for details. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 11/14/2016. (cm)
November 3, 2016 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #114 Joint MOTION for Order Entry of Case Management Order. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ko)
November 3, 2016 Filing 115 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #114 Joint MOTION for Order Entry of Case Management Order by Defendants Randall T. Parker, Sprint Communications, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation (Leopold, Christopher)
October 31, 2016 Filing 114 Joint MOTION for Order Entry of Case Management Order by Defendants Randall T. Parker, Sprint Communications, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation (Motion Referral Removed on 11/4/2016. (ydm)) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Case Management Order)(Leopold, Christopher)
October 19, 2016 Filing 113 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held September 27, 2016, before Judge Eric F. Melgren, Court Reporter Jo Wilkinson, 316-315-4334, jo_wilkinson@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Alan Sandals. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2017. (jw)
October 19, 2016 Filing 112 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held May 10, 2016, before Judge Eric F. Melgren, Court Reporter Jo Wilkinson, 316-315-4334, jo_wilkinson@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Alan Sandals. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2017. (jw)
October 19, 2016 Filing 111 CERTIFICATE OF FILING OF TRANSCRIPT by Court Reporter Jo Wilkinson (jw)
October 18, 2016 Filing 110 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL With Prejudice by Nancy N. Mills, Thomas H. Mills, Sr. (Nygaard, Diane)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #108 Fourth Joint Motion for Extensions of Time. For good cause, the Court extends the deadlines as requested. Plaintiffs shall file their supplementation(s) of their responses to written discovery on or before December 30, 2016. Defendants shall file any motion(s) to compel on or before January 30, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 09/08/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ko)
September 6, 2016 Filing 108 Joint MOTION for extension of time for plaintiffs to supplement discovery responses and for defendants to file any motion to compel by Defendants Randall T. Parker, Sprint Communications, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation (referred to Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt) (Leopold, Christopher)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #106 Third Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall supplement their discovery responses on or before September 6, 2016. Defendants shall file any motions to compel on or before October 6, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 06/14/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ko)
June 8, 2016 Filing 106 Third Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time Within Which Plaintiffs May Supplement Their Discovery Responses and Defendants May File Any Motion to Compel by Defendants Randall T. Parker, Sprint Communications, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt.) (Leopold, Christopher)
June 6, 2016 Filing 105 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Production of Documents to Defendants' First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Identified in Caption of Second Amended Complaint by Faye P. Abbott. (O'Connell, Mary)
May 6, 2016 Filing 104 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Fourth Supplemental Responses of Plaintiffs Adamson, et al. to Defs' First Set of Discovery Requests by Faye P. Abbott. (Nygaard, Diane)
May 3, 2016 Filing 103 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Production of Documents to Defendants' First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Identified In Caption of Second Amended Complaint by Faye P. Abbott. (O'Connell, Mary)
May 2, 2016 Filing 102 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Scott M. Lempert as to All Plaintiffs (O'Connell, Mary)
April 18, 2016 Filing 101 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Third Supplemental Responses of Plaintiffs Adamson, et al. by Faye P. Abbott. (O'Connell, Mary)
April 11, 2016 Filing 100 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Jessica E. Leaven as to All Plaintiffs. (Nygaard, Diane) ** This Notice of Withdrawal is not in compliance with Local Rule 83.5.5(b) and therefore this attorney will not be withdrawn. Counsel may file a Certificate of Service of this Notice upon his actual clients (not attorneys of record) in order to be withdrawn.**
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #97 Joint MOTION for extension of time to supplement discovery responses and file motion to compel. Plaintiffs shall file their additional supplementation of their responses to the written discovery on or before June 8, 2016. Defendants shall file their motion(s) to compel relating to those responses on or before July 8, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 4/7/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ko)
April 7, 2016 Filing 98 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Production of Documents to Defendants' First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Identified In Caption of Second Amended Complaint by Faye P. Abbott. (O'Connell, Mary)
April 6, 2016 Filing 97 Second Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Supplement Discovery Responses and File Motion to Compel by Defendants Randall T. Parker, Sprint Communications, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt.) (Leopold, Christopher)
March 29, 2016 Filing 96 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Production of Documents to Defendants' First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Identified In Caption of Second Amended Complaint by Faye P. Abbott. (O'Connell, Mary)
March 21, 2016 Filing 95 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Responses of Plaintiffs Bohmer, et al. to Defendants' First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs by Faye P. Abbott. (O'Connell, Mary)
