Digital Ally, Inc. v. Dragoneye Technology, LLC

Plaintiff: Digital Ally, Inc.
Defendant: Dragoneye Technology, LLC
Counter_claimant: Dragoneye Technology, LLC
Counter_defendant: Digital Ally, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv02290
Filed: June 17, 2013
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2015 170 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - See Order for Details. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 07/06/2015. (sv)
June 30, 2015 168 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Defendant's 129 Motion to Strike and Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defendant's Expert Witness Stephen Phillips for Failure to Comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(B). Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 06/30/2015. (mg)
June 24, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 45 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; and granting 58 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Counterclaim. Plaintiff shall electronically file its proposed First Amended Complaint within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Defendant shall have fourteen (14) days after Plaintiff files its First Amended Complaint in which to file its proposed Second Amended Counterclaim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/24/2014. (byk)
October 17, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Verified Motion of Plaintiff Digital Ally, Inc. for Restraining Order and for Temporary Injunction (Doc. [7-2]) is denied. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 10/17/2013. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Digital Ally, Inc. v. Dragoneye Technology, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Digital Ally, Inc.
Represented By: James F.B. Daniels
Represented By: Adam J. Gasper(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dragoneye Technology, LLC
Represented By: Dan C. Sanders(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Dragoneye Technology, LLC
Represented By: Dan C. Sanders(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Digital Ally, Inc.
Represented By: James F.B. Daniels
Represented By: Adam J. Gasper(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?