Mochama v. Butler County et al
Plaintiff: Justine Osoro Mochama
Defendant: Butler County, Kansas, Butler County Sheriff, Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc., U.S. Department of Homeland Security and Does 1-5
Case Number: 2:2014cv02121
Filed: March 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Butler
Presiding Judge: Teresa J. James
Presiding Judge: Kathryn H. Vratil
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that defendants Rodney Nichols and Timothy Zwetoware entitled to summary judgment on their contention that they are entitled to qualified immunity on plaintiff's claim that they violated his Fourth a nd Fifth Amendment rights when they used excessive force at the Butler County Detention Center (part of Count I). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Rodney Nichols is entitled to summaryjudgment on plaintiff's claims that he violated plaintiff 's Fourth and Fifth Amendment rights when he failed to intervene at the Butler County Detention Center (part of Count II).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter judgment for defendants on allclaims in this case. See Order for further details. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 2/27/2017. (ydm)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruled in part and sustained in part 74 Motion to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS SPECIFICALLY ORDERED that Alan Van Skike, Jane Patty-Kill and Andrew Pleviak are entitled to summary judgm ent on plaintiff's claims that they violated his Fourth and FifthAmendment rights when they (a) used excessive force at the Wichita ICE Office (part of Count I) and (b) and failed to intervene at the Wichita ICE Office (part of Count II). See order for further details. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 1/3/17. (hw)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling as moot the 39 Motion to Dismiss the United States of America. Further, overruling the Federal Defendants' 42 Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion For Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 06/22/2015. (mg)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 53 Plaintiff's second Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall electronically file his proposed Third Amended Complaint within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/29/2015. (byk)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall electronically file his proposed Second Amended Complaint within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. It is further ordered that Plai ntiff shall serve summons and his Second Amended Complaint upon the newly added defendants within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the Second Amended Complaint. It is further ordered that the Butler Defendants' request for a formal dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 is granted. Within seven (7) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall file a Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) stipulation of dismissal of his claims against the Butler Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/31/2014. (byk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mochama v. Butler County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justine Osoro Mochama
Represented By: Matthew L. Hoppock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butler County, Kansas
Represented By: Brooks G. Severson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butler County Sheriff
Represented By: Brooks G. Severson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Emily B. Metzger
Represented By: Brian D. Sheern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?