March 4, 2016 Filing 94 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Production of Documents to Defendants' First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Identified in Caption of Second Amended Complaint by Faye P. Abbott. (O'Connell, Mary)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #92 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall provide supplementation of their responses to written discovery on or before April 8, 2016. Defendants shall file any motion(s) to compel relating to those supplemental responses on or before May 9, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 2/23/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ko)
February 22, 2016 Filing 92 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Within Which Plaintiffs May Supplement Their Discovery Responses and Defendant May File Any Motion to Compel by Defendants Sprint Communications, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, Randall T. Parker. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt.) (Leopold, Christopher)
February 10, 2016 Filing 91 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Identified in Caption of First Amended Complaint by Faye P. Abbott. (O'Connell, Mary)
February 9, 2016 Filing 90 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Faye P. Abbott of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Identified in Caption of First Amended Complaint. (O'Connell, Mary)
February 9, 2016 Filing 89 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Faye P. Abbott of Supplemental Responses of Plaintiffs Adamson et al. to Defendants' First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs. (O'Connell, Mary)
February 8, 2016 Filing 88 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Faye P. Abbott of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Responses to Defendant's First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Identified in Caption of First Amended Complaint.(O'Connell, Mary)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #86 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael B. Carroll for Randall T. Parker, Sprint Communications, Inc., and Sprint Nextel Corporation, pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 10/22/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mg)
October 21, 2015 Filing 86 MOTION for attorney Michael Carroll to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-3577794.) by Defendants Sprint Communications, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, Randall T. Parker. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt.) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Leopold, Christopher)
October 21, 2015 Filing 85 ANSWER to #82 Second Amended Complaint by Sprint Communications, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, Randall T. Parker.(Hecht, Scott)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #83 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants shall file any motion to compel relating to Defendants' First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Identified in Caption of First Amended Complaint on or before March 10, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 10/14/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ko)
October 8, 2015 Filing 83 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel by Defendants Sprint Communications, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, Randall T. Parker. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt.) (Leopold, Christopher)
September 30, 2015 Filing 82 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alex Robert Hubbard, Fred Willis Hubbard, Jacqueline Ruth Hubbard, Don Ray Huber, Patricia Lou Huber, Dorothy E. Hudson, Lloyd A. Hudson, Nancy Ann Huff, Jeanne S. Huffman, Ronnie L. Huffman, Betty A. Hughes, Mabel G. Hughes, Wesley E. Hughes, Armetta Louise Blevins Hunigan, Faye Dean Spivey Hurley, Litchard Hurley, Donald Hutcheson, Marlene Hutcheson, Doris E. Hutchison, Robert L. Hutchison, Gloria Hyler, Merchant Hyler, Edward M. Irvine, Nellie Ruth Jordan Irvine, Charles E. Isles, Eleanor S. Jackson, John E. Jackson, Judith C. Jackson, Paul A. Jackson, Eleanor J. Jarrett, Frederick C. Jarrett, Ella Louise Jarvis, William Thomas Jarvis, Juanita F. Jenkins, Catherine Colleen Jennings, Ivan Vern Jennings, Melvin J. Jeralds, Miriam F. Jeralds, Mary Jernigan, Judith E. Jesiolowski, Neil T. Jesiolowski, Billie Joyce Johnson, Billy Gene Johnson, Jessie B. Johnson, John Franklin Johnson, Julia G. Johnson, Marylene Frank Johnson, Sharon Dee Johnson, Nettie Johnson-Childs, Angeline G. Hall, John O. Hall, Shirley A. Hall, Gerald Fisher Hamer, Mildred Elizabeth Hamer, Frances M. Hamilton, Jimmy C. Hamilton, Henry Q. Hammock, Lynda L. Hammock, Cynthia Hanks, Diane Alma Hanna-Rudnicki, Earnest A. Hanson, Shirley A. Hanson, Delane Harlson, William E. Harlson, Janola D. Harmony, John A. Harmony, Johnnie Harper, Sennie Harper, Brenda G. Harris, Carol A. Harris, David E. Harris, Donnie P. Harris, Elizabeth R. Harris, Ernest S. Harris, Ernestine H. Harris, Margierite Harris, Robert Harris, Rosa P. Harris, Emily R. Harrison, Millard C. Harrison, Norma Harrison, Darlene R. Hart, Robert L. Hart, Dwain Hartoence, Patricia Hartoence, Lee Hashbarger, Margit Hashbarger, Glenn Haskin, Isabelle Haskin, Helen Grey Hawks, Jean B. Hays, Margaret J. Hazelwood, June A. Hefferan, Billy Joe Hefner, Betty Hefner-Johnson, Donald B. Henry, Jean L. Henry, Sarah D. Henry, Ann S. Herbert, Ann M. Shaner, Shirley Sharpe-Terrell, Marilynn K. Shaw, Jeanne O. Shearer, Wallace F. Shearer, Donna Louise Shellenberger, Michael Lee Shellenberger, Ann L. Shiflett, Aubrey Shiflett, Beatrice L. Sholes, Jerry G. Shuetz, Opal Marine Shuetz, Milford L. Simmons, Regenia B. Simmons, Alice Sinclair, George L. Sinclair, Gerald R. Skinner, Sr, Joann L. Skinner, Nancy G. Slegar, Jerry C. Sluss, Joyce A. Sluss, Bedford R. Smith, Betty N. Smith, Cassa Smith, Cecilia Selph Smith, Edward F. Smith, Frances Junann Smith, Franklin D. Smith, Gloria G. Smith, James Allen Smith, Jerry G. Smith, Lacy T. Smith, Mary Alice Smith, Mercedes J. Smith, Nancy C. Smith, Gene R. Smithers, Mildred S. Smithers, James R. Smoker, II, Karl Eugene Snyder, Sharon Starner Snyder, Robert Michael Sofranko, Ruth Lyn Sofranko, Charles R. Souders, Mary C. Souders, Billy J. Southard, Dolores B. Southard, Barbara Colson Spruill, James Adrian Spruill, Beverly J. Baker, Faye D. Baker, Irwin Baker, Joseph K. Baker, Majoeir Ann Baker, Nora E. Baker, Edgille Douglas Baldridge, Janet M. Baldridge, Pavline H. Barbano, Ralph J. Barbano, Barbara T. Barber, Wallace R. Barber, Dolly Ann Barkley, Verona W. Bass, Gerald C. Batts, Jane