Sprint Nextel Corporation v. Middle Man, Inc., The et al
Plaintiff: Sprint Nextel Corporation
Defendant: Middle Man, Inc., The and Brian K. Vazquez
Case Number: 2:2012cv02159
Filed: March 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
Presiding Judge: K. Gary Sebelius
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 268 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 247 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 266 Motion for Leave to File Billing Records. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 09/11/2017. (aa)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 256 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 249 Motion for New Trial. Please see order for details. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 05/26/2017. (aa)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 229 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 03/08/2017. (aa)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 225 Motion to Exclude. Please see order for details. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 03/06/2017. (aa)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 222 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 3/3/2017. (sz)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 198 The Middle Man's Renewed Motion for Class Certification; denying 199 Sprint's Motion to StrikeJury Demand. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 1/12/2017. (mam)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 170 Middle Man's Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 4/14/15. (mss)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting summary judgment in favor of Sprint against defendant The Middle Man, Inc. for breach of contract with nominal damages of $1.00. All other claims against The Middle Man, Inc. and Brian K. Vasquez are dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 1/26/15. (mss)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 153 plaintiff's Motion for Judgment. Defendants are granted to and including January 19, 2015 to respond to this order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 1/13/15. (mss)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 140 Sprint's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 12/9/14. (mss)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 120 Middle Man's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 6/11/14. (mss)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 109 Middle Man's Motion to Certify Class; and denying 110 Middle Man's Motion for Sanctions. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 3/18/14. (mss)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 107 Sprint's Motion for Reconsideration. Sprint's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Dkt. 90) is granted; Middle Man's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Dkt. 92) is denied. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 2/25/14. (mss)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 90 Sprint's Motion for Judgment on the pleadings; and granting in part and denying in part 92 Middle Man's Motion for Judgment on the pleadings. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 10/31/2013. (mss)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot 74 Sprint's Motion to Deny Class Certification; and denying 81 Middle Man's Motion to Certify Class. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 7/24/2013. (mss)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Sprint's Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Amended Counterclaim. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 3/25/2013. (mss)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 5 Sprint's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 6 Sprint's Motion for Order; and denying as moot 7 Sprint's Motion for Discovery. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 3/13/2013. (mss)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 16 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 10/16/2012. (jlw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sprint Nextel Corporation v. Middle Man, Inc., The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprint Nextel Corporation
Represented By: Joseph M. Rebein
Represented By: Catherine C. Whittaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Middle Man, Inc., The
Represented By: Ginnie C. Derusseau
Represented By: James J. Kernell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian K. Vazquez
Represented By: Ginnie C. Derusseau
Represented By: James J. Kernell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?