AKH Company, Inc. v. Universal Underwriters Insurance Company

Plaintiff: AKH Company, Inc.
Defendant: Universal Underwriters Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2013cv02003
Filed: January 2, 2013
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Julie A. Robinson
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2015 304 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part 290 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/4/15. (df)
July 28, 2015 303 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying AKH's 288 Motion to Dismiss Count IX of UUIC's Fifth Amended Counterclaim. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 07/27/2015. (mg)
July 27, 2015 300 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part 282 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/27/15. Mailed to pro se party Gauntlett & Associates c/o Alan Jampol by regular mail. (df)
April 21, 2015 280 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 228 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 233 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; denying 236 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 256 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; finding as moot 264 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 4/21/15. (mm)
March 23, 2015 277 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 164 Motion to determine choice of law; granting in part and denying in part 168 Motion to determine choice of law; granting in part and denying in part 184 Motion to Strike Affidavit. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 3/23/15. (mm)
October 17, 2014 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on IN CAMERA Inspection re 123 MOTION to Compel Sufficient Written Responses and Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 10/17/14. (df)
August 20, 2014 199 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 160 Motion for Reconsideration re 160 MOTION for Reconsideration re: 152 Order on Motion to Compel filed by Universal Underwriters Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/20/14. (df)
July 3, 2014 158 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 123 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/3/14. (df)
June 18, 2014 152 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 117 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/18/14. (df)
October 25, 2013 102 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 82 Motion for Protective Order Limiting Initial Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 10/25/2013. (df)
July 9, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: AKH Company, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 7 is denied. Universal Underwriters Insurance Company's Motion to Bifurcate 68 is denied, and the Court makes no finding pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) with respect to this order. UUIC's Motion to Stay the Deadline for Universal Underwriters Insurance Company to Respond to AKH Company, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 21 is denied as moot. UUIC's Motion to Strike the Decla rations of Michael Schaeper and David Gauntlett filed in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 40 ; UUIC's Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply in Opposition to AKH Company, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 60 ; and UUIC 's Motion to Strike the Supplemental Declaration of Michael Schaeper Filed in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 61 are denied. AKH Company's Request for Judicial Notice in Opposition to Universal's Motion to Strike 51 ; Plaintiff AKH Company's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 54 ; and SEALED Plaintiff AKH Companys Second Request for Judicial Notice in Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 59 are granted. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 7/9/2013. (ms)
June 14, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 18 Defendant/Counter-Claimant Universal Underwriters Insurance Company's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Central District of California; granting 19 Motion for Judicial Notice. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 6/14/2013. (pp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AKH Company, Inc. v. Universal Underwriters Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AKH Company, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Gauntlett
Represented By: Scott C. Hecht
Represented By: James A. Lowe
Represented By: Brian E. Sobczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Underwriters Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?