T. Batts, Bettie C. Beard, Clarence W. Becraft, Shirlene K. Becraft, Louise Mattocks Andrew Beheler, Robert Neil Beheler, Ethel Mae Beining, John Thomas Bell, Margaret Sarah Bell, Ronald L. Bender, Carroll Ray Bergman, Dolena A. Bergman, Donald E. Bernardi, Joan A. Bernardi, Helen A. Bertolo, Gary Besbitt, Jacqueline Besbitt, Patricia M. Bethel, Roger Bice, Constance J. Biscoe, Pat Biscoe, Allean Elizabeth Blair, Patricia C. Blake, Ronald R. Blake, Roy L. Blake, Shirley J. Blake, James F. Blankenship, Judith M. Blankenship, Theodore B. Blount, Wyona H. Blount, Janet K. Bohmer, Eileen M. Boles, Archie Bolt, Charlie H. Puryear, Ruth G. Puryear, Carolyne Marie Quisenberry, Ray David Quisenberry, Thomas P. Rackers, Barbara Rackley, John Rackley, Janet A. Raiche, David R. Ramp, Josephine Ramp, Glenard Wilford Randall, Margaret S. Randall, Genene Dusenbury Rawls, Kenneth E. Ray, Marilyn J. Ray, Patricia Louise Rea, Neater F. Reddick, Robert B. Reddick, Wilma M. Redding, Illys Ann Reeves, Richard Verle Reeves, Shirley A. Register, Gwyn A. Reid, Scheryl A. Reidenbach, Leonard E. Renquin, Bessie M. Reveal, Norman E. Reveal, Beverly A. Rhine, Palmer K. Rhine, Harry W. Rhodes, Josephine Rhodes, Mary A. Rhodes, Beverly Ann Rice, Lila E. Richardson, Peggy Nobles Richardson, Waldron Street Richardson, Marvin Loy Rickerson, Cecil T. Rigdon, Nelle F. Rigdon, James Riggs, Paulette Victoria Honeyc Riggs, Peggy K. Roberts, Browning Robertson, Dorothy H. Robertson, Folyd D. Robertson, Janet Robertson, Charles V. Robinson, Ethel C. Robinson, William Murray Robinson, Rulon Michael Robison, Christine C. Mink, Lowell R. Mink, Joanna M. Mise, Roger B. Mitchell, Rosalee Mitchell, James Horace Mizelle, Linda Hill Mizelle, Carol Mongello, Lessie M. Montel, Merl Montel, Gilbert T. Montoya, George Moore, Jr, Idella E. Moore, John T. Moore, Rena Dell Moore, Willene Frances Moore, Sybil Moore-Hodge, David F. Morgan, Horace D. Morgan, Loretta A. Morgan, Rita A. Morgan, Charlotte A. Morris, Jackie D. Morris, Julia H. Morris, Margaret Elizabeth Morris, Warren T. Morris, Jerry Doyle Morrison, Patricia Morrow, Sharon L. Morse, William F. Morse, Frank Muhlebach, Lorraine Murnane, Harriet L. Muro, John Myers, Linda S. Myers, Lloyd G. Myers, Sharon Myers, Wade A. Myers, Gloria D. Nafziger, Norma C Nahoom, Doris Minshew Nelms, Lonnie R. Nelms, Barbara Joan Nelson, Dorothy Malessia Nelson, Gary Lee Nelson, June Wooten Newberry, Larry W. Newberry, Shirley Ann Newland, Blanche E. Newton, Donna L. Carrington, Joyce Hilliard Carroll, Linda K. Carroll, Mary L. Carroll, William J. Carroll, Jr, Willie Fleming Carroll, Sr, Carta Ceil Ann Carter, Gary W. Carter, Joseph Carter, Sr, Nora Bowers Carter, Tyre Dallas Carter, Eunice White Castelow, Fred J. Catanzarite, Janice J. Catanzarite, James Caudhill, Margaret Caudill, Carl Kenneth Caviness, Johnnie Mae Caviness, Barbara Florence Chadwick, John Wesley Chadwick, Judith A. Clymer Chase, Clarence W. Chastain, Donna M. Chastain, Barbara R. Christensen, Harold C. Christensen, Carolyn Christy, Gerald F. Christy, Charles Clyde Clark, Sr, Margaret Clark, Katie Mae Clarke, Louise S. Clarke, Melton C. Clarke, S. George Clarke, Grace A. Clasen, John G. Clasen, Barbara S. Clay, James R. Clay, Harold Eugene Clayton, Robert Lynn Clegg, Rose Duncan Clegg, Cullen Cobb, Rochelle Whaley Cobb, Joyce R. Cockrell, Annie Coggins, Naomi M. Coker, Rebecca S. Coker, Louise Barbara Colbert, Lorenzo Dow Cole, Sr, Claude T. Coleman, Dorothy Spence Coleman, Leni J. Collet, Michael Collet, Clercy Alton Collins, Ellie A. Collins, Elvie P. Collins, Hilton D. Collins, Jack Arnold Collins, Raymond A. Collins, Victoria Cockrell Collins, Sarah E. Collinsworth, Tom Collinsworth, Jr, Grace M. Colson, John P. Colson, Marvin L. Colvin, Sarah W. Colvin, Lester L. Conerly, Bonnie Lee Conkey, Sadie S. Connerly, Maria P. Consuegra, Nancy Cook, Verna J. Cook, Willie herman Cook, Ann Gardner Cooper, Billy F. Cooper, Jimmy Louis Cooper, Laura J. Cooper, Geraldine G. Coppinger, Robert Lee Coppinger, Lowey J. Corvin, Dolly E. Cox, Julia Mae Cox, Karen S. Cox, Lensay R. Cox, Marilyn J. Craft, Robert W. Craft, Jr, Elvie D. Craig, Ralph H. Craig, Lee Ann Crider, Arvey Owen Crocker, Jr, Deborah E. Crocker, Robert T. Crocker, Anna Marie Crockett, Raymond Micheal Crockett, Carl W. Cross, Sr, Dorothy O. Cross, Dorothy M. Crowe, Forrest T. Crowe, Chloe P. Crumpler, Elizabeth Anne Crumpler, Elizabeth Rose Spyker, Richard Norris Spyker, Curtis V. Stallings, Kenneth R. Stancill, James Ervin Stanley, Louis Summerlin Stanley, Jack Roger Stapleton, Esther Marie Stednick, Paul Stednick, Barbara J. Stegall, Jerry B. Stegall, James Steiner, Peggy Ann Stewart, Patricia Ann Stickel, Phillip Lynn Stickel, Linda M. Stiers, Mervin G. Stiers, Mary E Stokley, Stanely M. Stone, Sr, Hazel J. Stox, Thurman Stox, Beverly E. Strait, David F. Strait, Kathleen Mary Strake, Paul Albert Strake, Vicki J. Strickler-Long, Velma June Stubbs, Betty J. Stultz, Jerry E. Stultz, Joyce E. Sugar-Smoker, Dianne Marie Summerlin, Michael J. Sumner, Betty L. Sutherland, Eugene Sutherland, Peggy J. Sutton, Seth W. Sutton, Robert G. Swarts, Adele Swead, Rob Swead, Cecil E. Swinson, Rebecca R. Swinson, Linda L. Sykes, Tommy D. Sykes, Christine A. Taylor, Elvin J. Taylor, Hazel Carrol Taylor, James A. Taylor, Thelma Collins Taylor, Eunice S. Joiner, Bobby D. Jolly, Kathenia H. Jolly, Aubrey D. Jones, Carolyn Sue Jones, Gregory Warren Jones, Linda Warren Jones, Mary Sutton Jones, Shirley L. Jones, William E. Jones, Norma C. Josy, Dolly J. Joyner, Dorothy Barnes Joyner, Jean Arp Joyner, Linwood Ray Joyner, Lotis W. Joyner, Otha Jackson Joyner, Jr, Ashton P. Joynes, Charlotte T. Joynes, June Cordelia Junell, Corliss A. Karr, Ronald J. Karr, Freidrich Erwin Karres, Joyce Karres, Joseph M. Kearley, Nellie Collinsworth Kearley, Gary L. Keeling, Sandra C. Keeling, John Franklin Keen, Martha Honbarrier Keen, Glenn V. Keil, Helen A. Keil, Mary Elizabeth Keller, Elizabeth Ann Kelshiemer, Jeffrey Lynn Kelshiemer, George B. Kemple, Shirley A. Kemple, Arthur Bryant Kennedy, Doralee Ann Beeler Kennedy, Glenda T. Kennedy, Walter L. Kennedy, George H. Kestner, Margaret L. Kestner, Marie Annette Keyton, Hubert J. Kimbrell, Irma E. King, Laurel L. King, Ralph E. King, Thelma V. King, William M. King, Faye P. Abbott, John W. Abbott, Judith Rivenbark Adams, Barbara Adamson, Mark Adamson, John T. Adelman, Sr, Rita A. Adelman, Barbara J. Agee, Earl D. Agee, Alyce A. Alcrigg, Alyce A. Alexander, John C. Alexander, Ann Alford, James L. Alford, Dorthy J. Allen, Maxwell V. Allen, Philip Wayne Allen, Shelby Harrell Allen, Francis William Allpress, III, Verona Dean Allpress, Jeanne M. Alsene, Leonard H. Alsene, Sara H. Altman, Bonnie Jean Amburn, Clyde Thomas Amburn, Carolyn M. Amsler, Donald E. Amsler, Alvah Thomas Anderson, Hilda Hankins Anderson, Donna Lee Aline Andrews, Frances P. Angell, Betty B. Armstrong, Phillip A. Armstrong, Clyde Eugene Arnold, Ruby D. Arnold, Esley Davis Atkins, Mary Morgan Atkins, Michael Lynn Atkinson, Wanda Martin Atkinson, Carolyn Aurand, Kyle Aurand, Lola B. Aust
