Fox et al v. Transam Leasing, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Candace Fox, Anthony Gillespie and Charles Schreckenbach
Defendant: Transam Leasing, Inc. and Transam Trucking, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv02706
Filed: November 1, 2012
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Referring Judge: Gerald L. Rushfelt
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2015 147 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 136 Motion for Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 7/13/15. (mm)
April 27, 2015 134 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability on Count III (Doc. 121) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' Rule 56(d) Motion to Stay Adjudication of Uncertified, Individual Claims Raised by Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 128) is granted. Accordingly, the court denies without prejudice TransAm's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 123). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties should contact the magistrate judge to set up a scheduling conference. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 4/27/15. (kao)
October 30, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding 108 Motion for Discovery. The Court orders Defendants to serve answers and responses to Plaintiffs' interrogatories and requests for production within ten days. Plaintiffs' request for fees and expenses is denied. See Memorandum and Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 10/30/2014. (gc)
June 11, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion to Certify Class. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Doc. 68) is granted as to Count III and denied as to Counts I and II. IT IS FURTH ER ORDERED that the court certifies a class under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(b)(3) of the following: All persons, including entities, who operated under an Independent Contractor Agreement that included a satellite communications system usage fee with TransAm Trucking, Inc. between November 2, 2009, through the present. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs Candace Fox, Anthony Gillespie, and Charles Schreckenbach are designated as class representatives. Shaffer Lombardo Shurin, P.C., and Gregory Leyh, P.C. are designated as class counsel. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 6/11/14. (kao)
September 18, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 9/18/2013. (gc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox et al v. Transam Leasing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Fox
Represented By: Gregory P. Forney
Represented By: Gregory Leyh
Represented By: Richard F. Lombardo
Represented By: Daniel M. Runion
Represented By: Anne E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Gillespie
Represented By: Gregory P. Forney
Represented By: Gregory Leyh
Represented By: Richard F. Lombardo
Represented By: Daniel M. Runion
Represented By: Anne E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Schreckenbach
Represented By: Gregory P. Forney
Represented By: Gregory Leyh
Represented By: Richard F. Lombardo
Represented By: Daniel M. Runion
Represented By: Anne E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transam Leasing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transam Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?