Neonatal Product Group, Inc. v. Shields et al
Plaintiff: Neonatal Product Group, Inc.
Defendant: Janice M. Shields and Paul W. Shields
Case Number: 2:2013cv02601
Filed: November 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Presiding Judge: K. Gary Sebelius
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 185 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 188 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 02/28/2018. (mig)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 118 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 140 Motion to Strike ; denying 151 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 08/24/2017. (cv)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part 168 Motion to Dismiss. The courtsevers and transfers the Counterclaim against Ameda, Inc. (Count I of the Counterclaim (Doc.166 57-65)) to the Northern District of Illinois. The court directs the Clerk of th is court to take all action necessary and appropriate to: (a) notify the Clerk of the Northern District of Illinois of this Order; and (b) effect the transfer of the Counterclaim against Ameda, Inc. to that district. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 7/20/17. (hw)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 156 Motion to Strike. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED BY THE COURT THAT Neonatal's Motion to Strike Defendants' Second Amended Answer and Counterclaim (Doc. 156) is granted. The court strikes the Second Amended Answ er and Counterclaims (Doc. 154). The court orders the Shields Defendants to file the Proposed Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims (Doc. 138-2) that the court granted them leave to file within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 05/24/2017. (cv)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 138 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims to Add Party. Defendants and Counterclaimants must file their Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims within 10 days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the case is referred to Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius for scheduling and supervision of additional discovery. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 03/17/2017. (mig)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 43 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. By May 6, 2015, plaintiff shall file its Amended Complaint (ECF No. 44-2) as a separate docket entry in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 4/29/15. (bh)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 11/26/2014. (mig)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neonatal Product Group, Inc. v. Shields et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neonatal Product Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael B. Hurd
Represented By: Matthew B. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice M. Shields
Represented By: Kyle D. Donnelly
Represented By: James J. Kernell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul W. Shields
Represented By: Kyle D. Donnelly
Represented By: James J. Kernell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?