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #72 Motion to Dismiss Five Plaintiff Households. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 9/29/2015. (cm)
September 25, 2015 Filing 80 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Sprint Communications, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, Randall T. Parker re: #72 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice Claims of Five Plaintiff Households - Ann Price Chipps, Earl Edwards, Betty Ann Edwards, Allen Bosze, Sandra Gilliland, Woodrow Gilliland, Gloria Brown, and Loy Brown (Leopold, Christopher)
September 25, 2015 Filing 79 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Faye P. Abbott, Mary B. Boykin of Supplemental Responses of Plaintiff Mary Baker Boykin to Defendants' First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Identified in Caption of First Amended Complaint (O'Connell, Mary)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #75 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants shall file any motion to compel relating to Defendants' First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs on or before October 30, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 09/21/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ko)
September 17, 2015 Filing 77 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Faye P. Abbott re: #72 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice Claims of Five Plaintiff Households - Ann Price Chipps, Earl Edwards, Betty Ann Edwards, Allen Bosze, Sandra Gilliland, Woodrow Gilliland, Gloria Brown, and Loy Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nygaard, Diane)
September 16, 2015 Filing 76 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Identified In Caption of First Amended Complaint by Faye P. Abbott. (O'Connell, Mary)
September 16, 2015 Filing 75 Unopposed MOTION for 30 -Day Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel by Defendants Sprint Communications, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, Randall T. Parker. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt.) (Leopold, Christopher)
September 1, 2015 Filing 74 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Faye P. Abbott, Without Prejudice of Claims of Vaughn Devere Campbell, Jr. and Elva Sue Campbell. (Nygaard, Diane)
September 1, 2015 Filing 73 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Group Eleven of Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Identified in Caption of First Amended Complaint by Faye P. Abbott. (Nygaard, Diane)
September 1, 2015 Filing 72 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice Claims of Five Plaintiff Households - Ann Price Chipps, Earl Edwards, Betty Ann Edwards, Allen Bosze, Sandra Gilliland, Woodrow Gilliland, Gloria Brown, and Loy Brown by Defendants Sprint Communications, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, Randall T. Parker. (Leopold, Christopher)
September 1, 2015 Filing 71 TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing held August 25, 2015, before Judge Eric F. Melgren, Court Reporter Jo Wilkinson, 316-315-4334, jo_wilkinson@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Christopher Leopold. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2015. (jw)
September 1, 2015 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF FILING OF TRANSCRIPT by Court Reporter Jo Wilkinson. (jw)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying without prejudice to refiling #29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying without prejudice to refiling #31 Motion to Sever. During the telephone status conference, the Court set out new deadlines and requirements for future filings. This Order memorializes that discussion. See Order for filing deadlines and/or page limitations. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 8/28/15. (lak)
August 25, 2015 Filing 69 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Eric F. Melgren: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 8/25/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lak)
July 8, 2015 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Response and Production of Documents of Plaintiffs Donnie Paul and Gwen D. Harris to Defendants First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Identified In Caption of First Amended Complaint by Faye P. Abbott. (O'Connell, Mary)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER finding as moot #59 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 06/30/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jg)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #64 Motion to Amend In Part Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 06/30/2015. (jg)
June 30, 2015 Filing 64 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order In Part by Plaintiff Faye P. Abbott. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt.) (O'Connell, Mary)
June 29, 2015 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Group Ten of Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Identified In Caption of First Amended Complaint by Faye P. Abbott. (O'Connell, Mary)
June 29, 2015 Filing 62 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Ivan Russell Blevins, Patricia J. Blevins, Annie Joyce Newton, Robert L. Newton, Clarles Edward Stinson, Deborah Shealy Stinson. (O'Connell, Mary)
June 15, 2015 Filing 61 STATUS REPORT by Faye P. Abbott. (Nygaard, Diane)
June 3, 2015 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Responses and Production of Documents of Plaintiff Jerry Morrison to Defendants First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Identified In Caption of First Amended Complaint by Faye P. Abbott. (O'Connell, Mary)
May 29, 2015 Filing 59 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order In Part Discovery Deadlines Set in April 29, 2015 Order by Plaintiff Faye P. Abbott. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt.) (Nygaard, Diane)
