Bancinsure, Inc. v. McCaffree et al
Plaintiff: Bancinsure, Inc.
Defendant: Carl L. McCaffree, Jimmy D. Helvey, Sam McCaffree, Randolph G. Austin, Richard L. Roach, G. Reid Teaney and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver of The Columbian Bank and Trust Company
Counter_claimant: Randolph G. Austin, Richard L. Roach, Sam McCaffree, Jimmy D. Helvey and Carl L. McCaffree
Counter_defendant: Bancinsure, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv02110
Filed: February 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gerald L. Rushfelt
Presiding Judge: Kathryn H. Vratil
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 270 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 258 Motion for Further Relief Based on Declaratory Judgment Pursuant to 28:2202. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 8/29/2017. (hl)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 223 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 4/24/14. (mm)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining 127 Motion for Summary Judgment; overruling 147 Motion for Summary Judgment; overruling 151 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 2/27/14. (hw)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 136 Motion to Compel; granting 189 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 10/24/2013. (gc)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 128 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 7/3/2013. (mh)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 16 Motion to Dismiss the FDIC-R and Remand. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 1/24/2013. (mh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bancinsure, Inc. v. McCaffree et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bancinsure, Inc.
Represented By: Jay F. Fowler
Represented By: James D. Oliver
Represented By: David E. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl L. McCaffree
Represented By: Stacey M. Bowman
Represented By: Michael Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy D. Helvey
Represented By: Stacey M. Bowman
Represented By: Michael Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam McCaffree
Represented By: Stacey M. Bowman
Represented By: Michael Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph G. Austin
Represented By: John T. Bullock
Represented By: Wesley F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Roach
Represented By: Kathleen Ridgway Urbom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Reid Teaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver of The Columbian Bank and Trust Company
Represented By: Charles A. Getto
Represented By: Douglas M. Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Randolph G. Austin
Represented By: John T. Bullock
Represented By: Wesley F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Richard L. Roach
Represented By: Kathleen Ridgway Urbom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Sam McCaffree
Represented By: Stacey M. Bowman
Represented By: Michael Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Jimmy D. Helvey
Represented By: Stacey M. Bowman
Represented By: Michael Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Carl L. McCaffree
Represented By: Stacey M. Bowman
Represented By: Michael Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Bancinsure, Inc.
Represented By: Jay F. Fowler
Represented By: James D. Oliver
Represented By: David E. Rogers
Represented By: Jay F. Fowler
Represented By: James D. Oliver
Represented By: David E. Rogers
Represented By: Jay F. Fowler
Represented By: James D. Oliver
Represented By: David E. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?