Harte et al v. Denning et al
Plaintiff: Adlynn K. Harte and Robert W. Harte
Defendant: Johnson County, Kansas Board of Commissioners, Frank Denning, Mark Burns, Edward Blake, Michael Pfannenstiel, James Cossairt, Larry Shoop, Lucky Smith and Christopher Farkes
Case Number: 2:2013cv02586
Filed: November 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: John W. Lungstrum
Presiding Judge: Gerald L. Rushfelt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 564 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 559 Plaintiffs' Motion to Permanently Seal certain information contained with the parties' settlement agreement and Exhibit A to that agreement. Plaintiffs shall submit redacted d ocuments to the court via email in PDF format no later than May 1, 2020. The court will then direct the clerk of the court to substitute redacted documents for the documents presently under seal and will also direct the clerk of the court at that time to unseal documents 556 and 562, including the attachments thereto. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/16/2020. (ses)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 519 SUPPLEMENTAL PRETRIAL ORDER - (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) It is ordered that plaintiffs' claims against defendant James Cossairt are dismissed with prejudice and that former Sheriff Denning is no longer a defendant in this case because pla intiffs have not named former Sheriff Denning as a defendant in Count II. plaintiffs' motion to compel mediation 507 is denied but the parties shall contact Magistrate Judge James's chambers no later than February 25, 2020 to schedule a settlement conference with her. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 02/18/2020. (ses)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER re 499 Mandate - The parties shall file any submissions contemplated by this memorandum and order no later than Monday, January 6, 2020 and any responses thereto no later than Monday, January 13, 2020. The court will condu ct a Telephone Status Conference 1/24/2020 at 10:30 AM. Counsel shall dial into the conference - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 2126821. This case is set for Jury Trial on 3/30/2020 at 09:30 AM in KC Courtroom 643 before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/23/2019. (ses)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 492 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 467 Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; and denying 469 Plaintiffs' Motion for New Trial. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 03/29/2018. (ses)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 375 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 370 Defendants' Motion to Stay Case Pending Petition for Writ of Certiorari. It is further ordered that the parties may file supplemental brief, as specifically described in this order, no later than 10/26/2017. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/19/2017. (ses)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 141 Motion for Hearing and denying 176 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. An evidentiary hearing will be held on Tuesday, July 28, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 223. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 07/13/2015. (jg)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 129 Motion to Compel; granting 158 Motion for Leave to File; granting 174 Motion for Leave to File. See Memorandum and Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on June 4, 2015. (gc)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 64 defendant Sergeant Jim Wingo's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/09/2014. (ses)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - defendant Sergeant Jim Wingo's motion to dismiss plaintiffs' amended complaint 36 is granted and plaintiffs are permitted to file a second amended complaint no later than Monday, July 14, 2014. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 06/30/2014. (ses)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harte et al v. Denning et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adlynn K. Harte
Represented By: Melanie S. Morgan
Represented By: Cheryl A. Pilate
Represented By: Melanie S. Morgan
Represented By: Cheryl A. Pilate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Harte
Represented By: Melanie S. Morgan
Represented By: Cheryl A. Pilate
Represented By: Melanie S. Morgan
Represented By: Cheryl A. Pilate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson County, Kansas Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Lawrence L. Ferree, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Denning
Represented By: Lawrence L. Ferree, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Burns
Represented By: Lawrence L. Ferree, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Blake
Represented By: Lawrence L. Ferree, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Pfannenstiel
Represented By: Lawrence L. Ferree, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cossairt
Represented By: Lawrence L. Ferree, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Shoop
Represented By: Lawrence L. Ferree, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky Smith
Represented By: Lawrence L. Ferree, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Farkes
Represented By: Lawrence L. Ferree, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?