May 27, 2015 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Group Nine of Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Identified In Caption of First Amended Complaint by Faye P. Abbott. (O'Connell, Mary)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #56 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Amend in Part Discovery Deadlines Set in April 9, 2015 Order. See Order for additional information and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on April 29, 2015. (gc)
April 29, 2015 Filing 56 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order In Part by Plaintiff Faye P. Abbott (referred to Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt) (O'Connell, Mary)
April 29, 2015 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Group Eight of Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Identified in Caption of First Amended Complaint by Faye P. Abbott. (O'Connell, Mary)
April 13, 2015 Filing 54 Joint STATUS REPORT by Faye P. Abbott. (O'Connell, Mary)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #49 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend in Part Discovery Deadlines Set in December 16, 2014 Order. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on April 9, 2015. (gc)
April 1, 2015 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Group Seven of Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Identified In Caption of First Amended Complaint by Faye P. Abbott. (O'Connell, Mary)
March 31, 2015 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Responses of Plaintiffs to Defendants First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Identified In Caption of First Amended Complaint by Faye P. Abbott. (O'Connell, Mary)
March 31, 2015 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Group Six of Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Identified In Caption of First Amended Complaint by Faye P. Abbott. (O'Connell, Mary)
March 31, 2015 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order in Part by Plaintiff Faye P. Abbott. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt.) (O'Connell, Mary)
March 18, 2015 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Group Five of Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Identified in Caption of First Amended Complaint by Johnny Durham Bordeaux, Linda K. Carroll, Rebecca S. Coker, Victoria Cockrell Collins, Geraldine G. Coppinger, Edna Grice Dean, Faye Dean Spivey Hurley, Litchard Hurley, Marilyn Jane McNamee, Roger Eugene McNamee, Johnny E. Nolen, Linda D. Nolen, Thomas P. Rackers, Barbara Rackley, Betty J. Stultz, Jerry E. Stultz, Hollio Teel, Bennie Gene Williams, Betty Ann Williams. (O'Connell, Mary)
March 4, 2015 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Group Four of Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Identified In Caption of First Amended Complaint by Faye P. Abbott. (O'Connell, Mary)
February 19, 2015 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Group Three of Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Identified In Caption of First Amended Complaint by Faye P. Abbott. (O'Connell, Mary)
February 4, 2015 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Group Two of Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Identified in Caption of First Amended Complaint by Faye P. Abbott. (O'Connell, Mary)
January 29, 2015 Filing 44 Joint SUBMITTAL Pursuant to March 5, 2014 Order by Faye P. Abbott. (O'Connell, Mary)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Leave to File Parties' Joint Submittal. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 1/29/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
January 26, 2015 Filing 42 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Parties' Joint Submittal Pursuant to March 5, 2014 Order by Plaintiff Faye P. Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Joint Submittal Pursuant to March 5, 2014 Order)(O'Connell, Mary) (Motion Referral Removed on 1/28/2015. (mg))
January 21, 2015 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Group One of Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Identified in Caption of First Amended Complaint by Faye P. Abbott. (O'Connell, Mary)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery Response Deadline. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on December 16, 2014. (gc)
December 15, 2014 Filing 39 Joint MOTION for Extension of Discovery Response Deadline by Defendants Randall T. Parker, Sprint Communications, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt.) (Leopold, Christopher)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PROTECTIVE ORDER entered to protect the confidentiality of specified categories of documents and information produced or disclosed in this litigation. For good cause shown, the Court grants #37 Motion for Protective Order. See Protective Order for more details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 11/21/2014. (gc)
November 6, 2014 Filing 37 Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order by Defendants Randall T. Parker, Sprint Communications, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Protective Order)(Leopold, Christopher)
July 11, 2014 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Randall T. Parker, Sprint Communications, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation re: #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR FAILURE TO ALLEGE FRAUD WITH PARTICULARITY. (Leopold, Christopher)
July 3, 2014 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Randall T. Parker, Sprint Communications, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation re: #31 Conditional MOTION to Sever Under Rule 21. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1)(Hecht, Scott)
June 27, 2014 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Faye P. Abbott re: #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR FAILURE TO ALLEGE FRAUD WITH PARTICULARITY. (O'Connell, Mary)
June 19, 2014 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Faye P. Abbott re: #31 Conditional MOTION to Sever Under Rule 21. (O'Connell, Mary)
June 6, 2014 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #31 Conditional MOTION to Sever Under Rule 21 by Defendants Randall T. Parker, Sprint Communications, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Declaration of Christopher Koenigs, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7)(Leopold, Christopher)
