Duffy v. Lawrence Memorial Hospital
Plaintiff: Megen Duffy
Defendant: Lawrence Memorial Hospital
Counter_claimant: Lawrence Memorial Hospital
Counter_defendant: Megen Duffy
Case Number: 2:2014cv02256
Filed: May 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Allen
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Presiding Judge: Teresa J. James
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 337 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 318 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 320 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 322 Motion for Summary Judgment. See order for details. Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 10/2/18. (msb)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER granting 284 Relator's Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/21/2018. (ts)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Relator's Motion to Compel Production of Responses to Relator's Fifth Requests for Production to Defendant (ECF No. 239) is GRANTED. Defendant's objections to these discovery requests are overruled and, within ten (10) days of the date of this order, Defendant shall provide supplemental responses to Request for Production Nos. 69, 70, 72, and 73 without objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/22/2017. (ck)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 264 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 236 Defendant/Counterclaimant Lawrence Memorial Hospital's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Non-Retained Experts. No later than 11/3/2017, Plaintiff shall supplement her disclosure related to the CMS witnesses or advise Defendant that the witnesses have not cooperated in providing information necessary for such disclosure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/31/2017. (ts)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER finding as moot 210 Relator's Motion to Compel Production of Triage Notes in Response to Requests for Production 40 and 43. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/23/2017. (ts)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 193 Relator's Motion to Compel Regarding Defendant's Sample Produced in Response to Requests for Production 40, 41, 43 and 58. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/11/2017. (ts)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 192 Relator's Motion to Compel Regarding Defendant's Responses and Objections to Qui Tam Plaintiff's Second Interrogatories and Fourth Request for Production of Documents to Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/7/2017. (ts)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 198 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; denying 151 Motion for Summary Judgment. See order for details. Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 7/7/17. (msb)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER memorializing oral rulings made during Status Conference held on 5/8/2017, granting 160 Plaintiff's Motion to Modify Third Amended Scheduling Order; granting in part and denying in part 163 Defendant/Counterclaimant La wrence Memorial Hospital's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Requests 59 and 61 and Request for Cost Shifting; granting 169 Relator's Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Redaction Component of Protective Order; and entering FOURTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery deadline 12/12/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due 1/3/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2018 at 10:30 AM in KC Courtroom 236 before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Dispositive motion deadline 2/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/10/2017. (ts)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 155 Defendant/Counterclaimant Lawrence Memorial Hospital's Motion to Compel. The motion is granted insofar as the witness is ordered to appear for deposition, and denied insofar as it seeks sanctions. A copy of this order shall be sent to the witness by regular mail and email. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/5/2017. (ts)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 142 Defendant/Counterclaimant Lawrence Memorial Hospital's Motion to Modify Discovery Order (Doc. 133) Directing Defendant/Counterclaimant Lawrence Memorial Hospital to Respond to Document Request Nos. 40, 41, 43 and 58 and for Protective Order, or, in the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 3/31/2017. (byk)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 136 Relator/Plaintiff Megen Duffy's Motion to Compel Regarding Defendant's Responses and Objections to Qui Tam Plaintiff's Third Request for Production of Documents to Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 3/30/2017. (ts)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 116 Relator/Plaintiff Megen Duffy's Motion to Compel; granting 125 Defendant/Counterclaimant Lawrence Memorial Hospital's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Pla intiff's Motion to Compel Regarding Defendant's Responses and Objections to Qui Tam Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents. See order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/7/2017. (ts)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 102 Defendant/Counter Claimant Lawrence Memorial Hospital's Motion to Challenge Qui Tam Plaintiff's Confidentiality Designations Pursuant to Agreed Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/13/2017. (ts)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 99 Relator/Plaintiff Megen Duffy's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/21/2016. (ts)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duffy v. Lawrence Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megen Duffy
Represented By: Sarah A. Brown
Represented By: Robert K. Collins
Represented By: Daniel G. Curry
Represented By: Anthony E. LaCroix
Represented By: Theodore J. Lickteig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Jean Paul Bradshaw, II
Represented By: David R. Frye
Represented By: Andrew R. Ramirez
Represented By: J. Eric Weslander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Lawrence Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Jean Paul Bradshaw, II
Represented By: David R. Frye
Represented By: Andrew R. Ramirez
Represented By: J. Eric Weslander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Megen Duffy
Represented By: Sarah A. Brown
Represented By: Robert K. Collins
Represented By: Daniel G. Curry
Represented By: Anthony E. LaCroix
Represented By: Theodore J. Lickteig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?