Black & Veatch Corporation v. Aspen Insurance (UK) LTD et al
Plaintiff: Black & Veatch Corporation
Defendant: Aspen Insurance (UK) LTD, Catlin Lloyd's Syndicate 2003 and Liberty Mutual Insurance Europe (UK) LTD
Case Number: 2:2012cv02350
Filed: June 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Presiding Judge: K. Gary Sebelius
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 431 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 426 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 10/8/2019. (ydm)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER re 394 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Stephen P. Warhoe filed by Black & Veatch Corporation. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 10/7/2019. See order for details. (ydm)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 350 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 337 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 339 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and denying 340 Motion for Summary Judgment. See order for details. Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 3/29/19. (msb)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 335 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 330 Motion to Stay proceedings as the court has considered the pendency of the certiorari proceedings in setting the following deadlines for the renewed and retooled cross motions for summary judgment and any motions t o amend the pretrial order, both of which are being filed inresponse to the Tenth Circuit's decision: motions are due on August 3,2018, the responses are due on September 3, 2018, and replies are due onSeptember 24, 2018. Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 5/1/18. (msb)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 277 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 252 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 7/22/15. (km)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 159 Defendant Associated Electric & Gas Insurance Service's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 4/2/2014. (mrb)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in most respects 143 the Liability Insurers' Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 2/28/2014. (mrb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black & Veatch Corporation v. Aspen Insurance (UK) LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black & Veatch Corporation
Represented By: Roy Bash
Represented By: Christopher P. Sobba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Insurance (UK) LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catlin Lloyd's Syndicate 2003
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Europe (UK) LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?