June 6, 2014 Filing 31 Conditional MOTION to Sever Under Rule 21 by Defendants Randall T. Parker, Sprint Communications, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation.(Leopold, Christopher)
June 6, 2014 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR FAILURE TO ALLEGE FRAUD WITH PARTICULARITY by Defendants Randall T. Parker, Sprint Communications, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Leopold, Christopher)
June 6, 2014 Filing 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR FAILURE TO ALLEGE FRAUD WITH PARTICULARITY by Defendants Randall T. Parker, Sprint Communications, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Leopold, Christopher)
May 15, 2014 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(O'Connell, Mary) (Plaintiff party names condensed on 5/15/2014. (mg))
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stewart W. Fisher for plaintiffs pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 04/18/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mg)
April 2, 2014 Filing 26 Amended MOTION for attorney Stewart W. Fisher to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-3028402.) by Plaintiff Faye P. Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Nygaard, Diane) Modif
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying without prejudice #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion lacks an affirmative statement that the movant has verified that the information contained in the affidavit is true and accurate. The form prescribed by D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 and set forth in the Appendix to the Rules contains the affirmative statement lacking in the motion now before the Court. The Court will therefore deny the motion without prejudice to the filing of a similar motion that includes the referenced affirmative statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 4/1/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (gc)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #18 and #19 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alan M. Sandals Richard T. Seymour as to all plaintiffs pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 03/27/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mg)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #16 and #17 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph J. Costello and James P. Walsh, Jr. defendants Randall T. Parker, and Sprint Nextel Corporation, pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 03/24/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mg)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher J. Koenigs for Randall T. Parker and Sprint Nextel Corporation, pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 03/21/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mg)
March 21, 2014 Filing 21 MOTION for attorney Stewart W. Fisher to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-3017152.) by Plaintiff Faye P. Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Nygaard, Diane)
March 21, 2014 Filing 20 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name and Email Address of Plaintiffs' Counsel by Faye P. Abbott. (Nygaard, Diane)
March 12, 2014 Filing 19 MOTION for attorney Richard T. Seymour to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-3009184.) by Plaintiff Faye P. Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(O'Connell, Mary)
March 12, 2014 Filing 18 MOTION for attorney Alan M. Sandals to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-3009178.) by Plaintiff Faye P. Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(O'Connell, Mary)
March 7, 2014 Filing 17 MOTION for attorney James Walsh, Jr. to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-3004727.) by Defendants Randall T. Parker, Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Leopold, Christopher)
March 7, 2014 Filing 16 MOTION for attorney Joseph Costello to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-3004306.) by Defendants Randall T. Parker, Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Leopold, Christopher)
March 6, 2014 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Christopher Koenigs to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-3002546.) by Defendants Randall T. Parker, Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Leopold, Christopher)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER finding as moot #11 Motion to Lift Stay; granting #12 Motion to Lift Stay in Part and Retain Stay in Part. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 3/5/2014. (cm)
February 28, 2014 Filing 13 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Scott C. Hecht on behalf of All Defendants. (Hecht, Scott)
February 28, 2014 Filing 12 Amended MOTION to Lift Stay in Part and Retain in Part the Stay Previously Entered in this Case by Plaintiff Faye P. Abbott. (Nygaard, Diane)
February 27, 2014 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Lift Stay in Part and Retain in Part the Stay Previously Entered in this Case by Plaintiff Faye P. Abbott. (Nygaard, Diane)
January 2, 2014 Filing 10 NOTICE of Firm Name Change by Certain Counsel for Defendants by Randall T. Parker, Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Leopold, Christopher)
October 1, 2013 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Leopold, Christopher)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Joint Motion to Stay Case. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 3/28/2012. (alm)
March 22, 2012 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending Outcome of Related Case by Defendants Randall T. Parker, Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Leopold, Christopher)
March 12, 2012 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Faye P. Abbott. Randall T. Parker waiver sent on 2/6/2012, answer due 4/6/2012. (Lucas, Christopher)
February 10, 2012 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Faye P. Abbott. Sprint Nextel Corporation waiver sent on 2/6/2012, answer due 4/6/2012. (Lucas, Christopher)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren for all further proceedings. District Judge J. Thomas Marten no longer assigned to case. Entered by deputy clerk on 11/3/2011. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(mss)
October 17, 2011 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $350.00, receipt number K4631030231. (ta)
October 14, 2011 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Faye P. Abbott - trial to be held in Kansas City. (ta)
October 14, 2011 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re: #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Faye P. Abbott. (ta)
October 14, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Faye P. Abbott.(ta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbott v. Sprint Nextel Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph G. Hickerson
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Margaret Hicks
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Rogers Watkins
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Banche Goodman Hill
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen R. Hill
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junie H. Hill
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hock
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil Stockton Hodge
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Allen Hodge
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sybil Moore-Hodge
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Theresa Watkins
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert F. Watson
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances H. Watson
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Poindexter Watson
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Powell Watson
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith E. Wattenbarger
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Wattenbarger
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene J. Wear
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry A. Wear
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ava V. Weatherington
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard B. Weatherington, III
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chery H. Wert
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Wert
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances S. Wesley
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Gayle Westbrook
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Brown Wheeler
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Thomas Wheeler
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred E. Wheless
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole H. Wheless
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina M. White
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. White
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl A. White
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Hodges
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimma Lou Hodges
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Leroy Hofstetter
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn J. Hofstetter
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara I. Holderread
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donavon N. Holderread
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary V. Holland
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Everett Holland
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Lineberry
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillie Becky Horchler
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Horn
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn J. Horn
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William L. Horn
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn McLaurin Horton
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilton Layton Herring
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla D. Hosek
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas G. Hosek
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E. Housel
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice B. Housel
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Callie S. Howard
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Howard
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Robert Hubbard
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Willis Hubbard
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Ruth Hubbard
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Ray Huber
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Lou Huber
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy E. Hudson
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd A. Hudson
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Ann Huff
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne S. Huffman
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie L. Huffman
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty A. Hughes
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mabel G. Hughes
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley E. Hughes
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armetta Louise Blevins Hunigan
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faye Dean Spivey Hurley
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Litchard Hurley
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Hutcheson
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Hutcheson
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Hutchison
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles White
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edith White
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen C. White
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Marshall White
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Leon White
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Hansley White
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary M. White
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Margaret White
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita T. White
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benny G. Whittington
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley F. Whittington
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agnes P. Wichael
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyrus E. Wichael
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lovelle S. Wilkerson
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert G. Wilkerson
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ava S. Wilkins
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon E. Wilkins, Jr.
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty R. Willard
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmer L. Willard
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie E. Willard
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma A. Willard
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris E. Hutchison
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Hyler
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merchant Hyler
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward M. Irvine
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nellie Ruth Jordan Irvine
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E. Isles
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor S. Jackson
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. Jackson
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith C. Jackson
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul A. Jackson
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor J. Jarrett
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick C. Jarrett
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ella Louise Jarvis
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Thomas Jarvis
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita F. Jenkins
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Colleen Jennings
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Vern Jennings
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin J. Jeralds
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam F. Jeralds
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jernigan
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith E. Jesiolowski
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil T. Jesiolowski
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billie Joyce Johnson
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Gene Johnson
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie B. Johnson
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Franklin Johnson
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia G. Johnson
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marylene Frank Johnson
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Dee Johnson
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nettie Johnson-Childs
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Barnes Joyner
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Arp Joyner
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linwood Ray Joyner
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lotis W. Joyner
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashton P. Joynes
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte T. Joynes
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Cordelia Junell
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corliss A. Karr
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Karr
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freidrich Erwin Karres
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Karres
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph M. Kearley
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nellie Collinsworth Kearley
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary L. Keeling
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra C. Keeling
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Honbarrier Keen
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy J. McCown
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn McCullen
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zack McCullen
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Hodges McCullough
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan N. McCullough
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. McCullough
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Sue McDaniel
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Edward McDaniel
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton E. McDaniel
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth H. McDaniel
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Franklin Keen
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn V. Keil
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen A. Keil
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ann Kelshiemer
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Lynn Kelshiemer
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George B. Kemple
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley A. Kemple
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Bryant Kennedy
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doralee Ann Beeler Kennedy
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda T. Kennedy
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter L. Kennedy
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George H. Kestner
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret L. Kestner
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hubert J. Kimbrell
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma E. King
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurel L. King
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph E. King
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma V. King
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William M. King
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Mildred Kinsey
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce R. Kirkwood
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine E. Kirkwood
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adeline Kirsch
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eitel J. Kirsch
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn G. Kissel
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald L. Kissel
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald E. Klingle
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline J. Klingle
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Knapic
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennie Gene Williams
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessie A. Williams
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty A. Williams
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Ann Williams
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank J. Williams
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geneva Crawford Williams
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hazel Carrow Williams
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Daniel Williams
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James B. Williams
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse A. Williams
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kay L. Williams
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Elizabeth Williams
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivera Davis Williams
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda E. Williams
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Sue Williamson
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Lee Williford
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bivion Williford
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie C. Williford
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owen C. Williford
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florine E. Willis
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Willis
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald B. McDonald
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet H. McDonald
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscilla McDonald
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel McDonald, Jr.
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jack McGann
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Lee McGann
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary C. McGrady
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel J. McGrady
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Leroy McGraw
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Ellen McGraw
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine McGuire
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph McGuire
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen McHamb
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen C. McKee
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue McKee
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick W. McKenzie
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E. McKenzie
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen A. McKenzie
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrtle McKenzie
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatrice W. McLamb
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel B. McLamb
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A. McLendon
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret M. McLendon
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Jane McNamee
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Eugene McNamee
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ray Meade
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Ellen Meade
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce E. Meadows
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane E. Meadows
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine E. Knapic
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice S. Knecht
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael G. Kochevar
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois J. Koogler
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren L. Koogler
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Ann Koubele
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael P. Kowal
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verna L. Kowal
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelia E. Kowalczyk
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Carl Krause
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha R. Krause
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt